Centeno v. Grierson et al
Plaintiff: Gerold Centeno
Defendant: Steven Grierson, Emily Torres, Joseph Bonaventure Sr., HDSP and NDOC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02131
Filed: December 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2024 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Gerold Centeno. No changes to parties. (DLS)
February 13, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Clerk's Error in First Amended Complaint Filing, by Gerold Centeno. (DLS)
February 6, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Gerold Centeno. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibits)(GA)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. It is therefore ordered that Plaintiff has until March 11, 2024, to either pay the full $405 filing fee or file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three required documents: (1) a completed application with the inmate's two signatures on page 3, (2) a completed financial certificate that is signed both by the inmate and the prison or jail official, and (3) a copy of the inmate's trust fund account statement for the previous six-month period. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP Inmate)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
January 9, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST for Judicial Notice (re ECF No. #1 ), by Plaintiff Gerold Centeno. (DLS)
January 5, 2024 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiff Gerold Centeno. Responses due by 1/19/2024. (DRM)
December 27, 2023 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (GA)
December 26, 2023 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complain, #2 Exhibits) (GA)
December 26, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (GA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centeno v. Grierson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerold Centeno
Represented By: Law Library - High Desert State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Grierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bonaventure Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDSP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?