Brown v. ESA P Portfolio, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Santiel Antario Brown
Defendant: ESA P Portfolio, LLC and ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee doing business as Extended Stay America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv02107
Filed: December 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 1/19/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - certified Docket and Order sent to 8th JD - TRW)
January 18, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO REMAND to State Court by Defendants ESA P Portfolio, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee. (Abbott, Steven) (remand)
January 4, 2023 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants ESA P Portfolio, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee.. (Abbott, Steven)
December 20, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 12/20/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/4/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/19/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
December 20, 2022 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
December 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants ESA P Portfolio, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee dba Extended Stay America. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abbott, Steven)
December 20, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by ESA P Portfolio, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee dba Extended Stay America. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Abbott, Steven)
December 20, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-861562-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7151186) by ESA P Portfolio, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee dba Extended Stay America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Abbott, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 20, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (TRW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. ESA P Portfolio, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiel Antario Brown
Represented By: David Finegold
Represented By: Joshua P Berrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESA P Portfolio, LLC
Represented By: Steven B Abbott
Represented By: Steven L. Foremaster, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee doing business as Extended Stay America, Inc.
Represented By: Steven B Abbott
Represented By: Steven L. Foremaster, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?