***Test Case*** Jane Smith v. Big Red, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Jane Smith and BARBARA SMITH
Defendant: Big Red, Inc., Jason Jones, Test Griffin, Ugly Duckling Carsales, Eugene Hattori, DAVID R. HARRIS and Angela Griffin
Intervenor Plaintiff: Test Freeman
Intervenor Defendant: Smith
Case Number: 3:1976cv00521
Filed: May 21, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 539 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (LG)
April 6, 2020 Filing 536 EX PARTE DOCUMENT. (LW)
April 1, 2020 Filing 537 MOTION to Amend/Correct 515 Certificate of Interested Parties, by Defendant Angela Griffin. Responses due by 4/15/2020. (LG)
February 22, 2020 Filing 535 **UPGRADE TEST** CERTIFICATE of Cash Deposit as to AF: $ 1.00, receipt number 12345 (AF)
February 13, 2020 Filing 534 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/13/2020. IT IS ORDERED that the designation of reporters and recorders transcripts (if any) as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) shall be filed with the clerk of bankruptcy court so the certificate of readiness may be transmitted timely to the district court. If the designation was previously filed with the clerk of BAP, counsel shall file a copy of the same with the clerk of bankruptcy court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed in connection with this appeal shall bear the bankruptcy case number, adversary case number (if any) and the district court civil case number. For Bankruptcy Appeals, Attorneys are required to file Verified Petitions in accordance with LR IA 11-2. Verified Petition due by 3/29/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 13, 2020 Filing 533 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/13/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/28/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 31, 2019 Filing 532 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal by Defendant Big Red, Inc.. (E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals.) (AB)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER approving ECF No. 530 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Smith Jones and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jones Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 12/18/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 18, 2019 Filing 530 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Smith Jones and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jones Smith by Defendant Test Griffin. (AB)
November 26, 2019 Filing 529 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to ddv. (LG)
November 26, 2019 Filing 528 NOTICE of Docket Correction to rrvgsfsdkl; 526 Proposed Joint Pretrial Order : fsdgfsdgfsdgsd (no image attached) (DRM)
November 14, 2019 Filing 527 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Jason Jones. (AF)
September 23, 2019 Filing 526 Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (AF)
September 23, 2019 Filing 525 Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (AF)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER granting 523 Joint Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 9/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
September 23, 2019 Filing 523 Joint Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (AF)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER granting 521 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/29/2019. Motions due by 12/31/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/10/2020. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 9/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
September 23, 2019 Filing 521 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (AF)
September 17, 2019 Filing 520 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/17/2019. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland. Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
September 13, 2019 Filing 519 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Angela Griffin that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent AMAZON, INC. for Angela Griffin added. (DRM)
August 19, 2019 Filing 518 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER by Defendant Angela Griffin. (LG)
July 11, 2019 Filing 517 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/11/2019. This action was received on* 7/2/2019* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* OHND* and assigned case number 2:17-cv-00777-. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 8/10/2019. Verified Petition due by 8/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Sample 1, #2 Sample 2)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 6/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 RE ATTACH 1, #2 REATTACH 2)(DRM).
June 27, 2019 Filing 515 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Big Red, Inc., Angela Griffin, Jason Jones that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent ABC INC for Jason Jones; Other Affiliate GRIFFIN AND GRIFFIN for Angela Griffin; Corporate Parent BB BIG RED LLC for Big Red, Inc. added. (LE)
May 13, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
May 13, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
May 13, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
May 13, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
April 16, 2019 Filing 514 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within 30 days, the Court will enter an order of dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 5/16/2019. (LG)
April 15, 2019 Filing 538 RESPONSE to 537 Motion to Amend/Correct by Defendant Angela Griffin. Replies due by 4/22/2019. (LG)
April 2, 2019 Filing 513 USCA, Ninth Circuit Appellate Case Number 6456546 assigned to #512 Notice of Appeal. (DRM)
April 2, 2019 Filing 512 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendant Angela Griffin. Filing fee $ 505. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals. (DRM)
April 2, 2019 Filing 511 USCA, Ninth Circuit Appellate Case Number 6456546 assigned to 453 Notice of Appeal,. (DRM)
March 25, 2019 Filing 510 CERTIFICATE of Cash Deposit as to John Doe: $ 500.00, receipt number 123456 (AF)
March 25, 2019 Filing 508 USCA Appeal Fees received $505 receipt number 556895 re 84 Petition for Writ of Mandamus. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (LG)
March 20, 2019 Filing 507 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Bruce T. Beesley on 3/20/2019. This case having been referred to a United States Magistrate in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), Local Rule IB 2-1; IT IS ORDERED that the action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER REFERRING CASE to United States Magistrate Judge on Consent in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c). This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Bruce T. Beesley on 3/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 26, 2018 Filing 505 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability. (DRM)
December 20, 2018 Filing 504 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Adam P. Laxalt-AG on behalf of Defendant Jason Jones. (LG)
December 20, 2018 Filing 503 NOTICE of Appearance Laxalt-AG. (LG)
December 3, 2018 Filing 502 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Jury Trial held on 12/3/2018 before Judge Philip M. Pro. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
November 29, 2018 Filing 501 RESPONSE to 500 Motion by Plaintiff Jane Smith. Replies due by 12/6/2018.(AF)
November 29, 2018 Filing 500 MOTION by Plaintiff Jane Smith. Responses due by 12/13/2018.(AF)
November 29, 2018 Filing 499 RESPONSE to 498 Addendum by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (AF)
November 29, 2018 Filing 498 ADDENDUM to 497 Complaint by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (AF)
November 29, 2018 Filing 497 COMPLAINT against Big Red, Inc., Ugly Duckling Carsales (Filing fee $400) by Jane Smith. Proof of service due by 2/27/2019.(AF)
November 19, 2018 Filing 496 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (AF)
November 5, 2018 Filing 495 NOTICE from USDC advising case against DFSDF, et al., has been received and assigned case number SDFSAF. (DRM)
November 5, 2018 Filing 494 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 11/5/2018. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 5, 2018 Filing 493 NOTICE from USDC advising case against John Doe, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:76-cv-521-TTT-XXX. (AF)
November 5, 2018 Filing 492 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/5/2018. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 31, 2018 Filing 491 GENERIC DOCKET TEXT. (DRM)
October 29, 2018 Filing 490 Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for 453 Notice of Appeal,. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (AF)
August 28, 2018 Filing 489 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:76-cv-00521-MMD-CBC. (no image attached) (LG)
August 8, 2018 Filing 488 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, held on 8/1/2008, before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Donna Davidson, DoDavidson@att.net. Any Redaction Request is due by 8/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 9/8/2018. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 11/6/2018. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (KR)
August 6, 2018 Filing 487 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #458 . Counsel is advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #458 . (no image attached) (AF)
