Ohio Security Insurance Company et al v. Hi-Tech Aggregate, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company and The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Hi-Tech Aggregate, LLC and Pavestone, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01094
Filed: July 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Gorlin, Lee)
August 4, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. All Defendants. (Gorlin, Lee)
July 17, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ohio Security Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case.. (Gorlin, Lee)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiffs must file an amended certificate of interested parties by 7/24/2023, fully identifying their citizenship. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
July 14, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
July 13, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ohio Security Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Peerless Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holding Inc., Corporate Parent Ohio Security Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Ohio Casualty Corporation for Ohio Security Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company added.. (Gorlin, Lee)
July 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hi-Tech Aggregate, LLC, Pavestone, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7361735) by Ohio Security Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/23/2023. Proof of service due by 10/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gorlin, Lee) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Security Insurance Company et al v. Hi-Tech Aggregate, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Represented By: Lee H. Gorlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Represented By: Lee H. Gorlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hi-Tech Aggregate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pavestone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?