Fields v. Reese et al
Plaintiff: Kea Davina Fields
Defendant: Diane Reese and The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints
Case Number: 2:2022cv01917
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/12/2023. Motions due by 6/9/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
December 21, 2022 Filing 9 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Kea Davina Fields.. (Beal, Garnet)
December 14, 2022 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Diane Reese, The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints.. (McNutt, Daniel)
November 29, 2022 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Diane Reese, The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints.. (McNutt, Daniel)
November 29, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kea Davina Fields. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Beal, Garnet)
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Diane Reese, The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (McNutt, Daniel)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/14/2022. By Deputy Clerk: T. Roush-Wallace. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/29/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Diane Reese, The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/29/2022.(McNutt, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, District of Nevada, Case Number A-22-860196-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7114724) by The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, Diane Reese. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (McNutt, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 14, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (TRW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Reese et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kea Davina Fields
Represented By: Garnet E Beal
Represented By: Steve Dimopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Reese
Represented By: Daniel R McNutt
Represented By: Matthew C Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints
Represented By: Matthew C Wolf
Represented By: Daniel R McNutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?