August 6, 2018 Filing 486 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #458 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (AF)
August 6, 2018 Filing 485 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #458 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (AF)
August 6, 2018 Filing 484 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-2(d). ECF No. #458 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney is advised to properly link all further filed documents. (no image attached) (AF)
August 6, 2018 Filing 483 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #458 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #458 using the appropriate docket entry title. (no image attached) (AF)
August 6, 2018 Filing 482 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #458 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #458 and be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing two separate documents for each request or purpose. (no image attached) (AF)
August 6, 2018 Filing 481 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney John Smith is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (AF)
August 6, 2018 Filing 480 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #458 . Attorney Jason Smith is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (AF)
August 6, 2018 Filing 479 CLERK'S NOTICE of Non-Compliant Filing. Attorney Johan Johnson is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (AF)
August 6, 2018 Filing 478 CLERK'S NOTICE of Non-Compliant Filing. The Clerk has noted the following deficiencies with ECF No. #471 : Filer's account information is different from the address information listed in document #471 . Attorney John Smith is advised to review and update his/her user account information pursuant to LR IC 2-1(g). Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed and a separate event must be selected for that document. Counsel is advised to refile the additional request for _______________ contained in ECF No. #471 using the appropriate event in the Court's electronic filing system, pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c). Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #471 using the appropriate event title. Document was not filed pursuant to LR 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the documents to which they pertain. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney is advised to properly link all further filed documents. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (AF)
July 11, 2018 Filing 477 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Smith to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/25/2018. (no image attached) (AF)
June 22, 2018 Filing 476 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/6/2018. (no image attached) (KR)
June 19, 2018 Filing 475 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (AF)
June 19, 2018 Filing 474 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (AF)
June 19, 2018 Filing 473 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (AF)
April 20, 2018 Filing 472 MOTION to Amend/Correct #471 Notice (Other) by Defendant Angela Griffin. Responses due by 5/4/2018. (DRM)
April 12, 2018 Filing 471 NOTICE - Word test of linking to page 2 of a document filed in the same event. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KR)
April 12, 2018 Filing 470 NOTICE -Word test linking to page 3 of an order in another case. (KR)
April 11, 2018 Filing 469 NOTICE with Minute Order page reference. (KW)
April 11, 2018 Filing 468 NOTICE of same test with specific page reference. (Attachments: #1 Sample) (KW)
April 11, 2018 Filing 467 NOTICE of same test with specific page reference, by Big Red, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Sample) (KW) (Main Document 467 replaced on 4/11/2018) (KW).
April 11, 2018 Filing 466 NOTICE by Big Red, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Sample) (KW)
April 11, 2018 Filing 465 NOTICE re #458 Judgment. (KW)
April 11, 2018 Filing 464 NOTICE re ECF No. #458 to test using Cross-Document Hyperlinks, filed by Big Red, Inc. (KW)
April 11, 2018 Filing 463 NOTICE. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Word Link Test)(KR)
April 11, 2018 Filing 462 NOTICE Word test. (KR)
April 11, 2018 Filing 461 NOTICE. (Attachments: #1 Who does what?)(KR)
April 11, 2018 Filing 460 NOTICE. (Attachments: #1 Who does what?)(KR)
April 11, 2018 Filing 459 NOTICE re #458 Answer to Complaint. (KR)
April 6, 2018 Filing 458 ANSWER to Complaint filed by DAVID R. HARRIS.(LG)
March 28, 2018 Filing 457 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/28/2018. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #445 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
March 28, 2018 Filing 456 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/28/2018. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #449 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
March 28, 2018 Filing 455 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/28/2018. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #445 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
February 28, 2018 Filing 453 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendant Angela Griffin. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals. THIS IS A TEST ONLY. CHECKING TO SEE RE SETTING OF FLAG. HAVE SEEN CASES WHERE FLAG MAY NOT HAVE BEEN SET BY EVENT. NOT SURE (DRM)
February 14, 2018 Filing 452 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * adfad* in this action was filed on* 9/10/2015.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*adfasdf.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 3/16/2018. (DRM)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER denying #450 Motion for Summary Judgment; Case is stayed until further order of this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 22, 2018 Filing 450 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Angela Griffin. Responses due by 2/12/2018. (DRM)
January 17, 2018 Filing 449 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability. (DRM)
December 21, 2017 Filing 448 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Defendant Angela Griffin. (KR)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER granting 431 Motion to Extend Time ; Re: 431 Motion, #445 Motion to Dismiss, #446 Motion for Leave to File Document, 439 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Responses due by 12/18/2017. Responses due by 12/19/2017. Replies due by 12/21/2017. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2018 at 02:30 PM in Reno Chambers before Phyllis H. Atkins. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 18, 2017 Filing 446 MOTION for Leave to File by Defendant Eugene Hattori. (KW)
December 18, 2017 Filing 445 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant DAVID R. HARRIS. Responses due by 1/1/2018. (KW)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER Re: 439 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, 431 Motion Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2018 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Phyllis H. Atkins. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER setting Inmate Early Mediation Conference. An Inmate Early Mediation Conference is set for 1/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Reno Courtroom 2 The Attorney General's Office will make the necessary arrangements for plaintiff to appear by video and will provide Katie Lynn Ogden at 775-686-5758 with the video conference reservation number and telephone number at which the plaintiff can be reached. The mediation statements shall be received by chambers at 400 S. Virginia Street, Suite 405, Reno, NV 89501 no later than 1/23/2018 at 4:00 p.m. DO NOT FILE THE MEDIATION STATEMENTS; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/8/2017. before Mediator Brian Brown. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 17, 2017 Filing 442 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Test Griffin. (AF)
November 17, 2017 Filing 441 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (AF)
November 16, 2017 Filing 440 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Bruce T. Beesley on 11/16/2017. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 14, 2017 Filing 439 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #419 Scheduling Order by Defendant Eugene Hattori. (AF)
November 14, 2017 Filing 438 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default by Defendant Big Red, Inc.. (DRM)
November 14, 2017 Filing 437 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) by Jane Smith. (AF)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER granting 432 Motion to Extend Time ; Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
November 13, 2017 Filing 435 ADDENDUM to 432 Motion by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (AF)
November 13, 2017 Filing 434 COMPLAINT against Angela Griffin, Test Griffin (Filing fee $400) by Jane Smith. Proof of service due by 2/11/2018.(AF)
November 13, 2017 Filing 433 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 337 Jury Trial before District Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Felicia Zabin, FZ@nvd.uscourts.gov. Recording start and end times: dsf. Any Redaction Request is due by 12/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 12/14/2017. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 2/11/2018. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (LG)
November 7, 2017 Filing 432 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (First Request) by Defendant DAVID R. HARRIS. (DRM)
