Hunter v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Janee Hunter
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2022cv01534
Filed: September 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michonne Louise Omo on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Omo, Michonne)
September 30, 2022 Filing 12 Certified mail receipts returned by Janee Hunter re #8 Certified Mail receipts. (LOE)
September 22, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michonne Louise Omo on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Omo, Michonne)
September 22, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sohayl Vafai Michonne Louise Omo on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Omo, Michonne) Modified on 9/23/2022 (SLD).
September 21, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janee Hunter re #7 Summons Issued as to USA. (LOE)
September 20, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS 7020 3160 0000 7420 0875 and 7020 3160 0000 7420 0882 re #7 Summons Issued as to USA and #6 Complaint. (TRW)
September 19, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LOE)
September 19, 2022 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi by Janee Hunter. Proof of service due by 12/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (LOE)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is kindly directed to file the complaint (ECF No. 1-1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is kindly directed to issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
September 16, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (Kalagian, Marc)
September 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE pursuant to General Order 2019-08: This case has been randomly assigned to a Magistrate Judge pending the parties' consent or declination. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), with written consent of all parties, a Magistrate Judge may conduct all proceedings in a case, including all pretrial and trial proceedings, entry of judgment, and post-trial motions. Any appeals will be made directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. A link is being provided to the form on the court's website to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (A copy of the notice and consent form have been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) Consent or declination due by 9/25/2022. (no image attached) (LOE) (LOE).
September 15, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (LOE)
September 14, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Janee Hunter. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
September 14, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Janee Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Kalagian, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janee Hunter
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Leonard Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Michonne Louise Omo
Represented By: Sohayl Vafai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?