SATA GmbH & Co. KG v. Taizhou Tool-Bar Machinery Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: SATA GmbH & Co. KG
Defendant: Taizhou Tool-Bar Machinery Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2024cv02069
Filed: November 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jefferson C. Deery for Taizhou Tool-Bar Machinery Co., Ltd. and approving Designation of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 12/27/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amber N. Davis for Taizhou Tool-Bar Machinery Co., Ltd. and approving Designation of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 12/27/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss #9 . Based on the parties' stipulation, the deadline for plaintiff to respond to the motion to dismiss is extended to January 16, 2025. Defendant's reply is due on or before January 23, 2025. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 12/23/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
December 20, 2024 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Response and Proposed Order re #9 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. (Everage, Kevin) (extend)
December 19, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jefferson C. Deery and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7903487) by Defendant Taizhou Tool-Bar Machinery Co., Ltd.. (Austin, F.)
December 19, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Amber N. Davis and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7903473) by Defendant Taizhou Tool-Bar Machinery Co., Ltd.. (Austin, F.)
December 19, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Taizhou Tool-Bar Machinery Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 1/2/2025. (Austin, F.)
December 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #6 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline. Taizhou Tool-Bar Machinery Co., Ltd. answer due 12/19/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/3/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG) Modified on 12/4/2024 to correct docket text. NEF regenerated. (RJDG)
December 3, 2024 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
November 27, 2024 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadline for Defendant's Response to the Complaint by Plaintiff SATA GmbH & Co. KG. Responses due by 12/11/2024. (Everage, Kevin) (answer)
November 15, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SATA GmbH & Co. KG re #4 Summons Issued. Taizhou Tool-Bar Machinery Co., Ltd. served on 11/7/2024. (Caloiaro, Steven)
November 7, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Taizhou Tool-Bar Machinery Co., Ltd. re #1 Complaint. (AMMi)
November 7, 2024 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (AMMi)
November 5, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (AMMi)
November 5, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by SATA GmbH & Co. KG. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Caloiaro, Steven)
November 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Taizhou Tool-Bar Machinery Co., Ltd. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7862006) by SATA GmbH & Co. KG. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/15/2024. Proof of service due by 2/3/2025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - A true and correct copy of registration certificate for 2793583, #2 Exhibit B - A true and correct screenshot, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Caloiaro, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SATA GmbH & Co. KG v. Taizhou Tool-Bar Machinery Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SATA GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By: Steven Anthony Caloiaro
Represented By: Kevin D. Everage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taizhou Tool-Bar Machinery Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Jefferson C. Deery
Represented By: Jefferson C. Deery
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Amber N. Davis
Represented By: Amber N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?