November 7, 2017 Filing 431 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (First Request) by Defendant Big Red, Inc.. (DRM)
May 15, 2017 Filing 430 REPLY to Response to #426 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Defendant Jason Jones. (Test, Test)
May 13, 2017 Filing 429 DECLARATION of Testing by Intervenor Plaintiff Test Freeman. (admin1, )
May 13, 2017 Filing 428 RESPONSE to #426 Motion to Amend/Correct, filed by Plaintiff Jane Smith. Replies due by 5/20/2017. (AF)
May 13, 2017 Filing 427 BILL OF COSTS by Intervenor Plaintiff Test Freeman. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 5/27/2017. Tax Bill of Costs by 6/3/2017. (aotx, )
May 13, 2017 Filing 426 MOTION to Amend/Correct #423 Bill of Costs, by Defendant Jason Jones. Responses due by 5/27/2017. (AF)
May 13, 2017 Filing 425 BILL OF COSTS by Intervenor Plaintiff Test Freeman. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 5/27/2017. Tax Bill of Costs by 6/3/2017. (aotx, )
May 13, 2017 Filing 424 BILL OF COSTS by Intervenor Plaintiff Test Freeman. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 5/27/2017. Tax Bill of Costs by 6/3/2017. (aotx, )
May 13, 2017 Filing 423 BILL OF COSTS by Intervenor Plaintiff Test Freeman. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 5/27/2017. Tax Bill of Costs by 6/3/2017. (admin1, )
May 13, 2017 Filing 422 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt, on 5/13/2017. Calendar Call set for 5/13/2017 11:59 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - admin1, )
May 13, 2017 Filing 421 ANSWERING BRIEF by Intervenor Plaintiff Test Freeman. (admin1, )
May 13, 2017 Filing 420 STATUS REPORT by Intervenor Plaintiff Test Freeman. (admin1, )
May 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 419 SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 5/13/2017. Motions due by 5/13/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 05/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - admin1, )
May 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 418 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - admin1, )
April 28, 2017 Filing 417 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint* in this action was filed on* January 1, 2017.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*ALL DEFENDANTS.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 5/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
April 28, 2017 Filing 416 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint* in this action was filed on* January 1, 2017.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*John Smith.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 5/28/2017. (AF)
April 28, 2017 Filing 415 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint* in this action was filed on* January 1, 2017.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*John Smith.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 5/28/2017. (AF)
April 28, 2017 Filing 414 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint* in this action was filed on* January 1, 2017.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*John Smith.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 5/28/2017. (AF)
April 28, 2017 Filing 413 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint* in this action was filed on* 2/1/2017.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*John Smith.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 5/28/2017. (AF)
April 28, 2017 Filing 412 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint* in this action was filed on* 2/1/2017.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*John Smith.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 5/28/2017. (AF)
April 28, 2017 Filing 411 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint* in this action was filed on* 2/1/2017.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*John Smith.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 5/28/2017. (AF)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 410 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Chief Judge Bruce T. Beesley. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 409 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #336 Motion. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER OF CONTEMPT. One, Two (ECF No. 88 ) and ECF No. 99 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
March 31, 2017 Filing 407 Interpleader Disbursement Completed (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $5,000.00. (AF)
March 31, 2017 Filing 406 Interpleader Deposit Received (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $5,000.00. (AF)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER granting 404 Motion for Interpleader Disbursement of Disputed Ownership Funds (28 U.S.C. Section 1335). Authorized disbursement in the amount of $5,000.00. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
March 31, 2017 Filing 404 MOTION for Interpleader Disbursement of Disputed Ownership Funds (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Defendant Jason Jones. Responses due by 4/14/2017. (AF)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting 402 Motion for Interpleader Deposit of Disputed Ownership Funds (28 U.S.C. Section 1335). Authorized deposit in the amount of $5,000.00. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
March 31, 2017 Filing 402 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit Disputed Ownership Funds (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Defendant Jason Jones. Responses due by 4/14/2017. (AF)
February 28, 2017 Filing 401 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Philip M. Pro, on 2/28/2017. TESTING NEW PARAGRAPHTESTING BOLD(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
February 10, 2017 Filing 400 JOINDER filed by Defendant Angela Griffin (LG)
January 30, 2017 Filing 399 REPLY to Response to 390 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order filed by Intervenor Defendant Smith. (AF)
January 25, 2017 Filing 398 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Boo, et al., has been received and assigned case number 76-00521. (KW)
January 3, 2017 Filing 397 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra Kempi on 1/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 9, 2016 Filing 396 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Objections due by 11/23/2016. (KR)
November 9, 2016 Filing 395 NOTICE of Filing of 28 USC 157(c) Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for review by a U.S. District Court Judge. (KR)
September 14, 2016 Filing 394 RESPONSE to #336 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order, filed by Defendant Big Red, Inc. Replies due by 9/24/2016. (AF)
September 8, 2016 Filing 393 Notice of APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE CASE (Filing fee $ 0), filed by Big Red, Inc..(LG)
August 5, 2016 Filing 392 RESPONSE to 390 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order, filed by Defendant Angela Griffin. (KR)
August 5, 2016 Filing 391 RESPONSE to 390 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order, filed by Intervenor Defendant Smith. (KR)
August 5, 2016 Filing 390 OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re 373 Minute Order re Removal, by Defendant Big Red, Inc. Responses due by 8/22/2016. (KR)
June 16, 2016 Filing 388 NOTICE from USDC advising case against mr y, et al., has been received and assigned case number 333. (LG)
June 10, 2016 Filing 387 NOTICE from USDC advising case against has been received and assigned case number (LG)
May 17, 2016 Filing 386 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Jane Smith, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:76-cv-521. (AF)
May 16, 2016 Filing 385 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks, on 5/16/2016. By Deputy Clerk: AF. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/3/2016. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
May 16, 2016 Filing 384 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks, on 5/16/2016. By Deputy Clerk: AF. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/3/2016. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
May 6, 2016 Filing 383 RESPONSE to 382 Order to Show Cause by Defendant Jason Jones. (AF)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/27/2016. Signed by Judge. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
May 6, 2016 Filing 381 NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (no image attached) (AF)
May 5, 2016 Filing 380 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Test Freeman. (Test, Test) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 5, 2016 Filing 379 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Test Freeman. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/15/2016. (Test, Test) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 2, 2016 Filing 378 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr, on 5/2/2016. Attorney Attorney is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Counsel is advised to register for CM/ECF by completing the Attorney Registration Form from the Court's Website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov and then filing a "Notice of Compliance with Local Rule IC 2-1" as a separate event under the "Notices" category. Notice of Compliance re: LR IC 2-1 is due by 5/17/2016.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 29, 2016 Filing 377 OBJECTION to ECF No. 376 Bill of Costs. Response to Objection to Bill of Costs due by 5/9/2016. (KR) Modified on 4/29/2016 (KR).
