Jak Logistics, Inc. v. Stevens Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: JAK LOGISTICS, INC. and Jak Logistics, Inc
Defendant: Stevens Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00413
Filed: February 29, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Filing 7 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #6 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default, by Plaintiff Jak Logistics, Inc. (Stipp, Mitchell)
April 25, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant, Stevens Transport, Inc. by Plaintiff Jak Logistics, Inc. Responses due by 5/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mitchell Stipp in Support of Application for Entry of Default)(Stipp, Mitchell)
April 24, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jak Logistics, Inc. Stevens Transport, Inc. served on 3/6/2024. (Stipp, Mitchell)
March 4, 2024 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
March 4, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stevens Transport, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (CT)
March 4, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (CT)
February 29, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by JAK LOGISTICS, INC.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Stipp, Mitchell)
February 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAK LOGISTICS, INC. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7603686) by JAK LOGISTICS, INC.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/10/2024. Proof of service due by 5/29/2024. (Stipp, Mitchell) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jak Logistics, Inc. v. Stevens Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAK LOGISTICS, INC.
Represented By: Mitchell D. Stipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jak Logistics, Inc
Represented By: Mitchell D. Stipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?