Eason Jr. v. Clarity Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Eason Jr.
Defendant: Clarity Services, Inc., 2233 Paradise Road, LLC, Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, Lac Vieux Desert Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians and North Star Finance, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv01387
Filed: August 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #12 Motion to Extend Time. 2233 Paradise Road, LLC Answer re #1 Complaint due 11/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Benjamin Thomas Ivie terminated. Attorney Ramir Mitchell Hernandez for 2233 Paradise Road, LLC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
October 17, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jimmy Eason Jr. re #3 Summons Issued. Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians waiver sent on 10/10/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. (Kind, Michael)
October 14, 2022 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,, #7 Order on Stipulation,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings, by Defendant 2233 Paradise Road, LLC. Responses due by 10/28/2022. (Hernandez, Ramir) (answer)
October 14, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Ramir M. Hernandez in for Attorney Benjamin T. Ivie by Defendant 2233 Paradise Road, LLC. Responses due by 10/28/2022. (Hernandez, Ramir)
October 11, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Ramir Mitchell Hernandez on behalf of Defendant 2233 Paradise Road, LLC. (Hernandez, Ramir)
October 10, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of settlement between Plaintiff and Lac Vieux Desert Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians dba Big Picture Loans, LLC by Jimmy Eason Jr. re #1 Complaint,,.. (Kind, Michael)
September 30, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of settlement between Plaintiff and Clarity Services, Inc. by Jimmy Eason Jr. re #1 Complaint,,.. (Kind, Michael)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 First Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint. 2233 Paradise Road, LLC answer due 10/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
September 16, 2022 Filing 6 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant 2233 Paradise Road, LLC. (Ivie, Benjamin) (extend) (answer)
September 16, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by 2233 Paradise Road, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Team Broadway Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Brent Christopher Berge 2012 LLC, Corporate Parent Perpetual Green LLC, Corporate Parent Cash Brothers LLC, Corporate Parent 2233 Paradise Road Investors, LLC for 2233 Paradise Road, LLC added.. (Ivie, Benjamin)
September 16, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin Thomas Ivie on behalf of Defendant 2233 Paradise Road, LLC. (Ivie, Benjamin)
August 26, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (TRW)
August 25, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (TRW)
August 25, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jimmy Eason Jr.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kind, Michael)
August 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7025498) by Jimmy Eason Jr.. Proof of service due by 11/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (Kind, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eason Jr. v. Clarity Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Eason Jr.
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Gerardo Avalos
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarity Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2233 Paradise Road, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Thomas Ivie
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lac Vieux Desert Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Star Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?