App-Order LLC v. Reynolds
Plaintiff: App-Order LLC doing business as Zorts Sports
Defendant: Harold C. Reynolds
Case Number: 2:2024cv01480
Filed: August 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2024 Filing 15 ERRATA to #11 Summons Issued, #14 Summons Returned Executed by Plaintiff App-Order LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shipley, Aaron)
September 10, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by App-Order LLC. Harold C. Reynolds served on 9/9/2024. (Kay, Rory)
August 14, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/14/2024. Re: #8 Motion to Seal. Having reviewed Plaintiff's motion to seal, which seeks to protect limited information that it anticipates Defendant will consider confidential, the Court finds that Plaintiff has met the good cause standard. Kamakana v. City and County of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172 (9th Cir. 2006); Ctr. for Auto Safety v. Chrysler Group, LLC, 809 F.3d 1092 (9th Cir. 2016). The Court thus GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to seal (ECF No. #8 ) and will retain the unredacted motion to compel and complete appendix to that motion under seal. (ECF Nos. 6 and 7 ). However, this sealing order is only preliminary and is only based on Plaintiff's assertion that Defendant might consider these documents confidential. If Defendant wishes to maintain the documents under seal, he must file a declaration providing good cause to keep these items under seal within thirty days of his appearance in this case. If Defendant does not file a timely declaration providing this good cause and citing to the Ninth Circuit standards in Kamakana and Ctr. for Auto Safety, the Court will order the documents unsealed. Because Defendant has not yet appeared in this action, but the parties' counsel appears to have been in communication, Plaintiff is directed to provide Defendant notice of this minute order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
August 14, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harold C. Reynolds re #1 Complaint. (CAH)
August 13, 2024 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff App-Order LLC. (Kay, Rory)
August 13, 2024 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 13, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Seal Document, #5 Appendix, #1 Complaint,, #4 Motion to Compel, by Plaintiff App-Order LLC. Responses due by 8/27/2024. (Kay, Rory)
August 13, 2024 Filing 5 APPENDIX to #4 Motion to Compel by Plaintiff App-Order LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit)(Kay, Rory)
August 13, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Plaintiff App-Order LLC. Responses due by 8/27/2024. (Kay, Rory) (arbitration)
August 12, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (AMMi)
August 12, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff App-Order LLC, a Nevada limited liability company DBA Zorts Sports. (Kay, Rory)
August 12, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by App-Order LLC, a Nevada limited liability company DBA Zorts Sports that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Kay, Rory)
August 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harold C. Reynolds (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7775954) by App-Order LLC, a Nevada limited liability company DBA Zorts Sports. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 8/22/2024. Proof of service due by 11/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kay, Rory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: App-Order LLC v. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold C. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: App-Order LLC doing business as Zorts Sports
Represented By: Rory T Kay
Represented By: Katrina Weil
Represented By: John A. Fortin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?