Infobip, Ltd. v. Ringcaptcha, Inc.
Plaintiff: Infobip, Ltd.
Defendant: Ringcaptcha, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01244
Filed: August 2, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Plaintiff Infobip, Ltd.. (Barkley, Thierry) (extend) (answer)
September 19, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ringcaptcha, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case.. (Savage, John)
September 9, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ringcaptcha, Inc. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, by Defendant Ringcaptcha, Inc. (Savage, John) Modified event on 9/12/2022 (SLD).
September 9, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/24/2022.), COUNTERCLAIM against Infobip, Ltd. by Ringcaptcha, Inc.. filed by Ringcaptcha, Inc..(Savage, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation to Extend time to respond to Complaint. Ringcaptcha, Inc. answer due 9/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/30/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
August 29, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant Ringcaptcha, Inc. to Respond to Infobip, Ltd.'s #1 Complaint, by Defendant Ringcaptcha, Inc. (Savage, John) (extend) (answer) Modified on 8/30/2022 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD).
August 29, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John J. Savage on behalf of Defendant Ringcaptcha, Inc.. (Savage, John)
August 9, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Infobip, Ltd. re #1 Complaint,. Ringcaptcha, Inc. served on 8/5/2022. (Barkley, Thierry)
August 4, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #1 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Sean P. Flynn and Thierry V. Barkley. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 3, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ringcaptcha, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (TRW)
August 3, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Infobip, Ltd.. (Barkley, Thierry)
August 3, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
August 2, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (TRW)
August 2, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Infobip, Ltd.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Barkley, Thierry)
August 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Infobip, Ltd. (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNVDC-6995275) by Infobip, Ltd.. Proof of service due by 10/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Barkley, Thierry) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infobip, Ltd. v. Ringcaptcha, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infobip, Ltd.
Represented By: Sean Flynn
Represented By: Thierry V. Barkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ringcaptcha, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?