H. v. Wynn Las Vegas, LLC et al
Plaintiff: A. H.
Defendant: Wynn Resorts Limited, Wynn Resorts Finance, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas, LLC, Wynn America Group, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas Holdings, LLC, CityCenter Land, LLC, Aria Resort & Casino Holdings, LLC, Wynn Resorts Holding, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, Venetian Gaming Las Vegas LLC, New York New York Hotel & Casino, LLC doing business as New York New York Hotel and Casino, Ace A Propco LLC, Venetian Casino Resort, LLC doing business as The Venetian Las Vegas, Las Vegas Sands, LLC doing business as The Venetian Las Vegas and Aria Resort & Casino, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv01041
Filed: June 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Stipulation To Extend Deadlines For Plaintiff To File Her Oppositions To Defendants' #41 , #42 and #43 Motions to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/5/2024 and 8/12/2024. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/22/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE HER OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS (ECF NO(S) 41, 42, 43) by Plaintiff A. H.. (Blankenship, Brian) (extend) (sumjgm)
July 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Venetian Gaming Las Vegas LLC. Responses due by 7/29/2024. (Gayan, Michael)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Wynn America Group, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas Holdings, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas, LLC, Wynn Resorts Finance, LLC, Wynn Resorts Holding, LLC, Wynn Resorts Limited. Responses due by 7/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration))(Perry, Nicole)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Aria Resort & Casino Holdings, LLC, Aria Resort & Casino, LLC, CityCenter Land, LLC, MGM Resorts International, New York New York Hotel & Casino, LLC. Responses due by 7/22/2024. (Ryan, Robert)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Aria Resort & Casino, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ryan, Robert)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Aria Resort & Casino Holdings, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ryan, Robert)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by MGM Resorts International. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ryan, Robert)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by New York New York Hotel & Casino, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ryan, Robert)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by CityCenter Land, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ryan, Robert)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Stipulation To Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #1 Petition for Removal. Las Vegas Sands, LLC and Venetian Casino Resort, LLC answer due 7/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/8/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
July 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendants Wynn America Group, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas Holdings, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas, LLC, Wynn Resorts Finance, LLC, Wynn Resorts Holding, LLC, Wynn Resorts Limited. (Perry, Nicole)
July 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) Venetian Casino Resort, LLC and Las Vegas Sands, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Venetian Casino Resort, LLC. (Gayan, Michael) (extend) (answer)
July 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert A. Ryan on behalf of Defendant Ace A Propco LLC. (Ryan, Robert)
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission for David S. Sager to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Venetian Casino and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Michael J. Gavan. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/3/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission for Kyle T. Orne to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Venetian Casino Resort, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Michael J. Gavan. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/3/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Las Vegas Sands, LLC, Venetian Casino Resort, LLC. (Gayan, Michael)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #22 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Ellen Dew for MGM Resorts International, New York New York Hotel & Casino, LLC., Aria Resort & Casino, LLC., Aria Resort & Casino Holdings, LLC., and CityCenter Land, LLC., and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Robert Ryan. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/20/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #20 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Allison McQueen for Wynn Las Vegas, LLC., Wynn Las Vegas Holdings, LLC., Wynn America Group, LLC., Wynn Resorts Finance, LLC., Wyn Resorts Holdings, LLC., and Wynn Resorts Limited and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Dawn L. Davis. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/20/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #19 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Bethany K. Biesenthal for Wynn Las Vegas, LLC., Wynn Las Vegas Holdings, LLC., Wynn America Group, LLC., Wynn Resorts Finance, LLC., Wyn Resorts Holdings, LLC., and Wynn Resorts Limited and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Dawn L. Davis. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/20/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM) Modified on 6/20/2024 (MAM).
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #18 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Nicole M. Perry for Wynn Las Vegas, LLC., Wynn Las Vegas Holdings, LLC., Wynn America Group, LLC., Wynn Resorts Finance, LLC., Wyn Resorts Holdings, LLC., and Wynn Resorts Limited and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Dawn L. Davis. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/20/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
June 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ellen E. Dew and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert A. Ryan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7722726) by Defendants Aria Resort & Casino, LLC, CityCenter Land, LLC, MGM Resorts International, New York New York Hotel & Casino, LLC. (Ryan, Robert)
June 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert A. Ryan on behalf of Defendants Aria Resort & Casino, LLC, CityCenter Land, LLC, MGM Resorts International, New York New York Hotel & Casino, LLC. (Ryan, Robert)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Kimberly L. Adams for A.H. and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Brian Blankenship. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/18/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew D. Schultz for A.H. and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Brian Blankenship. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/18/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Allison L. McQueen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Dawn L. Davis (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7722647) by Defendants Wynn America Group, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas Holdings, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas, LLC, Wynn Resorts Finance, LLC, Wynn Resorts Holding, LLC, Wynn Resorts Limited. (McQueen, Allison)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Bethany K. Biesenthal and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Dawn L. Davis (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7722646) by Defendants Wynn America Group, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas Holdings, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas, LLC, Wynn Resorts Finance, LLC, Wynn Resorts Holding, LLC, Wynn Resorts Limited. (Biesenthal, Bethany)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Nicole M. Perry and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Dawn L. Davis (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7722640) by Defendants Wynn America Group, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas Holdings, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas, LLC, Wynn Resorts Finance, LLC, Wynn Resorts Holding, LLC, Wynn Resorts Limited. (Perry, Nicole)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wynn America Group, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas Holdings, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas, LLC, Wynn Resorts Finance, LLC, Wynn Resorts Holding, LLC, Wynn Resorts Limited. