Hayes v. Russell Road Food and Beverage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trinity Hayes
Defendant: Nando Soutillio and Russell Road Food and Beverage, LLC doing business as Crazy Horse 3 Gentlemen's Club
Case Number: 2:2024cv02341
Filed: December 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2 (a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2025 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trinity Hayes. Russell Road Food and Beverage, LLC served on 1/27/2025. (Buchanan, Floyd)
January 29, 2025 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorneys Carlos Leach and T'Keara N. Watson are in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to complete the registration. (no image attached) (HAM)
January 24, 2025 Filing 13 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Russell Road Food and Beverage, LLC, Nando Soutillio re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (MAM)
January 23, 2025 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Def't Russell Road Food & Beverage LLC by Plaintiff Trinity Hayes. (Buchanan, Floyd)
January 23, 2025 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Deft Nando Sostillio by Plaintiff Trinity Hayes. (Buchanan, Floyd)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Carlos V. Leach for Plaintiff Trinity Hayes and approving Designation of Local Counsel F. Travis Buchanan. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 1/21/2025. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
January 16, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #5 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Carlos Leach, by Plaintiff Trinity Hayes. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing GA & FLA)(Buchanan, Floyd)
January 16, 2025 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 1/16/2025. I defer ruling on Carlos Leach's verified petition to practice pro hac vice (ECF No. #5 ) because it does not comply with Local Rule IA 11-2. Leach failed to attach the required "certification issued within six months before the date of filing of the verified petition [showing] that the applicant's membership is in good standing from the state bar or from the clerk of court of the supreme court or highest admitting court of every state, territory, or insular possession of the United States in which the applicant has been admitted to practice law." LR IA 11-2(b)(3) (emphasis added). Although Leach provided a certificate of good standing from Florida, the petition indicates that Leach is also admitted in Georgia, and no certificate of good standing from Georgia was provided. ECF No. 5 at 2, 4. Counsel is advised to correct this deficiency by filing the verified petition with both certificates attached using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event to link it to the existing filing by January 30, 2025. Failure to amend by that date will result in denial of the petition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB)
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to T'Keara N. Watson for Trinity Hayes and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to F. Travis Buchanan. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 1/15/2025. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
January 9, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by T'Keara N. Watson, Esq. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F Travis Buchanan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7918911) by Plaintiff Trinity Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Buchanan, Floyd)
January 8, 2025 Filing 5 See #9 Notice of Corrected Image. MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Carlos V. Leach, Esq and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Floyd Buchanan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7917716) by Plaintiff Trinity Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Buchanan, Floyd) Modified on 1/16/2025 (HAM).
January 2, 2025 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
December 17, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Carlos Leach, T'Keara N. Watson to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/31/2024. (no image attached) (AMMi)
December 16, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (AMMi)
December 16, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trinity Hayes. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Buchanan, Floyd)
December 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7899065) by Trinity Hayes. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/26/2024. Proof of service due by 3/16/2025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Buchanan, Floyd) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Russell Road Food and Beverage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Hayes
Represented By: T'Keara Nichelle Watson
Represented By: T'Keara Nichelle Watson
Represented By: Floyd Travis Buchanan
Represented By: Carlos V. Leach
Represented By: Carlos V. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nando Soutillio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Road Food and Beverage, LLC doing business as Crazy Horse 3 Gentlemen's Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?