Triple Braided Cord Trust v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Petitioner: Triple Braided Cord Trust and Julie Embry doing business as Triple Braided Cord Trust
Respondent: Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper and MTC Financial doing business as Trustee Corp, et al
Case Number: 2:2024cv00841
Filed: May 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1471 Declaratory & Injunctive Relief - Foreclo
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Filing 10 THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Julie Embry. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/12/2024. (no image attached) (KMB)
May 28, 2024 Filing 9 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Julie Embry. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/4/2024. (no image attached) (KMB)
May 20, 2024 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Julie Embry. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/27/2024. (no image attached) (KMB)
May 9, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MTC Financial, Nationstar Mortgage LLC re #3 Complaint. (JQC)
May 9, 2024 Filing 6 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Christy K Packer. (JQC)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Julie Embry d/b/a Triple Braided Cord Trust's second emergency motion for a preliminary injunction (ECF No. #4 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff must still SHOW CAUSE by May 20, 2024, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to obtain proper legal representation. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
May 8, 2024 Filing 4 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Petitioner Julie Embry. Responses due by 5/22/2024. (CAH)
May 8, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against MTC Financial, Nationstar Mortgage LLC by Julie Embry. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/18/2024. Proof of service due by 8/6/2024. (CAH)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by May 20, 2024, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to file a complaint or obtain proper legal representation. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/6/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
May 3, 2024 Filing 1 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Petitioner Triple Braided Cord Trust. Responses due by 5/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Receipt of Payment)(CAH)
May 3, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (CAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triple Braided Cord Trust v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Triple Braided Cord Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julie Embry doing business as Triple Braided Cord Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MTC Financial doing business as Trustee Corp, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?