Wang v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Meizhen Wang
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 2:2023cv01097
Filed: July 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #16 Motion for Leave to File Document/Excess Pages by Plaintiff Meizhen Wang. (Seegmiller, Clark)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to #16 Motion for Leave to File Document/Excess Pages by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. Replies due by 12/11/2023. (Ranalli, George)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Document by Plaintiff Meizhen Wang. Responses due by 12/6/2023. (Seegmiller, Clark) (pleading)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Stipulated Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/21/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Confidentiality Agreement by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.. (Ranalli, George)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE. ERROR as to ECF No. #12 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. The correct event for future filings is 'Jury Demand' located under Case Opening, Initial Pleadings, and Service. No action is needed by counsel as the Clerk will modify the entry. (no image attached) (CJS)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial NOTICE Demand for Jury Trial by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Ranalli, George) Modified on 9/6/2023 (CJS).
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DLS)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No. #9 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/31/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Meizhen Wang.. (Seegmiller, Clark)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Meizhen Wang. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Seegmiller, Clark)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Costco Wholesale Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ranalli, George)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Ranalli, George)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #4 Notice of Corrected Image/Document. This filing does not address the correction needed for the previous Clerk's Notice. All of the state court documents including the complaint are required to be filed with the removal. Counsel is advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #1 . Your petition should be the main document and all state court documents should be an attachment(s).Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) as it appears this the 'Statement regarding removed action' as required by #2 Minute Order in Chambers. Therefore, the wrong event was selected. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #4 using the appropriate event of 'Statement in Removal Case' located under Other Filings>Other Documents. (no image attached) (CJS)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Ranalli, George)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE. ERROR: State Court documents not attached. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #1 . Counsel is advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #1 (Petition and state court documents). (no image attached) (CJS)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/14/2023. By Deputy Clerk: A. Zamora. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/29/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ALZ)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 REFER to ECF No. #6 Notice of Corrected Image/Document - PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-23-872677-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7361907) by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Ranalli, George) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 7/19/2023 (CJS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meizhen Wang
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Represented By: Clark Seegmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: George M. Ranalli
Represented By: John William Kirk
Represented By: Maegun Cristeen Mooso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?