Signify North America Corporation et al v. Lepro Innovation Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Signify North America Corporation and Signify Holding B.V.
Defendant: Lepro Innovation Inc., LE Innovation Inc., Innovation Rules Inc., Home Ever Inc. and Letianlighting, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv02095
Filed: December 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2023 Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION AND ORDER To (1) Set a Deadline of February 27, 2023, for All Defendants to Answer, (2) Set Aside Entry of Default as to Defaulted Defendants, and (3) Withdraw Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Serve Defendant LE Innovation Inc., re #22 Clerk's Entry of Default, #20 Motion, by Plaintiffs Signify Holding B.V., Signify North America Corporation. (Austin, F.) (other) (answer)
February 13, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Akke Levin on behalf of Defendants Home Ever Inc., Innovation Rules Inc., LE Innovation Inc., Lepro Innovation Inc., Letianlighting, Inc.. (Levin, Akke)
February 6, 2023 Filing 22 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Home Ever Inc., Innovation Rules Inc., Lepro Innovation Inc., Letianlighting, Inc. re #21 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default,. (EDS)
January 20, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default Against Defendants LEPRO Innovation Inc., Innovation Inc., Home Ever Inc., and Leitianlighting, Inc. by Plaintiffs Signify Holding B.V., Signify North America Corporation. Responses due by 2/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of F. Christopher Austin, #2 Proposed Order Entry of Default)(Austin, F.)
January 13, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Serve Nevada Secretary of State in the Stead of Defendant LE Innovation Inc. re #8 Summons Issued by Plaintiffs Signify Holding B.V., Signify North America Corporation. Responses due by 1/27/2023. (Austin, F.) (misc) (presiding)
January 12, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed NOTICE Proof of Service on 12/22/2022 on Defendant Home Ever Inc., by Signify Holding B.V., Signify North America Corporation re #8 Summons Issued. Home Ever Inc served on 12/22/2022. (Austin, F.) Modified text on 1/19/2023 (EDS).
January 12, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed NOTICE Proof of Service on 12/22/2022 on Defendant Letianlighting, Inc., by Signify Holding B.V., Signify North America Corporation re #8 Summons Issued. Letianlighting, Inc served on 12/22/2022. (Austin, F.) Modified text on 1/19/2023 (EDS).
January 12, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed NOTICE Proof of Service on 12/22/2022 on Defendant Innovation Rules Inc. by Signify Holding B.V., Signify North America Corporation re #8 Summons Issued. Innovation Rules Inc served on 12/22/2022. (Austin, F.) Modified text on 1/19/2023 (EDS).
January 12, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed NOTICE Proof of Service on 12/22/2022 on Defendant LEPRO Innovation Inc. by Signify Holding B.V., Signify North America Corporation re #8 Summons Issued. Lepro Innovation Inc served on 12/22/2022. (Austin, F.) Modified text on 1/19/2023 (EDS).
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy P. Oczek and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to F. Christopher Austin. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/4/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan L. Gray and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to F. Christopher Austin. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/4/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
January 4, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #10 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Jeremy P. Oczek, by Plaintiffs Signify Holding B.V., Signify North America Corporation. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - MA, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - NY)(Austin, F.)
January 4, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #9 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Jonathan L. Gray, by Plaintiffs Signify Holding B.V., Signify North America Corporation. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Austin, F.)
January 4, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/4/2023. NOTICE OF ACTION REQUIRED. Re: #9 and #10 Verified Petitions do not comply with LR IA 11-2. Counsel failed to provide the signature of the Designated Resident Nevada Counsel on the final page of the petitions. Counsel also incorrectly identified "Plaintiffs" in the field meant for the "name of local counsel" on the final page of the petitions. Counsel is advised to correct the errors and provide the missing signatures in amended petitions, file the amended petitions under the event titled "Notice of Corrected Image/Document," and link the amended petitions to the originally filed petitions within 10 days of this order.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MH)
January 3, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy P. Oczek and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7161115) by Plaintiffs Signify Holding B.V., Signify North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Austin, F.)
January 3, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan L. Gray and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7161104) by Plaintiffs Signify Holding B.V., Signify North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Austin, F.)
December 20, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Home Ever Inc., Innovation Rules Inc., LE Innovation Inc., Lepro Innovation Inc., Letianlighting, Inc. re 1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (KF)
December 20, 2022 Filing 7 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 402.00, receipt number 200001828. (KF)
December 20, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 1 Complaint,,, for attorney F. Christopher Austin, by Plaintiffs Signify Holding B.V., Signify North America Corporation. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Austin, F.)
December 20, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required. Counsel is advised to submit payment for the civil filing fee. Proposed summons will be issued upon receipt of the filing fee. (no image attached) (EDS)
December 20, 2022 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (KF)
December 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jeremy P. Oczek and Jonathan L. Gray to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/3/2023. (no image attached) (KF)
December 19, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (KF)
December 19, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Signify Holding B.V., Signify North America Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Austin, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Signify North America Corporation et al v. Lepro Innovation Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Signify North America Corporation
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Jonathan L. Gray
Represented By: Jeremy P. Oczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Signify Holding B.V.
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Jonathan L. Gray
Represented By: Jeremy P. Oczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lepro Innovation Inc.
Represented By: Akke Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LE Innovation Inc.
Represented By: Akke Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovation Rules Inc.
Represented By: Akke Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Ever Inc.
Represented By: Akke Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letianlighting, Inc.
Represented By: Akke Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?