Halloum et al v. Wells Fargo Nationa et al
Plaintiff: Yousif H. Halloum and Iman Y. Halloum
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Clear Recon Corp and Wells Fargo Nationa
Case Number: 2:2024cv01077
Filed: June 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #26 Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Wells Fargo Bank's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the ruling on the Motion to Dismiss does not dispose of this case in its entirety, the parties must file a discovery plan and scheduling order no later than fourteen (14) days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/8/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
August 8, 2024 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to #26 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery, #36 Motion by Defendant Wells Fargo Nationa. (Lustig, Jennifer)
August 6, 2024 Filing 37 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jennifer Belew Lustig. Address updated to 1700 South Pavilion Center Drive Suite 700 Las Vegas, NV 89135 . (Lustig, Jennifer)
July 26, 2024 Filing 36 First MOTION IN OPPOSITION FOR THE COURT TO DECIDE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE BEFORE DISCOVERY by Plaintiffs Iman Y. Halloum, Yousif H. Halloum. Responses due by 8/9/2024. (Halloum, Yousif) (misc) (presiding)
July 25, 2024 Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/25/2024. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago.Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion in Opposition for the Court to Decide Dismissal of the Case Before Discovery. ECF No. #31 . It appears Plaintiffs' submission is in opposition to Defendant Wells Fargo Bank's Motion to Stay Discovery (ECF No. #26 ). The Motion was also improperly filed ex parte. LR IA 7-2(b) states: "Neither party nor an attorney for any party may make an ex parte communication except as specifically permitted by court order or the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. An ex parte motion or application must articulate the rule that permits ex parte filing and explain why it is filed on an ex parte basis." Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion in Opposition for the Court to Decide Dismissal of the Case Before Discovery (ECF No. #31 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs must refile their document on the docket as their Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The document must not be filed ex parte. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
July 25, 2024 Filing 34 REPLY to #32 Supplement by Plaintiffs Iman Y. Halloum, Yousif H. Halloum. (Halloum, Yousif) Modified on 7/25/2024 #26 (WJ).
July 25, 2024 Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/25/2024. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago. Pending before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw (ECF No. #28 ) their filings at ECF Nos. #23 and #24 . On July 24, 2024, the Court denied ECF No. #24 as indecipherable. See ECF No. 25 . Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw (ECF No. #28 ) filings at ECF Nos. #23 and #24 is DENIED as to ECF No. #23 because the Motion is moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw Plaintiffs' filing at ECF No. #23 is GRANTED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
July 25, 2024 Filing 32 SUPPLEMENT to #26 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery Pending Ruling on Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Defendant Wells Fargo Nationa (Lustig, Jennifer)
July 25, 2024 Filing 31 First EX PARTE MOTION ex parte motion in Opposition for the court to decide dismissal of the case before discovery. by Plaintiffs Iman Y. Halloum, Yousif H. Halloum. (Halloum, Yousif) (discovery)
July 25, 2024 Filing 30 NON-OPPOSITION to #29 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Defendant Wells Fargo Nationa. (Lustig, Jennifer)
July 24, 2024 Filing 29 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) 30 days from August 2, 24 thru September 2, 24 re #18 Request for Judicial Notice, #17 Motion to Dismiss, #19 Appendix, #20 Appendix, #22 Minute Order regarding Requirements of Klingele, by Plaintiffs Iman Y. Halloum, Yousif H. Halloum. Responses due by 8/7/2024. (Halloum, Yousif) (sumjgm)
July 24, 2024 Filing 28 First MOTION Motion to withdraw doc. 23 and doc. 24 by Plaintiffs Iman Y. Halloum, Yousif H. Halloum. Responses due by 8/7/2024. (Halloum, Yousif) (misc) (answer)
July 24, 2024 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/24/2024. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago. The Court is in receipt of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank's Motion to Stay Discovery (ECF No. #26 ). Understanding the history of the dispute that underlies the instant matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Wells Fargo Bank must, in accordance with Local Rules and case law interpreting the same, file a supplement to its Motion that explains why Defendant believes meeting and conferring is futile or describes the meet and confer process that preceded the filing. The supplement must be filed no later than July 29, 2024. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
July 24, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Wells Fargo Nationa. Responses due by 8/7/2024. (Lustig, Jennifer)
July 24, 2024 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/24/2024. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago.Pending before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion the title and content of which is indecipherable. ECF No. #24 . The Court cannot discern what Plaintiffs seek or on what basis.Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion (ECF No. #24 ) is DENIED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
July 23, 2024 Filing 24 First MOTION Must incllude Also the Reply to doc 22. by Plaintiffs Iman Y. Halloum, Yousif H. Halloum. Responses due by 8/6/2024. (Halloum, Yousif) (misc) (answer)
July 23, 2024 Filing 23 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) 30 days from August 2, 24 thru September 2, 24 re #18 Request for Judicial Notice, #20 Appendix, #17 Motion to Dismiss, #19 Appendix, by Plaintiffs Iman Y. Halloum, Yousif H. Halloum. Responses due by 8/6/2024. (Halloum, Yousif) (sumjgm)
July 22, 2024 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/22/2024. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #17 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
July 19, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kelly H Dove on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo Nationa. (Dove, Kelly)
July 19, 2024 Filing 20 APPENDIX 2 OF 2 to #18 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendant Wells Fargo Nationa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R, #2 Exhibit S, #3 Exhibit T, #4 Exhibit U, #5 Exhibit V, #6 Exhibit W, #7 Exhibit X, #8 Exhibit Y)(Lustig, Jennifer) Modified on 7/19/2024 #17 (WJ).
