Rasberry II v. U. S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Franklin Rasberry II
Defendant: U. S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 2:2025cv00070
Filed: January 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cristina D Silva
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting #3 Report and Recommendation in its entirety, therefore this case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is kindly instructed to terminate ECF No. #4 and to close this case. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 1/24/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
January 22, 2025 Filing 4 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice, by Plaintiff Franklin Rasberry II. Responses due by 2/5/2025. (DLS)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCREENING ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is GRANTED. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this case be dismissed with prejudice as the relief Plaintiff seeks can only be obtained in Nevada State District Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/27/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/13/2025.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
January 13, 2025 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DLS)
January 13, 2025 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Franklin Rasberry II. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLS)
January 13, 2025 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (CAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasberry II v. U. S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Rasberry II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?