Gayles-Zanders v. Ruebart et al
Plaintiff: Shirron Gayles-Zanders
Defendant: William Ruebart and State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2025cv00335
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Shirron Gayles-Zanders. (RJDG)
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. It is therefore ordered that Plaintiff has until April 4, 2025, to accomplish the following two items: 1) File a signed complaint using the correct form for federal court. 2) Either pay the full $405 filing fee or file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three of the following required documents. Alternatively, if Plaintiff did not intend to initiate this federal civil action but perhaps meant to file the initiating documents in one or more of her state actions, it is further ordered that Plaintiff has until April 4, 2025, to file a notice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) voluntarily dismissing this action without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff: (1) this Courts approved 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form with instructions, and (2) this Court's approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis for an inmate with instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 3/6/2025. (For Distribution by law library.) (Attachments: #1 IFP Packet, #2 1983 Complaint Packet) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
February 21, 2025 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (For Distribution by law library.) (DRM)
February 20, 2025 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Initiating Documents Submitted) (DRM)
February 20, 2025 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gayles-Zanders v. Ruebart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirron Gayles-Zanders
Represented By: Law Library - Florence McClure WCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ruebart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?