ABC Recycling Industries, LLC v. United States of America
Plaintiff: ABC Recycling Industries, LLC
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2022cv01278
Filed: August 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Anne R Traum
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ABC Recycling Industries, LLC. United States of America served on 8/22/2022. (Hanks, Karen)
August 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE upon further review of case it has been determined that this case should of been filed in the unofficial southern division of the US District Court, District of Nevada. Pursuant to LR IA 1-8(a) this case is transferred to the southern division and assigned case number 2:22-cv-01278. District Judge Miranda M. Due and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney no longer assigned. (WJ) Modified on 8/10/2022 correct case number. (WJ).
August 10, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
August 10, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America. (HKL)
August 10, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (EDS)
August 10, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (WJ)
August 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7003801) by ABC Recycling Industries, LLC. Proof of service due by 11/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Hanks, Karen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABC Recycling Industries, LLC v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC Recycling Industries, LLC
Represented By: Chantel Marie Schimming
Represented By: Karen L. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?