Lowery v. Lombardo
Plaintiff: Brandon Dale Lowery
Defendant: Joe Lombardo
Case Number: 2:2024cv01117
Filed: June 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandon Dale Lowery. (ALZ)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to send Plaintiff the approved short form application to proceed in forma pauperis for a non-inmate as well as its instructions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before July 18, 2024, Plaintiff will either pay the full $405 filing fee for a civil action (which includes the $350 filing fee and the $55 administrative fee) or file with the Court a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis on this Court's approved form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff does not file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full $405 filing fee for a civil action on or before July 18, 2024, the Court will recommend dismissal of this action. IFP or payment of filing fees due 7/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 6/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Information for Filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
June 17, 2024 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ALZ)
June 10, 2024 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ALZ)
June 10, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (ALZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowery v. Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Dale Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?