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Davis, Dawn)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dawn L. Davis on behalf of Defendants Wynn America Group, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas Holdings, LLC, Wynn Las Vegas, LLC, Wynn Resorts Finance, LLC, Wynn Resorts Holding, LLC, Wynn Resorts Limited. (Davis, Dawn)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David S. Sager and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael Gayan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7721675) by Defendants Las Vegas Sands, LLC, Venetian Casino Resort, LLC. (Gayan, Michael)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kyle T. Orne and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael Gayan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7721665) by Defendants Las Vegas Sands, LLC, Venetian Casino Resort, LLC. (Gayan, Michael)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE Defendant Venetian Casino Resort, LLC and Las Vegas Sands, LLC's Notice of Compliance with Minute Order by Las Vegas Sands, LLC, Venetian Casino Resort, LLC re #3 Minute Order Removal Case,. (Gayan, Michael)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly L. Adams and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian Blankenship (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7720519) by Plaintiff A. H.. (Blankenship, Brian)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matthew D. Shultz and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian Blankenship (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7719958) by Plaintiff A. H.. (Blankenship, Brian)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Motion To Extend Deadline For Certain Defendants To Respond To Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Denying as moot #7 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time. Defendants Aria Resort & Casino Holdings, LLC., Aria Resort & Casino, LLC., CityCenter Land, LLC., Las Vegas Sands, LLC., MGM Resorts International, New York New York Hotel & Casino, LLC., Venetian Casino Resort, LLC., Wynn America Group, LLC., Wynn Las Vegas Holdings, LLC., Wynn Las Vegas, LLC., Wynn Resorts Finance, LLC., Wynn Resorts Holding, LLC. and Wynn Resorts Limited answer due 7/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Amended MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) Amended Joint Motion and Proposed Order to Extend Deadline for Certain Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Las Vegas Sands, LLC, Venetian Casino Resort, LLC. Responses due by 6/26/2024. (Gayan, Michael) (answer)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/11/2024. Pending before the Court is a joint motion to extend the deadline to respond to the complaint. Docket No. 7. The joint motion does not explain why more time is needed. But see Local Rule IA 6-1(a) (requiring requests for extension to state the reason(s) why the extension is sought). Accordingly, the parties must file a notice of corrected image with that information by June 12, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) Joint Motion and Proposed Order to Extend Deadline for Certain Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Las Vegas Sands, LLC, Venetian Casino Resort, LLC. Responses due by 6/24/2024. (Gayan, Michael) (answer)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by A. H.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Blankenship, Brian)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Kimberly L. Adams, Matthew D. Schultz, Allison L. McQueen, Bethany K. Biesenthal, Nicole M. Perry, Angela C. Agrusa, Ellen Dew, David S. Sager and Kyle T. Orne to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 6/19/2024. (no image attached) (MAM)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/5/2024. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/20/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/5/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MAM)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Las Vegas Sands, LLC, Venetian Casino Resort, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gayan, Michael)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-24-888768-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7705588) by Venetian Casino Resort, LLC, Las Vegas Sands, LLC. Proof of service due by 8/6/2024. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Gayan, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H. v. Wynn Las Vegas, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynn Resorts Limited
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Byrne
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Represented By: Dawn L. Davis
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Allison L. McQueen
Represented By: Allison L. McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynn Resorts Finance, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Byrne
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Represented By: Dawn L. Davis
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Allison L. McQueen
Represented By: Allison L. McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynn Las Vegas, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Byrne
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Represented By: Dawn L. Davis
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Allison L. McQueen
Represented By: Allison L. McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynn America Group, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Byrne
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Represented By: Dawn L. Davis
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Allison L. McQueen
Represented By: Allison L. McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynn Las Vegas Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Byrne
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Represented By: Dawn L. Davis
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Allison L. McQueen
Represented By: Allison L. McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CityCenter Land, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Ryan
Represented By: Ellen E. Dew
Represented By: Ellen E. Dew
Represented By: Angela C. Agrusa
Represented By: Angela C. Agrusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aria Resort & Casino Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Ryan
Represented By: Ellen E. Dew
Represented By: Ellen E. Dew
Represented By: Angela C. Agrusa
Represented By: Angela C. Agrusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynn Resorts Holding, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Byrne
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Represented By: Dawn L. Davis
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Allison L. McQueen
Represented By: Allison L. McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Robert A. Ryan
Represented By: Ellen E. Dew
Represented By: Ellen E. Dew
Represented By: Angela C. Agrusa
Represented By: Angela C. Agrusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venetian Gaming Las Vegas LLC
Represented By: Michael J Gayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York New York Hotel & Casino, LLC doing business as New York New York Hotel and Casino
Represented By: Robert A. Ryan
Represented By: Ellen E. Dew
Represented By: Ellen E. Dew
Represented By: Angela C. Agrusa
Represented By: Angela C. Agrusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace A Propco LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venetian Casino Resort, LLC doing business as The Venetian Las Vegas
Represented By: Michael J Gayan
Represented By: Kyle T. Orne
Represented By: Kyle T. Orne
Represented By: David Sager
Represented By: David Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Sands, LLC doing business as The Venetian Las Vegas
Represented By: Michael J Gayan
Represented By: Kyle T. Orne
Represented By: Kyle T. Orne
Represented By: David Sager
Represented By: David Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aria Resort & Casino, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Ryan
Represented By: Ellen E. Dew
Represented By: Ellen E. Dew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. H.
Represented By: Sean K Claggett
Represented By: Scott E Lundy
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: Kim Lambert Adams
Represented By: Kim Lambert Adams
Represented By: Brian Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?