Coil v. State of Nevada
Petitioner: David Coil and David Andrew Coil
Respondent: State of Nevada, Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Calvin Johnson
Case Number: 2:2022cv01428
Filed: September 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by David Coil. Adds new parties. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate) (YAW)
October 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying #6 Motion regarding unauthorized filing fee deductions. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
October 4, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION regarding unauthorized filing fee deductions by Petitioner David Coil. Responses due by 10/18/2022. (HAM) (misc) (nondispositive)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. It is ordered that the Clerk resend the September 12, 2022, order (ECF No. #3 ) and its attachments (ECF Nos. #3 -1, #3 -2) to Petitioner at High Desert State Prison. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - (ECF Nos. #3 , #3 -1, #3 -2 regenerated to HDSP for distribution to P - HAM)
September 13, 2022 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable 'Inmate at HDSP' re ECF No. #3 Order, sent to David Coil at LCC. (DRM)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Payment of filing fees due 10/27/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Inmate Form/Instructions, #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Copies attached for distribution to P via Lovelock law library)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE from USDC advising case against State of Nevada, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:22-cv-01428-GMN-BNW. (HAM)
September 2, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)
September 1, 2022 Filing 2 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coil v. State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Coil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Andrew Coil
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Calvin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?