July 19, 2024 Filing 19 APPENDIX 1 OF 2 to #18 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendant Wells Fargo Nationa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Lustig, Jennifer) Modified on 7/19/2024 #17 (WJ).
July 19, 2024 Filing 18 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #17 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Wells Fargo Nationa. (Lustig, Jennifer)
July 19, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Wells Fargo Nationa. Responses due by 8/2/2024. (Lustig, Jennifer)
July 16, 2024 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/16/2024. By Law Clerk: C. Denbow Pending before the Court is Wells Fargo's Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed on July 10, 2024. ECF No. #10 . No timely response to this Motion was filed. Under Local Rule 7-2(d), the Court may treat the failure to file an opposition to a motion as consent to grant the motion.Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. #10 ) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Wells Fargo's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due no later than July 19, 2024. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMD)
July 15, 2024 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/15/2024. Before the Court is the Motion for Consent for Electronic Service of Documents. ECF No. 13. Plaintiff says he filed with the Court the Consent for Electronic Service of Documents in person on July 10, 2024 but as of July 12, 2024 it had not been docketed. Id. A review of the docket shows the Consent for Electronic Service of Documents was entered in this case on July 12, 2024. ECF No. 12. Thus, the instant Motion is denied as moot.Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Consent for Electronic Service of Documents (ECF No. 13) is DENIED as moot. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG)
July 12, 2024 Filing 14 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Yousif H. Halloum. (ALZ) Modified on 7/15/2024 (ALZ).
July 12, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiffs Iman Y. Halloum, Yousif H. Halloum. Responses due by 7/26/2024. (ALZ)
July 10, 2024 Filing 12 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Yousif H. Halloum. (MAM)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #9 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. IT IS FURTHER ORDER that the Clerk of Court must send Plaintiffs the form Consent for Electronic Service of Documents and instructions for the same. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs must submit the Consent for Electronic Service of Documents to the Clerk of Court on or before July 31 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are not authorized to file electronically until the Consent form is submitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
July 1, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Wells Fargo Nationa. Responses due by 7/15/2024. (Lustig, Jennifer) (answer)
June 27, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically by Plaintiffs Iman Y. Halloum, Yousif H. Halloum. Responses due by 7/11/2024. (ALZ)
June 27, 2024 Filing 8 REPLY to 7 QC Notice by Plaintiffs Iman Y. Halloum, Yousif H. Halloum. (ALZ)
June 20, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by ousif H. Halloum; Iman Y Halloum. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/27/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
June 13, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Plaintiffs Are Not Proceeding in Forma Pauperis by Iman Y. Halloum, Yousif H. Halloum. (ALZ)
June 11, 2024 Filing 5 EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Iman Y. Halloum, Yousif H. Halloum. (ALZ)
June 11, 2024 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 11, 2024 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ALZ)
June 10, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Clear Recon Corp, Wells Fargo Nationa, Wilmington Savings Fund Society re #1 Complaint. (ALZ)
June 10, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Clear Recon Corp, Wells Fargo Nationa, Wilmington Savings Fund Society (Filing fee $405 - PAID) by Yousif H. Halloum, Iman Y. Halloum. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/20/2024. Proof of service due by 9/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt No. 200009674) (ALZ)
June 10, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (ALZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halloum et al v. Wells Fargo Nationa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Nationa
Represented By: Jennifer Belew Lustig
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yousif H. Halloum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iman Y. Halloum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?