Phanthay et al v. Circus Circus Hotel & Casino et al
Plaintiff: Nantha Phanathay, Phat Sounnakhone, Vongphachanh Phoumy and Sysongkham Phanthay
Defendant: Circus Circus Hotel & Casino
Case Number: 2:2024cv01558
Filed: August 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Circus Circus Hotel & Casino re #11 Complaint. (AMMi - USM)
September 9, 2024 Filing 11 COMPLAINT against Circus Circus Hotel & Casino, Circus Circus Las Vegas, Phil Ruffin by Phat Sounnakhone, Sysongkham Phanthay, Nantha Phanathay, Vongphachanh Phoumy. Circus Circus Las Vegas, Phil Ruffin dismissed with leave to amend on 9/9/24 per #10 Screening Order. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/19/2024. Proof of service due by 12/8/2024. (AMMi)
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCREENING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #1 , #2 , #3 , #4 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis are GRANTED. Plaintiffs are permitted to maintain this action to conclusion without prepaying fees or costs or giving security for them. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must detach and separately file Plaintiff's #1 -1 complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that breach of contract claim may proceed against Circus Circus Hotel & Casino. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that remaining defendants are dismissed with leave to amend. Should Plaintiff wish to amend their complaint they must do so by October 10, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue a summons for Circus Circus Hotel & Casino. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court kindly do the following: - Send each Plaintiff: 1. a copy of this order; and 2. a copy of the Form USM-285. - Send the United States Marshals Service ("USMS"): 1. a copy of Plaintiffs' #1 -1 complaint; 2. the summons for Circus Circus Hotel & Casino, and 3. a copy of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have until October 10, 2024, to send their completed Form USM-285 to the USMS where they must list defendant's last known address. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the USM shall attempt service on defendant within 21 days after receipt of the USM-285 Form from Plaintiffs. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/9/2024. (copy of complaint sent to P) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi - cc: documents to P and USM per Order)
August 26, 2024 Filing 9 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (RJDG)
August 26, 2024 Filing 8 OPTION TO DECLINE MAGISTRATE JUDGE OVERSEEING YOUR CASE. The attached form must be filed in the docket or received by the Clerk within 21 days of your first appearance in the case should you choose to decline consent. (A copy of the form has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (RJDG)
August 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GENERAL ORDER 2023-11 IN RE: CONSENT AND REFERRALS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGES UNDER 28 U.S.C. 636. (A copy of the General Order has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (RJDG)
August 23, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Plaintiffs Nantha Phanathay, Sysongkham Phanthay, Vongphachanh Phoumy, Phat Sounnakhone re #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #2 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Object: USB Drive, manually filed with the Clerk's Office. (RJDG)
August 23, 2024 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiffs Nantha Phanathay, Sysongkham Phanthay, Vongphachanh Phoumy, Phat Sounnakhone. (RJDG)
August 23, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Nantha Phanathay. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RJDG)
August 23, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Vongphachanh Phoumy. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RJDG) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/26/2024) (RJDG).
August 23, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Phat Sounnakhone. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RJDG) Modified on 8/26/2024 to edit docket text. NEF regenerated. (RJDG)
August 23, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sysongkham Phanthay. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RJDG)
August 23, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RJDG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phanthay et al v. Circus Circus Hotel & Casino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nantha Phanathay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phat Sounnakhone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vongphachanh Phoumy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sysongkham Phanthay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circus Circus Hotel & Casino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?