Bang et al v. New Prime, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Young Tae Bang and Eun Ha Joo
Defendant: New Prime, Inc. and Jesus Elias Espinoza
Case Number: 2:2023cv01428
Filed: September 12, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (AMMi)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulated Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 9/4/2024. Motions due by 10/4/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/1/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
October 31, 2023 Filing 12 First Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Young Tae Bang.. (Hua, Michael)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying without prejudice #10 Stipulation re Discovery Plan. An amended discovery plan must be filed by October 31, 2023. This will be the final opportunity to justify special scheduling review. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
October 25, 2023 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION re Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Young Tae Bang. (Hua, Michael) (other) (discovery)
October 23, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/23/2023. Pending before the Court is a joint discovery plan, which seeks extra time for discovery. Docket No. 8. Parties seeking special scheduling review must provide a statement of the reasons why a longer time period is required. Local Rule 26-1(a). The instant discovery plan lacks any such reasoning. Accordingly, the discovery plan is DENIED without prejudice and an amended discovery plan must be filed by October 25, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
October 20, 2023 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION re Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Young Tae Bang. (Hua, Michael) (other) (discovery)
October 19, 2023 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant New Prime, Inc... (Wilson, Karie)
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant New Prime, Inc... (Wilson, Karie)
September 19, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/29/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/3/2023.(Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 13, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 9/13/2023. By Deputy Clerk: A.Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/28/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
September 12, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (AMMi)
September 12, 2023 Filing 3 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant New Prime, Inc... (Wilson, Karie)
September 12, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by New Prime, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Chubb/Ace American Insurance Company for New Prime, Inc. added. (Wilson, Karie)
September 12, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-23-876916-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BNVDC-7424453) by New Prime, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bang et al v. New Prime, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Young Tae Bang
Represented By: Anjan Gewali
Represented By: Michael T. Hua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eun Ha Joo
Represented By: Anjan Gewali
Represented By: Michael T. Hua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Prime, Inc.
Represented By: Karie N. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Elias Espinoza
Represented By: Karie N. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?