Baker v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donna Baker
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC and Preferred Credit, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01398
Filed: August 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Marina, Gia) Modified by Clerk's Office to add Equifax Inc as an interested party on 10/20/2022 (EDS).
October 19, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/3/2022.(Marina, Gia) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 4, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of settlement between Plaintiff and Trans Union LLC by Donna Baker re #1 Complaint,,.. (Kind, Michael)
October 4, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of settlement between Donna Baker and Preferred Credit, Inc. by Donna Baker re #1 Complaint,,.. (Kind, Michael)
October 4, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of settlement between Donna Baker and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Donna Baker re #1 Complaint,,.. (Kind, Michael)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Motion to Extend Time (First Request). Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer re #1 Complaint due 10/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/22/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
September 21, 2022 Filing 13 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to respond to complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Donna Baker. Responses due by 10/5/2022. (Kind, Michael) (answer)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint, Trans Union, LLC answer due 10/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 20, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Trans Union LLC to File a Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Donna Baker. Responses due by 10/4/2022. (Avalos, Gerardo) (answer)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint, Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 10/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 16, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Responses due by 9/30/2022. (Marina, Gia) (answer)
September 9, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gary E. Schnitzer. Notice of Change of Firm Name (Schnitzer, Gary)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Stipulation Re: #1 Complaint, Preferred Credit, Inc. answer due 10/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/9/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 8, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Preferred Credit, Inc.. (Watson, Tyler) (extend) (answer)
September 8, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/8/2022. Pending before the Court is a stipulation to extend, which provides a caption identifying the wrong court. Compare Docket No. 4 at 1 with Local Rule IA 10-2. Accordingly, the stipulation is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
September 7, 2022 Filing 4 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Preferred Credit, Inc.. (Watson, Tyler) (extend) (answer)
August 29, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (TRW)
August 26, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (TRW)
August 26, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Donna Baker. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kind, Michael)
August 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7027066) by Donna Baker. Proof of service due by 11/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Kind, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Baker
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Gerardo Avalos
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Gia Marina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Credit, Inc.
Represented By: Gary E. Schnitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?