April 29, 2016 Filing 376 BILL OF COSTS. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 5/16/2016. Tax Bill of Costs by 5/23/2016. (KR)
April 29, 2016 Filing 375 OBJECTION to ECF No. 374 Bill of Costs. Response to Objection to Bill of Costs due by 5/9/2016. (KR) Modified on 4/29/2016 (KR).
April 29, 2016 Filing 374 BILL OF COSTS. Objections to Bill of Costs due by 5/16/2016. Tax Bill of Costs by 5/23/2016. (KR)
April 28, 2016 Filing 373 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 4/28/2016. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/16/2016. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
April 27, 2016 Filing 372 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 4/27/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Amber Freeman. This action was received on* 4/27/2016* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* District of Alaska* and assigned case number 2:76-cv-00521. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 5/27/2016. Verified Petition due by 6/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 371 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #336 Motion. Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland. Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #336 Motion. Opposition due twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due fourteen (14) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
April 27, 2016 Filing 368 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within 30 days, the Court will enter an order of dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 5/27/2016. (AF) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
April 22, 2016 Filing 367 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within thirty (30) days, the Court will enter an order of dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 5/22/2016. (LG) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland. Opposition due twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due fourteen (14) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
April 22, 2016 Filing 365 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Roger T. Benitez, on 4/22/2016. By Deputy Clerk: lia. This action was received on* 04/20/16* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* California* and assigned case number 3-76-cv-521-BRT. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 5/22/2016. Verified Petition due by 6/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
April 20, 2016 Filing 364 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within thirty (30) days, the Court will enter an order of dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 5/20/2016. (KR) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
April 20, 2016 Filing 363 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The Complaint in this action was filed on 4/11/2016. To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to Formy McFormFace. FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 5/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Pursuant to FRCP 4(m). IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice as to DAVID R. HARRIS. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 4/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland. Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 20, 2016 Filing 360 NOTICE from USDC advising case against SMITH, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:76-CV-521. (DRM)
April 20, 2016 Filing 359 NOTICE of Hearing: (no image attached)(DRM) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
April 20, 2016 Filing 357 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr, on 4/20/2016. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/8/2016. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 20, 2016 Filing 356 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr, on 4/20/2016. This action was received on* 4/20/2016* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* District of Forms* and assigned case number 3:76-cv-521. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 5/20/2016. Verified Petition due by 6/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 20, 2016 Filing 355 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within thirty (30) days, the Court will enter an order of dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 5/20/2016. (DRM) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
April 20, 2016 Filing 354 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Roger T. Benitez, on 4/20/2016. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/8/2016. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 22, 2016 Filing 353 REPLY to 123 Response to #336 Motion filed by Defendant Big Red, Inc.. (DRM)
March 15, 2016 Filing 352 NOTICE. (DRM) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
February 26, 2016 Filing 349 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Defendant, et al., has been received and assigned case number 1:11-cv-111111. (KR)
February 5, 2016 Filing 348 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks, on 2/5/2016. This action has been received from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for consideration of the Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. This matter has been assigned civil case number 3:76-cv-521. All future pleadings related to the Motion to Withdraw the Reference must be filed in the U.S. District Court civil action and must bear said civil case number, the Bankruptcy case number, and the adversary case number. (16-10099, 17-1) (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 5, 2016 Filing 347 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks, on 2/5/2016. This action has been received from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for consideration of the Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. This matter has been assigned civil case number 3:76-cv-521. All future pleadings related to the Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law must be filed in the U.S. District Court civil action and must bear said civil case number, the Bankruptcy case number, and the adversary case number. (16-10099, 17-1) (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 5, 2016 Filing 346 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks, on 2/5/2016. IT IS ORDERED that the designation of reporters and recorders transcripts (if any) as required by LR 8006(b), shall be filed with the clerk of bankruptcy court so the certificate of record on appeal may be transmitted timely to the district court. If the designation was previously filed with the clerk of BAP, counsel shall file a copy of the same with the clerk of bankruptcy court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed in connection with this appeal shall bear the bankruptcy case number, adversary case number (if any) and the district court civil case number. For Bankruptcy Appeals, Attorneys are required to file Verified Petitions in accordance with LR IA 10-2. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 5, 2016 Filing 345 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks, on 2/5/2016. IT IS ORDERED appellant shall have period of fourteen (14) days from date of this order to file/serve opening brief. Appellee shall have fourteen (14) days after to file/serve answering brief. Thereafter, appellant shall have fourteen (14) days to file/serve final reply brief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall file and serve with appellants brief excerpts of the record as an appendix pursuant to LR 8009(a) and Fed. R. Bank. P. 8009(b). Appellee may also file/serve an appendix with appellees brief which contains required material omitted by appellant. Opening brief due by 2/22/2016. Answering brief due by 3/10/2016. Reply brief due by 3/27/2016.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 4, 2016 Filing 344 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within thirty (30) days, the Court will enter an order of dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 3/5/2016. (AF) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
January 28, 2016 Filing 343 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request). (AF)
December 31, 2015 Filing 341 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * complaint* in this action was filed on* 7/7/15.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*jim.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 1/30/2016. (LG) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
December 15, 2015 Filing 340 OBJECTION to 339 Bill of Costs, filed by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (KR)
December 15, 2015 Filing 339 BILL OF COSTS by Defendant Big Red, Inc. Tax or object to Bill of Costs by 1/2/2016. (KR)
December 9, 2015 Filing 338 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (JC) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page) Modified on 12/9/2015 (JC).
