Abbott v. Williams et al
Petitioner: David Roy Abbott
Respondent: Brian Williams and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2023cv00558
Filed: April 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE (captioned for 9th Circuit) - Application for a Certificate of Appealability, by David Roy Abbott. (Plaintiff is advised to send pleadings intended for the 9th Circuit directly to the 9th Circuit.) (DRM)
May 19, 2023 Filing 8 USCA, Ninth Circuit Appellate Case Number 23-15767 assigned to #7 Notice of Appeal,. (JQC)
May 18, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to ECF Nos. #5 Order, #6 Judgment, by Petitioner David Roy Abbott. Filing fee NOT paid. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Notice of appeal NEF, and PACER docket sheet attached hereto for distribution to P via HDSP law library.) (Attachments: #1 PACER Docket Sheet for Plaintiff) (DRM)
May 4, 2023 Filing 6 JUDGMENT in a Civil Case pursuant to ECF No. #5 Order dismissing this action without prejudice and denying a certificate of appealability. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 5/4/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Dismissing Writ of Habeas Corpus, Denying Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel, and Closing Case (ECF Nos. #1 , #4 ) - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) and motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #4 ) are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability, as jurists of reason would not find the dismissal of the petition on jurisdictional grounds to be debatable or wrong. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that under Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, the Clerk of Court is directed to add Nevada Attorney General Aaron D. Ford as counsel for respondents and informally serve the Nevada Attorney General by directing a notice of electronic filing of this order to his office. (AG Ford added to docket for e-service.) No response is required from respondents other than to respond to any orders of a reviewing court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter final judgment accordingly, dismissing this action without prejudice, and close this case. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/3/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
April 20, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner David Roy Abbott. (CJS)
April 20, 2023 Filing 3 EXHIBIT 24 to ECF No. #1 -1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner David Roy Abbott. (CJS)
April 13, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Brian Williams, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:23-cv-00558-CDS-VCF. (DLS)
April 13, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner David Roy Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibits, #3 Exhibits, #4 Exhibits)(DLS)
April 13, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbott v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Roy Abbott
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Williams
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?