Divens v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Emile Divens
Defendant: Liang, Arrey, Moreano, Julie Williams and M. Stuart
Case Number: 2:2024cv00942
Filed: May 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2024 Filing 5 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants, Arrey, Liang, Moreano, Julie Williams, M. Stuart, and against Plaintiff, Emile Divens. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 7/17/2024. (For Distribution by law library.)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. It is therefore ordered that this action is dismissed without prejudice based on Divens's failure to file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full $405 filing fee in compliance with the magistrate judge's June 3, 2024, order. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. No other documents may be filed in this now-closed case. If Divens wishes to pursue his claims, he must file a complaint in a new case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/17/2024. (For Distribution by law library.)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. It is therefore ordered that Plaintiff has until July 3, 2024, to either pay the full $405 filing fee or file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three required documents: (1) a completed application with the inmate's two signatures on page 3, (2) a completed financial certificate that is signed both by the inmate and the prison or jail official, and (3) a copy of the inmate's trust fund account statement for the previous six-month period. Plaintiff is cautioned that this action will be subject to dismissal without prejudice if Plaintiff fails to timely comply with this order. A dismissal without prejudice allows Plaintiff to refile the case with the Court, under a new case number, when Plaintiff can file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the required filing fee. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff Emile Divens the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis for an inmate and instructions for the same and retain the complaint (ECF No. #1 ) but not file it at this time. Payment of filing fees due 7/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Information for Filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by an Inmate)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG) (For Distribution by law library.)
May 20, 2024 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (For Distribution by law library.) (DLS)
May 20, 2024 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DLS)
May 20, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Divens v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emile Divens
Represented By: Law Library - High Desert State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?