November 23, 2015 Filing 337 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Jury Trial held on 11/23/2015 before None Assigned NA. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
November 18, 2015 Filing 336 MOTION to do something, by Plaintiff Jane Smith. Responses due by 12/5/2015. (Test, Test)
November 12, 2015 Filing 335 NOTICE by DAVID R. HARRIS. (DRM) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
November 4, 2015 Filing 334 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Big Red has been received and assigned case number 76cv521 (AF)
November 4, 2015 Filing 333 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Big Red Inc., et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:76-cv-521. (AF)
November 4, 2015 Filing 332 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Big Red Inc., et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:76-cv-00521. (Inmate #*12356*) (AF)
November 4, 2015 Filing 331 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Jane Smith, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:76-cv-00521. (AF)
November 4, 2015 Filing 330 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within thirty (30) days, the Court will enter an order of dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 12/4/2015. (AF) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER denying #307 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #324 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 10/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 7, 2015 Filing 327 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 10/7/2015. RE: #324 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, #307 Third MOTION for an order commanding plaintiff to stop advertising business re 291 Notice (Other) Blah, Blah, Blah,Blah,Blah Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2015 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 3 before Judge Larry R. Hicks. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #324 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 10/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 7, 2015 Filing 325 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 10/7/2015. deferring ruling on #324 Motion to Appoint Counsel. ; RE: #324 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel ( Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2015 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb.) (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 7, 2015 Filing 324 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Defendant Jason Jones. (DRM)
September 2, 2015 Filing 323 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 9/2/2015. This action was received on* 9/1/15* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Wisconsin* and assigned case number 3:76-cv-521. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 10/2/2015. Verified Petition due by 10/17/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 2, 2015 Filing 322 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #1 Notice (Other). Event corrected by the clerk. In the future do not select MOTION rather select OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order which is found under the Motions category.. (no image attached)(LG)
August 17, 2015 Filing 321 WITNESS LIST by Defendant Big Red, Inc..(AF)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland : Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 8/12/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER granting 316 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Signed by Phyllis H. Atkins on 7/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
July 7, 2015 Filing 318 RESPONSE to Objection to 316 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (AF)
July 7, 2015 Filing 317 OBJECTION to 316 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Defendant Test Griffin. Response to Objections due by 7/21/2015. (AF)
July 7, 2015 Filing 316 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Signed by Bankruptcy Judge Laurel E. Davis on 7/7/2015. Objections due by 7/21/2015. (AF)
July 7, 2015 Filing 315 NOTICE of Filing of 28 USC 157(c) Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for review by a U.S. District Court Judge. (AF)
July 7, 2015 Filing 314 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel (Filing fee $ 250). (DRM)
June 17, 2015 Filing 313 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request). (AF)
May 15, 2015 Filing 312 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 269 Motion Hearing held on 1/1/2015, before Judge David W. Hagen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Ganci, 702-385-0670. Tape Number: 11-132165. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's Transcript Order form available on our website, at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2015. (AF)
April 21, 2015 Filing 311 NOTICE to Plaintiff from USDC advising case against defendant Big Red, Inc., et al. has been received and assigned case number 3:76-cv-00521. (Inmate #*12345*) (JC)
April 21, 2015 Filing 310 NOTICE to Plaintiff from USDC advising case against defendant Big Red, Inc., et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:76-cv-00521. (JC)
April 13, 2015 Filing 309 EXHIBIT(s) G through T to #307 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ; filed by Defendant Big Red, Inc.. (Test, Test)
April 13, 2015 Filing 308 EXHIBIT(s) A through F to #307 Third MOTION for an order commanding plaintiff to stop advertising business re 291 Notice (Other) Blah, Blah, Blah,Blah,Blah ; filed by Defendant Big Red, Inc.. (Test, Test)
April 13, 2015 Filing 307 Third MOTION for an order commanding plaintiff to stop advertising business re 291 Notice (Other) Blah, Blah, Blah,Blah,Blah by Defendant Big Red, Inc.. Responses due by 4/30/2015. (Test, Test)
April 13, 2015 Filing 305 TEST TEST TEST. Reply ddl test (AF)
April 13, 2015 Filing 304 TEST TEST TEST. (AF)
April 13, 2015 Filing 303 RESPONSE to 299 MOTION to Amend/Correct, filed by Defendant Ugly Duckling Carsales. Replies due by 4/23/2015. (AF)
April 13, 2015 Filing 302 RESPONSE to 301 MOTION to Change Venue, filed by Defendant Jason Jones. Replies due by 4/23/2015. (AF)
April 13, 2015 Filing 299 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Intervenor Defendant Smith. Responses due by 4/30/2015. (AF)
April 10, 2015 Filing 306 REPLY to Response to 299 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Defendant Eugene Hattori. (AF)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 296 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Phyllis H. Atkins on 4/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
April 9, 2015 Filing 297 RESPONSE to 296 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Jane Smith. Replies due by 4/26/2015. (AF)
April 9, 2015 Filing 296 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Test Griffin. Responses due by 5/3/2015. (AF)
April 1, 2015 Filing 300 MOTION for Hearing by Defendant Big Red, Inc.. (AF)
March 27, 2015 Filing 301 MOTION to Change Venue by Plaintiff Jane Smith. Responses due by 4/13/2015. (AF)
March 16, 2015 Filing 295 NOTICE. § 3281 3281
March 16, 2015 Filing 294 NOTICE. 18 USC 328118:3281 USCTitle 18 of the USC section 3281(AF) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
March 11, 2015 Filing 293 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 11 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter filed by Jane Smith. Objections to R&R due by 3/28/2015 Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/1/1. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
February 26, 2015 Filing 292 NOTICE by Jason Jones. (AF) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
February 26, 2015 Filing 291 NOTICE by Smith. (AF) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
February 20, 2015 Filing 290 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendant Eugene Hattori. (DRM)
February 20, 2015 Filing 289 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. (DRM)
February 17, 2015 Filing 288 WITNESS LIST by Defendant Big Red, Inc..(LG)
January 28, 2015 Filing 287 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Philip M. Pro, on 1/28/2015. By Deputy Clerk: Amber Freeman. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/15/2015. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
January 28, 2015 Filing 286 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Phyllis H. Atkins, on 1/28/2015. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/15/2015. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 20, 2015 Filing 285 STIPULATION by Defendant Jason Jones. (AF)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting 283 Stipulation. Signed by None Assigned NA on 1/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
January 20, 2015 Filing 283 STIPULATION by Intervenor Plaintiff Test Freeman. (AF)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting #281 Motion for TRO. A status hearing will be set 30 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - test, chambers)
December 5, 2014 Filing 281 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Big Red, Inc.. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Test, Test)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland : Opposition due twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due fourteen (14) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
August 23, 2014 Filing 278 NOTICE by Test Freeman re 275 Complaint. (AF)
May 19, 2014 Filing 275 COMPLAINT against Smith (Filing fee $400), filed by Test Freeman. (AF)
March 11, 2014 Filing 274 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (LG)
February 26, 2014 Filing 273 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (USDC Short Trial Program Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2)). If counsel agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial will take three (3) days or less, they should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the forms with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (AF)
February 26, 2014 Filing 272 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (USDC Short Trial Program Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2)). If counsel agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial will take three (3) days or less, they should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the forms with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (AF)
February 26, 2014 Filing 271 Notice. Testing link. on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (AF)
January 31, 2014 Filing 270 NOTICE by Test Griffin. (JC)
September 24, 2013 Filing 268 NOTICE. (AF)
September 24, 2013 Filing 267 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Jury Trial held on 9/24/2013 before None Assigned NA. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
