Lux et al v. Buchanan et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Lux, Justin Hymes, Kathy Wadkins, Aaron Mathis, Michael Bates, Rick Gordon and Ishmel Byrd
Defendant: Jordana Buchanan, Zachary Buchanan, Allan Benavides, Lillibeth Benavides, Southwest Concrete Pumping, LLC, AEB Enterprises, LLC, ACJ Consulting, LLC and Top Water Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00839
Filed: May 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Miranda M Du
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (KF)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Stipulated Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 11/27/2023. Motions due by 12/27/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
July 13, 2023 Filing 17 First STIPULATION by Plaintiffs Justin Hymes, Michael Bates, Ishmel Byrd, Rick Gordon, Curtis Lux, Aaron Mathis, Kathy Wadkins. (Trenchak, Philip) (other) (discovery)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying #13 Stipulated Discovery Plan Seeking Special Scheduling Review without prejudice. Amended Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ABG)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying #10 Motion to Stay Discovery and Denying #14 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ABG)
July 5, 2023 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY Pending Outcome of Defendants' Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Defendants ACJ Consulting, LLC, AEB Enterprises, LLC, Allan Benavides, Lillibeth Benavides, Jordana Buchanan, Zachary Buchanan, Southwest Concrete Pumping, LLC, Top Water Holdings, LLC. (Winchester, Jeffrey) (stay) (nondispositive)
July 3, 2023 Filing 13 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER scheduling order by Plaintiffs Justin Hymes, Michael Bates, Ishmel Byrd, Rick Gordon, Curtis Lux, Aaron Mathis, Kathy Wadkins. (Trenchak, Philip) Modified on 7/5/2023 (WJ). Modified on 7/6/2023 (WJ).
June 29, 2023 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendants ACJ Consulting, LLC, AEB Enterprises, LLC, Allan Benavides, Lillibeth Benavides, Jordana Buchanan, Zachary Buchanan, Southwest Concrete Pumping, LLC, Top Water Holdings, LLC.. (Winchester, Jeffrey)
June 27, 2023 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants ACJ Consulting, LLC, AEB Enterprises, LLC, Allan Benavides, Lillibeth Benavides, Jordana Buchanan, Zachary Buchanan, Southwest Concrete Pumping, LLC, Top Water Holdings, LLC. (Winchester, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants ACJ Consulting, LLC, AEB Enterprises, LLC, Allan Benavides, Lillibeth Benavides, Jordana Buchanan, Zachary Buchanan, Southwest Concrete Pumping, LLC, Top Water Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 7/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Exhibit A)(Winchester, Jeffrey)
June 20, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Justin Hymes, Michael Bates, Ishmel Byrd, Rick Gordon, Curtis Lux, Aaron Mathis, Kathy Wadkins. Replies due by 6/27/2023. (Trenchak, Philip)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Court will not conduct an early neutralevaluation in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must terminate the undersigned's designation as the settlement judge in this case and remove the ENE flag. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 6/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
June 6, 2023 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants ACJ Consulting, LLC, AEB Enterprises, LLC, Allan Benavides, Lillibeth Benavides, Jordana Buchanan, Zachary Buchanan, Southwest Concrete Pumping, LLC, Top Water Holdings, LLC.. (Winchester, Jeffrey)
June 6, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants ACJ Consulting, LLC, AEB Enterprises, LLC, Allan Benavides, Lillibeth Benavides, Jordana Buchanan, Zachary Buchanan, Southwest Concrete Pumping, LLC, Top Water Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 6/20/2023. (Winchester, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2023 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants ACJ Consulting, LLC, AEB Enterprises, LLC, Allan Benavides, Lillibeth Benavides, Jordana Buchanan, Zachary Buchanan, Southwest Concrete Pumping, LLC, Top Water Holdings, LLC. (Winchester, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for ENE. (DRM)
May 30, 2023 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
May 30, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/30/2023. By Deputy Clerk: A.Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/14/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
May 30, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by ACJ Consulting, LLC, AEB Enterprises, LLC, Southwest Concrete Pumping, LLC, Top Water Holdings, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Winchester, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-23-864426-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7312959) by AEB Enterprises, LLC, ACJ Consulting, LLC, Lillibeth Benavides, Zachary Buchanan, Jordana Buchanan, Allan Benavides, Southwest Concrete Pumping, LLC, Top Water Holdings, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Winchester, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 30, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (AMMi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lux et al v. Buchanan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Lux
Represented By: Philip J Trenchak
Represented By: Victoria C Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Hymes
Represented By: Philip J Trenchak
Represented By: Victoria C Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Wadkins
Represented By: Philip J Trenchak
Represented By: Victoria C Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Mathis
Represented By: Philip J Trenchak
Represented By: Victoria C Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bates
Represented By: Philip J Trenchak
Represented By: Victoria C Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Gordon
Represented By: Philip J Trenchak
Represented By: Victoria C Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ishmel Byrd
Represented By: Philip J Trenchak
Represented By: Victoria C Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordana Buchanan
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Buchanan
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Benavides
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillibeth Benavides
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Concrete Pumping, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEB Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACJ Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Water Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?