SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC v. Newrez LLC et al
Plaintiff: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Defendant: NewRez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 2:2022cv01371
Filed: August 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #15 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Federal National Mortgage Association answer due 10/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 13, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time for Fannie Mae to Respond to Amended Complaint re #14 Order on Stipulation, by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez LLC. (Morgan, Melanie) (extend) (answer)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Federal National Mortgage Association answer due 10/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/11/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 7, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint re #11 Order on Stipulation, by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez LLC. (Morgan, Melanie) (extend) (answer)
October 7, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, Defendant NewRez, LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing's Answer to Amended Complaint filed by NewRez LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/21/2022.(Magaster, Paige) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Federal National Mortgage Association answer due 10/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/29/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 29, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint re #6 Order on Stipulation,,, #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez LLC. (Morgan, Melanie) (extend) (answer)
September 8, 2022 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morgan, Melanie)
August 31, 2022 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez LLC.. (Morgan, Melanie)
August 30, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Morgan, Melanie)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Federal National Mortgage Association answer due 9/30/2022; NewRez LLC answer due 9/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/29/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 29, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez LLC. (Morgan, Melanie) (extend) (answer)
August 24, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/24/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/8/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 24, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 24, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Federal National Mortgage Association, Newrez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC, Other Affiliate Rithm Capital Corp., Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition II LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Investment Corp. for Newrez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing added.. (Morgan, Melanie)
August 24, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-853199-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7022647) by Federal National Mortgage Association, Newrez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Morgan, Melanie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 24, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC v. Newrez LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Chantel Marie Schimming
Represented By: Karen L. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Paige Magaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Paige Magaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?