Walker v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Walker
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Ally Financial, Inc., Capital One Services, LLC, 1st United Credit Union, Bank of America, N.A., CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., CoreLogic Credco, LLC, TD Auto Finance, LLC and Capital One, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01338
Filed: August 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Filing 45 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Chavez, David) (extend) (answer)
October 12, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant CoreLogic Credco, LLC. Responses due by 10/26/2022. (Wight, Brody)
October 11, 2022 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Trans Union, LLC.(Swernofsky, Rachael)
October 10, 2022 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Capital One, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One, N.A. added.. (Armstrong, Karyna)
October 10, 2022 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Capital One, N.A..(Armstrong, Karyna)
October 10, 2022 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Ally Financial, Inc..(Wight, Brody)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #38 Motion to Extend Time (Second Request). Equifax Information Services, LLC Answer re #1 Complaint due 11/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
October 7, 2022 Filing 38 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Responses due by 10/21/2022. (Marina, Gia) (answer)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Stipulation Re: #1 Complaint, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 10/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 5, 2022 Filing 36 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Chavez, David) (extend) (answer)
September 27, 2022 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by 1st United Credit Union. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bradford, Brian)
September 26, 2022 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by 1st United Credit Union.(Burch, Carleton)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 10/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/26/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 23, 2022 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 10/7/2022. (Chavez, David) (answer)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Extend Time for TransUnion to file its responsive pleading for 30 days, to October 11, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/22/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 20, 2022 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/20/2022. In light of the filing of #21 Notice of Settlement, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file settlement documents, stipulation for dismissal or joint status report within 60 days. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint, Trans Union, LLC answer due 10/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation Re: #1 Complaint, Ally Financial, Inc. answer due 10/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint, Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 10/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Stipulation Re: #1 Complaint, Capital One Services, LLC answer due 10/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #20 Stipulation Re: #1 Complaint, 1st United Credit Union answer due 9/26/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #18 Stipulation Re: #1 Complaint, CoreLogic Credco, LLC answer due 10/12/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #17 Stipulation Re: #1 Complaint, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 9/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 16, 2022 Filing 22 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Capital One Services, LLC. (Silvestri, Jeffrey) (extend) (answer)
September 15, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of settlement between Plaintiff and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Shawn Walker re #1 Complaint,,.. (Kind, Michael)
September 14, 2022 Filing 20 First STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time For Defendant First United Credit Union To Respond to Complaint by Defendant 1st United Credit Union. (Burch, Carleton) (other) (answer)
September 12, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by CoreLogic Credco, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent CoreLogic Credco, LLC for CoreLogic Credco, LLC added.. (Wight, Brody)
September 12, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant CoreLogic Credco, LLC. (Wight, Brody) (extend) (answer)
September 9, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Chavez, David) (extend) (answer)
September 9, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Trans Union, LLC re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Shawn Walker. Responses due by 9/23/2022. (Kind, Michael) (answer)
September 9, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trans Union, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC added.. (Swernofsky, Rachael)
September 9, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Trans Union, LLC. Responses due by 9/23/2022. (Swernofsky, Rachael) (answer)
September 9, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachael Swernofsky on behalf of Defendant Trans Union, LLC. (Swernofsky, Rachael)
September 9, 2022 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc.. (Keeton, Jamie)
September 9, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Keeton, Jamie)
September 9, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/24/2022.(Keeton, Jamie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 8, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ally Financial, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Wight, Brody)
September 8, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer or Otherwise Plead re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Ally Financial, Inc.. (Wight, Brody) (extend) (answer)
September 7, 2022 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2022. (Marina, Gia) (answer)
September 7, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shawn Walker. Bank of America, N.A. waiver sent on 9/1/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Kind, Michael)
September 1, 2022 Defendant TD Auto Finance Dismissed per #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (EDS)
August 31, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Shawn Walker. Dismissing TD Auto Finance, LLC. (Kind, Michael)
August 17, 2022 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 17, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint (HAM)
August 17, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Shawn Walker. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kind, Michael)
August 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7014877) by Shawn Walker. Proof of service due by 11/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons) (Kind, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 17, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Walker
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Gerardo Avalos
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Gia Marina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: Rachael Swernofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Brody R. Wight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1st United Credit Union
Represented By: Brian L. Bradford
Represented By: Carleton R. Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Lynn Keeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David Ernesto Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreLogic Credco, LLC
Represented By: Brody R. Wight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Auto Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Karyna Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?