My Daily Choice, Inc. v. Kiss Nutraceuticals LLC et al
Plaintiff: My Daily Choice, Inc.
Defendant: Kiss Nutraceuticals LLC and Cole T. Evans
Case Number: 2:2025cv00205
Filed: January 30, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2025 Filing 13 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. Judge Couvillier's Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 12, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #9 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. Attorney Jared Sechrist advised that the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals explained in Eitel v. McCool, 782 F.2d 1470, 1471 (9th Cir. 1986), a party's failure to plead or otherwise defend must be "shown by affidavit or otherwise" before the Clerk can "enter the party's default." Please comply and file the necessary paperwork regarding Motion for entry of Clerk Default. (no image attached) (LE)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ross Campbell withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 3/11/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Peck withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 3/11/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
March 11, 2025 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default by Plaintiff My Daily Choice, Inc.. Responses due by 3/25/2025. (Sechrist, Jared)
March 11, 2025 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by My Daily Choice, Inc.. Kiss Nutraceuticals LLC served on 2/14/2025. (Sechrist, Jared)
February 19, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ross M. Campbell for Plaintiff My Daily Choice, Inc.. Responses due by 3/5/2025. (Sechrist, Jared)
February 19, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by David A. Peck for Plaintiff My Daily Choice, Inc.. Responses due by 3/5/2025. (Sechrist, Jared)
February 3, 2025 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
January 31, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel David Peck and Ross Campbell to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 2/14/2025. (no image attached) (CAH)
January 31, 2025 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cole T. Evans, Kiss Nutraceuticals LLC. (CAH)
January 30, 2025 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (CAH)
January 30, 2025 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by My Daily Choice, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sechrist, Jared)
January 30, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7941680) by My Daily Choice, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/9/2025. Proof of service due by 4/30/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Kiss, #3 Summons Evans) (Sechrist, Jared) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: My Daily Choice, Inc. v. Kiss Nutraceuticals LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: My Daily Choice, Inc.
Represented By: Jared M. Sechrist
Represented By: Erika Pike Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiss Nutraceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole T. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?