GHEBREYESUS et al v. FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA et al
Petitioner: SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES, FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS and SIMRET ZEREYOHANS KELEB
Respondent: BROOK BEKELE BESHAH, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA, BIRUK BEKELE BESHAH, BIRUK BEKELE and BROOK BEKELE
Case Number: 2:2022cv01717
Filed: October 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1602
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Petitioners FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES.. (Harrison, Kiley)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION Re Briefing Schedule for Renewed Motions to Dismiss by Petitioners FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Harrison, Kiley) (other) (nondispositive)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting #52 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Derege B. Demissie and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David Z. Chesnoff for BROOK BEKELE BESHAH, CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, and ADDIS ABABA. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/7/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Derege B. Demissie and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David Z. Chesnoff (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7137250) by Respondent FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA. (Chesnoff, David)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting #50 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Russell A. Bikoff and approving Designation of Local Counsel James A. Beckstrom. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/16/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Russell A. Bikoff and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James A. Beckstrom (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7118196) by Respondent BROOK BEKELE BESHAH. (Beckstrom, James)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Allen Beckstrom, II on behalf of Respondent BROOK BEKELE BESHAH. (Beckstrom, James)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to remove attorney Katherine Mary Rebecca Daw from the Electronic Service List in this case by Petitioners FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Silvestri, Jeffrey)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 36 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP, addressed to Katherine Mary Rebecca Daw. (KF)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting #43 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Neil A.F. Popovic and approving Designation of Local Counsel of Jeffrey A Silvestri. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/26/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting #42 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Adam Angelo Bartolanzo and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Jeffrey A Silvestri. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/26/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting #41 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hwan Kim and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Jeffrey A Silvestri. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/26/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Neil A.F. Popovic and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeffrey Silvestri (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7094848) by Petitioners FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Silvestri, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Adam A. Bartolanzo and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeffrey Silvestri (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7094841) by Petitioners FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Silvestri, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Hwan Kim and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeffrey Silvestri (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7094813) by Petitioners FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Silvestri, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Silvestri, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey A Silvestri on behalf of Petitioners FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Silvestri, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Join Defendant Bekele's #37 Request for an Extension of Time (First Request) re 36 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP by Respondents CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, and ADDIS ABABA. Responses due by 11/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(TRW)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re 36 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP by Respondent BROOK BEKELE BESHAH. Responses due by 11/8/2022. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order) (TRW)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/26/2022. (no image attached) (HAM)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-02865. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #33 ORDER granting #15 Defendant Brook Bekele's Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, denying as moot #24 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, and denying without prejudice #29 Ethiopian Government Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/28/2022. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #15 Defendant Brook Bekele's Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, denying as moot #24 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, and denying without prejudice #29 Ethiopian Government Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. See full Order and accompanying Memorandum Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/28/2022. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY to opposition to motion re #29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA. (Demissie, Derege) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra H. Deal on behalf of CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA (Deal, Alexandra)[Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Memorandum in opposition to re #29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Hwan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss by CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA. (Demissie, Derege) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is hereby granted. Attorney Alexandra H. Deal is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/6/2022. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alexandra H. Deal, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9152155. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Moore, Samuel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss by CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA. (Demissie, Derege) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court grants the #27 Motion for Extension of Time and hereby sets the following deadlines. The Ethiopian Government Defendants shall file an answer or a motion to dismiss on or before April 6, 2022. Plaintiffs shall file a response to any motion to dismiss on or before May 6, 2022. And the Ethiopian Government Defendants shall file their reply in support of any motion to dismiss on or before May 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/7/2022. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to opposition to motion re #24 MOTION to Strike #21 Reply to opposition to Motion Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike ECF No. 21-1 and the Portions of Brook's Reply (ECF No. 21) that Cite to ECF No. 21-1, #25 Memorandum in Opposition, Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Strike ECF No. 21-1 and the Portions of Brook's Reply (ECF No. 21) that Cite to ECF No. 21-1 filed by FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Kim, Hwan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Memorandum in opposition to re #24 MOTION to Strike #21 Reply to opposition to Motion Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike ECF No. 21-1 and the Portions of Brook's Reply (ECF No. 21) that Cite to ECF No. 21-1 filed by BROOK BEKELE BESHAH. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Szymkowicz, John) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Strike #21 Reply to opposition to Motion Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike ECF No. 21-1 and the Portions of Brook's Reply (ECF No. 21) that Cite to ECF No. 21-1 by FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Hwan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Derege Demissie on behalf of MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA (Demissie, Derege) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Derege Demissie on behalf of CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA (Demissie, Derege) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to opposition to motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BROOK BEKELE BESHAH. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Szymkowicz, John) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Order Briefing Schedule by CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Moore, Samuel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court grants the #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Derege Demissie. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/3/2022. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court grants the #20 Motion for Extension of Time and hereby sets the following deadlines. The Ethiopian Government Defendants shall file an answer or motion to dismiss on or before March 7, 2022. Plaintiffs shall file a response to any motion to dismiss on or before April 8, 2022. And the Ethiopian Government Defendants shall file their reply in support of any motion to dismiss on or before April 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/3/2022. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Derege Demissie, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9017566. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Derege Demissie, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Moore, Samuel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Moore on behalf of CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA (Moore, Samuel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Memorandum in opposition to re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Fremichael Ghebreyesus, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Kim, Hwan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Mary Rebecca Daw on behalf of FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Daw, Katherine) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by BROOK BEKELE BESHAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Szymkowicz, John) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Szymkowicz on behalf of BROOK BEKELE BESHAH (Szymkowicz, John) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to CITY OF ADDIS ABABA served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Kim, Hwan)[Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons and complaint, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on Defendants, by DHL, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (Attachments: #1 Waybill) (zjf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST from Plaintiffs for the Clerk to effect service of one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by DHL, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (See Docket Entry #7 to view document) (zjf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby grants the #10 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading, and sets the following deadlines as to defendant Brook Bekele Beshah. Defendant Bekele shall file his motion to dismiss the complaint on or before December 23, 2021. Plaintiffs shall file shall file their opposition on or before January 24, 2022. Defendant Bekele shall file his reply on or before February 4, 2022. Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or Motion to Dismiss due by 12/23/2021. Opposition due by 1/24/2022. Reply due by 2/4/2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/22/2021. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by BROOK BEKELE BESHAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Szymkowicz, John) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Szymkowicz on behalf of BROOK BEKELE BESHAH (Szymkowicz, John) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Alan Bikoff on behalf of BROOK BEKELE BESHAH (Bikoff, Russell) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING by FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kim, Hwan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BROOK BEKELE BESHAH served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kim, Hwan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Angelo Bartolanzo on behalf of FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartolanzo, Adam) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil A.F. Popovic on behalf of FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Popovic, Neil) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Plaintiffs' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Neil A.F. Popovic. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/2/2021. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to BROOK BEKELE BESHAH, CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Neil Anthony Friedman Popovic, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8830508. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Neil A.F. Popovic, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Hwan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BROOK BEKELE BESHAH, CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BDCDC-8830436) filed by FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons Summons for Federal Democratic Republic of Ethiopia, #12 Summons Summons for Ministry of Foreign Affairs of Ethiopia, #13 Summons Summons for City of Addis Ababa, #14 Summons Summons for Sub-City of Bole, Addis Ababa, #15 Summons Summons for Federal First Instance Court of Ethiopia, #16 Summons Summons for Brook Bekele Beshah)(Kim, Hwan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/12/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GHEBREYESUS et al v. FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES
Represented By: Hwan Kim
Represented By: Adam Angelo Bartolanzo
Represented By: Katherine Mary Rebecca Daw
Represented By: Neil A.F. Popovic
Represented By: Kiley Harrison
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS
Represented By: Hwan Kim
Represented By: Adam Angelo Bartolanzo
Represented By: Katherine Mary Rebecca Daw
Represented By: Neil A.F. Popovic
Represented By: Kiley Harrison
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SIMRET ZEREYOHANS KELEB
Represented By: Hwan Kim
Represented By: Adam Angelo Bartolanzo
Represented By: Katherine Mary Rebecca Daw
Represented By: Neil A.F. Popovic
Represented By: Kiley Harrison
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BROOK BEKELE BESHAH
Represented By: John Paul Szymkowicz
Represented By: Russell Alan Bikoff
Represented By: John T. Szymkowicz
Represented By: David Z. Chesnoff
Represented By: James Allen Beckstrom, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA
Represented By: Derege Demissie
Represented By: Samuel C. Moore
Represented By: Alexandra H. Deal
Represented By: David Z. Chesnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA
Represented By: Derege Demissie
Represented By: Samuel C. Moore
Represented By: Alexandra H. Deal
Represented By: David Z. Chesnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CITY OF ADDIS ABABA
Represented By: Derege Demissie
Represented By: Samuel C. Moore
Represented By: Alexandra H. Deal
Represented By: David Z. Chesnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA
Represented By: Derege Demissie
Represented By: Samuel C. Moore
Represented By: Alexandra H. Deal
Represented By: David Z. Chesnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA
Represented By: Derege Demissie
Represented By: Samuel C. Moore
Represented By: Alexandra H. Deal
Represented By: David Z. Chesnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BIRUK BEKELE BESHAH
Represented By: John Paul Szymkowicz
Represented By: Russell Alan Bikoff
Represented By: John T. Szymkowicz
Represented By: James Allen Beckstrom, II
Represented By: David Z. Chesnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BIRUK BEKELE
Represented By: John Paul Szymkowicz
Represented By: Russell Alan Bikoff
Represented By: John T. Szymkowicz
Represented By: David Z. Chesnoff
Represented By: James Allen Beckstrom, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BROOK BEKELE
Represented By: John Paul Szymkowicz
Represented By: John T. Szymkowicz
Represented By: Russell Alan Bikoff
Represented By: David Z. Chesnoff
Represented By: James Allen Beckstrom, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?