September 23, 2013 Filing 269 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 9/23/2013 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: Andrew Guarino and David Negri; Def Counsel: Wes Williams for Walker River Paiute Tribe; Gordon DePaoli and Dale Ferguson for Walker River Irrigation District; Karen Peterson for US Board of Water Commissioners; Simeon Herskovits and Sean Rowe for Mineral County; Stacy Simon for Mono County; George Benesch for Lyon County; Marta Adams and Bryan Stockton for Nevada Department of Wildlife; Don Springmeyer for National Fish and Wildlife; Harry Swainston pro se and on behalf of Swainston Farms; Annadel Almendras and Michael Neville for California parties; Erin Mahaney for California State Water Resources Board; Therese Ure for Circle Bar N Ranch and Mica Farms; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 1:31 PM - 2:30 PM; Courtroom: 6; The Court discusses jurisdictional issues and service issues. The Court suggests that Mineral County and the Tribe should serve all parties, including potential users of ground water and surface water within the Walker River watershed. Mr. Herskovits, Mr. DePaoli and Ms. Adams present arguments to the Court. The Court will grant Mineral County's Motion 31 32 in 3:73-cv-127. The Court directs Mineral County to prepare the order. The Court directs the preparation of a transcript in the matter that will be filed in all three cases. Mr. DiPaoli asks the Court about service of the proposed amended complaint in intervention and whether the complaint should be filed in the C case. The Court grants the motion as to the B and C cases and directs service of Mineral County's Complaint in intervention to all ground and surface users affected by the equity proceeding. The Court expands the website to the B and C cases to facilitate the service of all. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF) (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
July 25, 2013 Filing 266 TRANSMITTAL from USDC to Plaintiff - SECOND COPY of #265 Order pursuant to #265 Order. (DRM)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 265 IT IS ORDERED that petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from entry of this order within which to have the filing fee of five dollars ($5.00) sent to the Clerk of Court. Failure to timely comply with this order will result in the dismissal of this action without further advance notice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall send petitioner two (2) copies of this order. Petitioner shall make the necessary arrangements to have one (1) copy of this order attached to the check paying the filing fee. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 25, 2013 Filing 264 TRANSMITTAL from USDC to Plaintiff : Forms and Instructions pursuant to #262 Screening Order. ( Attachments: #1 Instructions ) (DRM)
July 25, 2013 Filing 263 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Derek Kirk. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 8/4/2013. Proof of service due by 11/22/2013. ( Copy of Complaint transmitted electronically to NNCC for distribution to plaintiff pursuant to #262 Order.) (DRM)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 SCREENING ORDER - Clerk shall DETACH and FILE the complaint. Amended Complaint deadline: 8/24/2013. FURTHER ORD the Clerk shall send to P a blank 1983 form with instructions, along with one copy of the original complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/1/2013. (copy of complaint sent to P)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 2, 2013 Filing 261 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 74 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint, Motion Hearing before None Assigned NA. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Felicia Zabin, 702-676-1087. Tape Number: asdfsadf. (AF)
April 2, 2013 Filing 260 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge David W. Hagen, on 4/2/2013. By Deputy Clerk: Amber Freeman. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/20/2013. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF) Modified on 4/9/2013 to attempt change to an existing docket number (DRM).
April 2, 2013 Filing 259 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable None Assigned NA, on 4/2/2013. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/20/2013. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
March 20, 2013 Filing 254 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. (AF)
March 18, 2013 Filing 253 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland : Opposition due twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due fourteen (14) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by None Assigned NA. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
March 18, 2013 Filing 251 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint* in this action was filed on* 3/1/2013.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*John Doe.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 4/17/2013. (AF)
March 18, 2013 Filing 250 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within thirty (30) days, the Clerk's office will make application to the Court for dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 4/17/2013. (AF)
March 18, 2013 Filing 249 NOTICE to Plaintiff from USDC advising case against defendant John Doe, et al., has been received and assigned case number 12-134532. (AF)
March 18, 2013 Filing 248 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable None Assigned NA, on 3/18/2013. This action was received on* new york* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* NVD* and assigned case number 12-=134134. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 4/17/2013. Verified Petition due by 5/2/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
March 18, 2013 Filing 247 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks, on 3/18/2013. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/5/2013. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
March 18, 2013 Filing 246 NOTICE to Plaintiff from USDC advising case against defendant John Doe, et al. has been received and assigned case number 12-134134. (Inmate #*12345*) (AF)
March 18, 2013 Filing 245 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks, on 3/18/2013. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/5/2013. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
March 15, 2013 Filing 242 NOTICE to Plaintiff from USDC advising case against defendant asdfasdf, et al. has been received and assigned case number asdfasd. (Inmate #*asdfasd*) (AF)
March 11, 2013 Filing 230 AFFIDAVIT re 11 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter ; filed by Defendant GRAND CASINO RESORTS. (LG) (Main Document 230 replaced on 3/11/2013) (AF).
March 11, 2013 Filing 229 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by FourthParty Defendant Edward Cullen. Motion ripe 3/11/2013. (LG)
March 9, 2013 Filing 228 NOTICE by Jane Smith re #220 Notice (Other). (AF)
February 25, 2013 Filing 227 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by ThirdParty Defendant BABY BOY CHARLES. Motion ripe 2/25/2013. (LG)
February 4, 2013 Filing 226 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable None Assigned NA, on 2/4/2013. This action was received on* 1/15/2013* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Northern Division* and assigned case number 2:13-cv-166-GMN. All future documents must bear said correct case number. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
January 3, 2013 Filing 225 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable None Assigned NA, on 1/3/2013. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/21/2013. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
January 3, 2013 Filing 224 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge David A. Ezra, on 1/3/2013. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/21/2013. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
January 3, 2013 Filing 222 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable None Assigned NA, on 1/3/2013. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/21/2013. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
January 3, 2013 Filing 221 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable None Assigned NA, on 1/3/2013. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/21/2013. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
December 28, 2012 Filing 220 NOTICE by Big Red, Inc. re #218 Notice (Other). (AF)
November 1, 2012 Filing 219 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. A hard copy of this notice has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service. (no image attached) (AF)
October 31, 2012 Filing 218 NOTICE by Jane Smith. (Test, Test)
October 25, 2012 Filing 216 MINUTE ORDER dtd 6/11/98 (ECR) ORD minutes 162 filed 12/4/97 are vacated only to extent: briefing sched set by Minutes 162 dir the proposed Ds file rspns to mtn 2 to intervene by 6/15/98 and dir Mineral County to reply by 7/15/98 is vac; FUR ORD Proposed Ds sh have till 10/1/98 within to file rspns to Mineral County mtn 2 to intervene and Mineral County sh have till 11/1/98 to reply; FUR ORD that any part who object to this M/O shall have till 6/27/98 to file written objection. (WJ, ) Modified on 5/24/2006 (WJ, ). (DRM). (#Walker River Water Case Display Page)
October 25, 2012 Filing 215 TEST TEST TEST. #Walker River Water Case Display Page (AF)
October 15, 2012 Filing 214 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #212 MOTION to Dismiss : Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by None Assigned NA on 10/15/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JK)
October 15, 2012 Filing 213 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #212 MOTION to Dismiss : Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by None Assigned NA on 10/15/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 15, 2012 Filing 212 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/1/2012. (DRM)
August 20, 2012 Filing 211 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable None Assigned NA, on 8/20/2012. Calendar Call set for 9/11/2012 09:00 AM before None Assigned NA. Jury Trial set for 9/18/2012 08:30 AM before None Assigned NA.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
June 29, 2012 Filing 210 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Amended Complaint* in this action was filed on* 2/6/2012.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Jane Doe.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 7/29/2012. (AF)
June 29, 2012 Filing 209 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Petition for Removal* in this action was filed on* 2/6/2012.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*John Doe.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 7/29/2012. (AF)
April 6, 2012 Filing 208 ANSWER to #117 Complaint ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/16/2012., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/21/2012.), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against BABY BOY CHARLES filed by JASON JONES.(AF)
March 28, 2012 Filing 207 Transcript Redaction Request re 112 Transcript by attorney Test Test. (LG)
December 13, 2011 Filing 206 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 12/13/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Amber Freeman. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/31/2011. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/15/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF) (Main Document 206 replaced on 3/11/2013) (LG).
