Jackson v. Vons Companies, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Jackson
Defendant: Vons Companies, Inc d/b/a Vons Grocery Store, Amigo Mobility International Inc and Vons Companies, Inc. doing business as Vons Grocery Store
Case Number: 2:2023cv00711
Filed: May 5, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (KF)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Stipulated Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 11/20/2023. Motions due by 12/20/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/19/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Vons Companies, Inc... (Brandon, Lewis)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Vons Companies, Inc... (Brandon, Lewis)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Vons Companies, Inc... (Brandon, Lewis)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/8/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/23/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Vons Companies, Inc d/b/a Vons Grocery Store. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Brandon, Lewis)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Vons Companies, Inc d/b/a Vons Grocery Store. (Brandon, Lewis)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-23-867592-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7290716) by Vons Companies, Inc d/b/a Vons Grocery Store. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Brandon, Lewis) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Vons Companies, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Jackson
Represented By: Michael T Nixon
Represented By: Ramzy P Ladah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vons Companies, Inc d/b/a Vons Grocery Store
Represented By: Lewis W. Brandon, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan M Venci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amigo Mobility International Inc
Represented By: Loren S Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vons Companies, Inc. doing business as Vons Grocery Store
Represented By: Lewis W. Brandon, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan M Venci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?