Maley v. Marlar
Plaintiff: Deanna Maley
Defendant: Macquinzi Marlar
Case Number: 2:2022cv01718
Filed: October 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Deanna Maley.. (Cloward, Benjamin)
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer by Defendant Macquinzi Marlar. (Temple, Marissa)
November 1, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer by Plaintiff Deanna Maley. Replies due by 11/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Aaron DeShaw)(Cloward, Benjamin)
October 31, 2022 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Macquinzi Marlar.. (Temple, Marissa)
October 18, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue or Transfer. Responses due by 11/1/2022. (Temple, Marissa)
October 12, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/12/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/27/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/11/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 12, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 12, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Macquinzi Marlar. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Temple, Marissa)
October 12, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-855063-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7078687) by Macquinzi Marlar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Temple, Marissa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 12, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maley v. Marlar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Maley
Represented By: Benjamin Paul Cloward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquinzi Marlar
Represented By: Marissa R Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?