November 28, 2011 Filing 205 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (LG)
November 25, 2011 Filing 204 NOTICE by Defendant Big Bird Co. re 203 Petition for Removal. (AF)
November 16, 2011 Filing 203 PETITION FOR REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 350), filed by GRAND CASINO RESORTS. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/26/2011. (Notice: There are unresolved motions or issues that require the court's immediate attention.) (AF)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/2/2011. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - test, chambers)
October 13, 2011 TEST TEST TEST. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (AF)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 199 Screening Order,, Report and Recommendation, 199 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 195 MOTION to remove attorney(s) James Edward and David Booker from the Electronic Service List in this case, filed by Angela Griffin. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 195 MOTION to remove attorney(s) James Edward and David Booker from the Electronic Service List in this case, filed by Angela Griffin.. Signed by None Assigned NA. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
August 23, 2011 Filing 200 OBJECTION to 199 Report and Recommendation by Defendant Angela Griffin. Response to Objections to R&R due by 9/9/2011. (AF)
August 23, 2011 Filing 199 SCREENING ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ( 90-day stay report due 11/21/2011.), REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 195 MOTION to remove attorney(s) James Edward and David Booker from the Electronic Service List in this case, filed by Angela Griffin.( Objections to R&R due by 9/9/2011) Signed by None Assigned NA. (copy of complaint sent to P)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
July 25, 2011 Filing 198 ERROR NOTICE to counsel All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Smith advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations which have a direct, pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached)(AF)
March 29, 2011 Filing 197 USCA, Federal Circuit Appellate Case Number 1321321 assigned to 73 Notice of Appeal filed by Ugly Duckling Carsales. (AF)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting 195 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Judge David W. Hagen. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
March 24, 2011 Filing 195 MOTION to remove attorney(s) James Edward and David Booker from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendant Angela Griffin. Motion ripe 3/24/2011. (AF)
February 8, 2011 Filing 194 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge David W. Hagen, on 2/8/2011. RE: 191 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Big Bird Co.., 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2011 09:00 AM before Phyllis H. Atkins.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 193 SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 12/15/2010. Motions due by 12/22/2010. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/29/2010. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
December 2, 2010 Filing 192 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Darcy against Edward Cullen. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
December 2, 2010 Filing 191 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Big Bird Co.. Objections to R&R due by 12/19/2010 Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
November 22, 2010 Filing 190 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge David W. Hagen, on 11/22/2010. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/10/2010. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/25/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
November 21, 2010 Filing 189 NOTICE by Defendant Ugly Duckling Carsales re #187 Appendix. (AF)
November 5, 2010 Filing 188 NOTICE - Pursuant to the order of the court #151 via this docket entry, the clerk forwards #132-Order to issue permanent and #133-Permanent Injunction to parties in this action.(LG)
September 30, 2010 Filing 187 APPENDIX filed by Defendant Big Red, Inc.. (AF)
July 6, 2010 Filing 185 Submission of PROPOSED Order of Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 4(m) as to *John Doe and Jane Doe*. (AF)
July 6, 2010 Filing 184 Submission of PROPOSED Order of Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 4(m) as to *John Doe and Jane Doe*. (AF)
July 6, 2010 Filing 183 Submission of PROPOSED Order of Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 4(m) as to *John Doe*. (AF)
July 6, 2010 Filing 182 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Lloyd D. George, on 7/6/2010. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 8/5/2010. Verified Petition due by 8/20/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
July 6, 2010 Filing 181 Submission of PROPOSED Order of Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 4(m) as to *John Doe*. (AF)
June 29, 2010 Filing 180 ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of 96 Certificate of Interested Parties. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney John Dummy advised that in the future Certificate of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations which have a direct, pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached)(AF)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting 177 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rich Barron for Big Bird Co. and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge David W. Hagen. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting 176 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard S. Baron for Big Bird Co. and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge David W. Hagen. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
May 25, 2010 Filing 177 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Richard Baron and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Tony Smith (Filing fee $ 175) filed by Defendant Big Bird Co.. Motion ripe 5/25/2010. (AF)
May 25, 2010 Filing 176 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Richard Baron and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Tony Smith (Filing fee $ 175) by Defendant Big Bird Co.. Motion ripe 5/25/2010. (AF)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Opposition due twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due fourteen (14) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge David W. Hagen on 05/05/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Opposition due twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due fourteen (14) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/21/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 04/20/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
April 15, 2010 Filing 171 NOTICE to Plaintiff from USDC advising case against defendant John Smith, et al. has been received and assigned case number 76-cv-521-TEST-TEST. (Inmate #*100022*) (AF)
April 15, 2010 Filing 170 NOTICE to Plaintiff from USDC advising case against defendant John Smith, et al., has been received and assigned case number 76-cv-521-test-test. (AF)
April 8, 2010 Filing 169 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge David A. Ezra, on 4/8/2010. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/26/2010. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/11/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 05/05/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
April 6, 2010 Filing 167 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (LG)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER ON STIPULATION re 165 Proposed Order Submission. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
February 23, 2010 Filing 165 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendants Attorney General of the State of Nevada, Big Bird Co., Big Red, Inc., GRAND CASINO RESORTS, JASON JONES, MGM, Ugly Duckling Carsales, Big 4 Rents, Inc, FourthParty Defendant Edward Cullen, FourthParty Plaintiff Darcy, Counter Defendant Mitchell Griffin, Interested Party Payless Car Rental, ThirdParty Defendant Payless Car Rental, ThirdParty Plaintiff Jane Smith, Plaintiff Jane Smith, Nominal Defendant Test Test. (AF)
February 22, 2010 Filing 164 TRANSMITTAL RETURN. Transferred case opened in Arizona as case 4:10-cv-00123 on 2/22/2010. (AF)
February 22, 2010 Filing 163 TRANSMITTAL of case to the District of Arizona. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. (no image attached) (AF)
February 19, 2010 Filing 162 RESPONSE to 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Jane Smith. Replies due by 3/8/2010. (AF)
