Taber v. Exemplar Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Daniel P. Taber
Defendant: Exemplar Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00670
Filed: April 28, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge in a Civil Case. (Document restricted under General Order 2021-03.)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Daniel P. Taber. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (CAH)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Daniel P. Taber. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/2/2023. (no image attached) (KF)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Daniel P. Taber. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/24/2023. (no image attached) (KF)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Daniel P. Taber. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/16/2023. (no image attached) (EDS)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 5/23/2023. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (AMM) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/2/2023) (AMM).
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Exemplar Holdings, LLC. (JQC)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Exemplar Holdings, LLC by Daniel P. Taber. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/8/2023. Proof of service due by 7/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt # 3754) (JQC)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (AMA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taber v. Exemplar Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P. Taber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exemplar Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?