Piroozshad v. BJ's Restaurants, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Janet Piroozshad
Defendant: BJ's Restaurants, Inc. and BJ's Restaurant Operations Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv01962
Filed: October 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ALZ)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER Granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/21/2025. Motions due by 5/21/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/20/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/18/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
November 15, 2024 Filing 9 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Janet Piroozshad. (Boyer, Brian)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. On October 24, 2024, the Court ordered the parties to file a discovery plan by November 12, 2024. Docket No. #6 . The parties violated that order. The Court again orders the parties to file a discovery plan, this time by November 15, 2024. FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY RESULT IN SANCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/13/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
November 4, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Janet Piroozshad. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Boyer, Brian)
October 30, 2024 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants BJ's Restaurant Operations Company, BJ's Restaurants, Inc.. (Burden, Jack)
October 24, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by BJ's Restaurant Operations Company, BJ's Restaurants, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent BJ's Restaurants, Inc [California], Other Affiliate BJ's Restaurant Operations Company [California], Other Affiliate BJ's Restaurant Operations Company of Kansas, LLC [Kansas], Other Affiliate BJROC Maryland, LLC [California] for BJ's Restaurant Operations Company, BJ's Restaurants, Inc. added. (Burden, Jack)
October 24, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Minutes of the Court dated October 23, 2024 by BJ's Restaurant Operations Company, BJ's Restaurants, Inc. re #2 Minute Order Removal Case,. (Burden, Jack)
October 24, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/2024. An answer was filed in state court prior to removal. Docket No. 1-8. The parties must file a joint proposed discovery plan by November 12, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YIS)
October 23, 2024 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/23/2024. By Deputy Clerk: ALZ. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/7/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/22/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
October 21, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ALZ)
October 21, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-24-901025-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7846681) by BJ's Restaurant Operations Company, BJ's Restaurants, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/31/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet, #2 Index Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H) (Burden, Jack) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piroozshad v. BJ's Restaurants, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJ's Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Jack P. Burden
Represented By: Jacquelyn Michelle Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJ's Restaurant Operations Company
Represented By: Jacquelyn Michelle Franco
Represented By: Jack P. Burden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Piroozshad
Represented By: Brian M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?