Ramos-Quirarte v. Omandac et al
Plaintiff: Lucia Ramos-Quirarte
Defendant: Betty Omandac, Monique Liefert, Amanda Hopkins, Christopher W. Nehls, Shelly Weigert, Nevada Department of Corrections, Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, Division of Water Resources, Betty T. Omandac, Monique K. Liefert, Amanda J. Hopkins, Christopher W. Hehls, Shellyann Weigert, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, Division of Forestry, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Corrections and Kiel B Ireland
Case Number: 2:2023cv01778
Filed: November 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Court will not screen the complaint, and this case will proceed along a standard litigation track. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
December 4, 2023 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery, by Defendants Christopher W. Hehls, Amanda J. Hopkins, Monique K. Liefert, Betty T. Omandac, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, Division of Forestry, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Corrections, Shellyann Weigert. (Claus, Nathan)
December 4, 2023 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Defendants Christopher W. Hehls, Amanda J. Hopkins, Monique K. Liefert, Betty T. Omandac, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, Division of Forestry, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Corrections, Shellyann Weigert.. (Claus, Nathan)
November 29, 2023 Filing 13 SEALED REPLY to Response to #4 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants Christopher W. Hehls, Amanda J. Hopkins, Monique K. Liefert, Betty T. Omandac, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Corrections, Shellyann Weigert. (Ireland, Kiel) Modified on 11/30/2023 per attorney document not sealed. (WJ).
November 29, 2023 Filing 12 INCORRECTLY FILED - See Document 13 - REPLY to Response to #4 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Kiel B Ireland. (Ireland, Kiel) Modified on 11/30/2023 (WJ).
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation TO DISMISS DEFENDANT STATE OF NEVADA DEPARTMENT OF CONSERVATION AND NATURAL RESOURCES, DIVISION OF FORESTRY (NDF). IT IS SO ORDERED The Defendant, the State of Nevada Department of Conservation and Natural Resources Division of Forestry is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/28/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery, by Plaintiff Lucia Ramos-Quirarte. Replies due by 12/4/2023. (Lawrence, Nathan)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO DISMISS Stipulation and Proposed Order to Dismiss Defendant State of Nevada Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, Division of Forestry ("NDF") by Defendants Christopher W. Hehls, Amanda J. Hopkins, Monique K. Liefert, Betty T. Omandac, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, Division of Forestry, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Corrections, Shellyann Weigert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Claus, Nathan) (dismiss)
November 22, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #4 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Lucia Ramos-Quirarte. Replies due by 11/29/2023. (Lawrence, Nathan)
November 17, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE Defendants' Response to Minute Order, Dated November 2, 2023 by Christopher W. Hehls, Amanda J. Hopkins, Monique K. Liefert, Betty T. Omandac, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, Division of Forestry, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Corrections, Shellyann Weigert re #2 Minute Order Removal Case,.. (Claus, Nathan)
November 13, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Christopher W. Hehls, Amanda J. Hopkins, Monique K. Liefert, Betty T. Omandac, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, Division of Forestry, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Corrections, Shellyann Weigert. Responses due by 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Claus, Nathan)
November 13, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lucia Ramos-Quirarte. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Lawrence, Nathan)
November 8, 2023 Filing 4 First MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Amanda J. Hopkins, Monique K. Liefert, Betty T. Omandac, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, Division of Forestry, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Corrections, Shellyann Weigert, Kiel B Ireland. Responses due by 11/22/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/18/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/8/2023. (Ireland, Kiel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 4, 2023 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 2, 2023 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/2/2023. By Deputy Clerk: A. Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/17/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
November 1, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (AMMi)
November 1, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District, Case Number A-23-877214-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7479713) by Amanda Hopkins, Christopher W. Nehls, Nevada Department of Corrections, Shelly Weigert, Betty Omandac, Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, Division of Water Resources, Monique Liefert. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Claus, Nathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos-Quirarte v. Omandac et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Ramos-Quirarte
Represented By: Nathan Edward Lawrence
Represented By: Travis Barrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Omandac
Represented By: Nathan Morgan Claus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monique Liefert
Represented By: Nathan Morgan Claus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Hopkins
Represented By: Nathan Morgan Claus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher W. Nehls
Represented By: Nathan Morgan Claus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Weigert
Represented By: Nathan Morgan Claus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Represented By: Nathan Morgan Claus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, Division of Water Resources
Represented By: Nathan Morgan Claus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty T. Omandac
Represented By: Nathan Morgan Claus
Represented By: Kiel Brunetti Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monique K. Liefert
Represented By: Nathan Morgan Claus
Represented By: Kiel Brunetti Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda J. Hopkins
Represented By: Nathan Morgan Claus
Represented By: Kiel Brunetti Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher W. Hehls
Represented By: Nathan Morgan Claus
Represented By: Kiel Brunetti Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellyann Weigert
Represented By: Nathan Morgan Claus
Represented By: Kiel Brunetti Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, Division of Forestry
Represented By: Nathan Morgan Claus
Represented By: Kiel Brunetti Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Corrections
Represented By: Nathan Morgan Claus
Represented By: Kiel Brunetti Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiel B Ireland
Represented By: Kiel Brunetti Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?