February 19, 2010 Filing 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Big Bird Co.. Responses due by 3/15/2010. (AF)
February 11, 2010 Filing 160 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 3/28/2010.(no image attached) (AF)
January 7, 2010 Filing 159 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (AF)
January 7, 2010 Filing 158 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (AF)
December 22, 2009 Filing 157 NOTICE to Plaintiff from USDC advising case against defendant John Doe, et al., et al. has been received and assigned case number 3:76-cv-00521. (Inmate #*123654*) (AF)
December 22, 2009 Filing 156 NOTICE to Plaintiff from USDC: Please be advised that case against defendant John Doe, et al. has been received and assigned case number 3:76-cv-521. (Inmate #*123456*) (AF)
December 22, 2009 Filing 155 NOTICE to Plaintiff (Inmate #*1012224-34*) from USDC: Please be advised that case against defendant John Doe, et al. has been received and assigned case number 3:76-cv-521. (AF)
December 9, 2009 Filing 154 NOTICE to Plaintiff (Inmate #*101225654*) from USDC: Please be advised that case against defendant Dept of Corrections, et al. has been received and assigned case number 3:76-cv-00521. (AF)
December 9, 2009 Filing 153 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge David W. Hagen, on 12/9/2009. By Deputy Clerk: Amber Freeman. This action was received on* 12/7/2009* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Norther District of California* and assigned case number 3:76-cv-00521. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 1/8/2010. Verified Petition due by 1/23/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
December 9, 2009 Filing 152 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge David W. Hagen, on 12/9/2009. By Deputy Clerk: Amber Freeman. This action was received on* 12/8/2009* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* N. Dist. of California* and assigned case number 3:76-cv-00521. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 1/8/2010. Verified Petition due by 1/23/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
December 9, 2009 Filing 151 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge David W. Hagen, on 12/9/2009. By Deputy Clerk: Amber Freeman. This action was received on* December 7, 2009* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Northern District of California* and assigned case number* 3:76-cv-00521.* All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 1/8/2010. Verified Petition due by 1/23/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
December 9, 2009 Filing 150 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge David W. Hagen, on 12/9/2009. By Deputy Clerk: Amber Freeman. This action was received on* December 7, 2009* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Northern District of California* and assigned case number* 3:76-cv-00521-XXX-XXX.* All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 1/8/2010. Verified Petition due by 1/23/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
December 8, 2009 Filing 149 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The complaint in this action was filed on* November 12, 2009.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*John Doe.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 1/7/2010. (AF)
December 8, 2009 Filing 148 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within thirty (30) days, the Clerk's office will make application to the Court for dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 1/7/2010. (AF)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to 99 MOTION for Relief from Early Neutral Evaluation : Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge David W. Hagen on 12/8/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
December 3, 2009 Filing 146 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within thirty (30) days, the Clerk's office will make application to the Court for dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 1/2/2010. (LG)
November 28, 2009 Filing 145 NOTICE by Defendant Big Bird Co. (AF)
October 29, 2009 Filing 144 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Lloyd D. George, on 10/29/2009. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/16/2009. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/1/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Jimmy Dean shall have a period of 10 calendar days from the filing date of this order within which to fully comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/15/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 10/27/09. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
October 22, 2009 Filing 142 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Philip M. Pro, on 10/22/2009. By Deputy Clerk: Lia Griffin. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/9/2009. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/24/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
October 22, 2009 Filing 141 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The complaint in this action was filed on* June 3, 2009.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Jane Dalai and Jim Burns.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 11/21/2009. (LG)
September 22, 2009 Filing 140 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The complaint in this action was filed on* 8/8/8.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*jim.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 10/22/2009. (LG)
September 8, 2009 Filing 139 NOTICE by FourthParty Plaintiff Darcy (AF)
September 8, 2009 Filing 138 NOTICE by Defendant Attorney General of the State of Nevada (AF)
September 8, 2009 Filing 137 NOTICE by Defendant Big Red, Inc. (AF)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Signed by None Assigned NA - DJ. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 132 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by None Assigned NA - DJ. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Signed by None Assigned NA - DJ. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
June 18, 2009 Filing 133 USCA Appeal Case Number 09-12345 assigned to 73 Notice of Appeal filed by Ugly Duckling Carsales. (AF)
June 12, 2009 Filing 132 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Jane Smith. Motion ripe 6/12/2009. (AF)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER- granting 60 Motion to Extend Time to Submit Proposed Order.(Submission of Proposed Order due by 9/19/2008.) Signed by None Assigned NA - DJ. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 129 Motion to Extend Time re 129 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter. Responses due by 10/31/2009. Signed by None Assigned NA - DJ. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BLG)
September 17, 2008 Filing 129 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter by Plaintiff Jane Smith. Motion ripe 9/17/2008. (BLG)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 127 Motion for Hearing on Proposed Pretrial Order. It is further ordered that counsel shall file a joint proposed pretrial order by 8/15/09. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2009 08:00 AM before None Assigned NA - DJ. Signed by None Assigned NA - DJ. Again the only question asked is does this effect Hearing Date and that is all your allowed to adjust by the granting of this order. This order would cause an addition utility entry in order to capture the due date for proposed joint pretrial order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BLG)
September 17, 2008 Filing 127 MOTION for Hearing on Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Jane Smith. Motion ripe 9/17/2008. (BLG)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 125 Motion to Vacate hearing set for 12/20/09 @ 9AM. Hearing is hereby reset for January 10, 2009 @ 9AM. It is further ordered that the briefing schedule is vacated and reset for 1/5/09. Signed by None Assigned NA - DJ.NO RESET DEADLINE HEARING access with this type of motion which could be used for many things that might effect the scheduling deadlines in a case I think we need the reset deadline/hearing to come-up for the ORDER when it grants this type of motion. The way it is now you'd have to go into utilities to adjust the hearing dates and or scheduling dates. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BLG) Modified on 9/17/2008 (BLG).
September 17, 2008 Filing 125 MOTION to Vacate hearing on 12/20/09 @ 9am by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (BLG)
September 16, 2008 Filing 124 JOINDER to exparte motion filed by Defendant JASON JONES. (BLG)
September 8, 2008 Filing 123 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Jim to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #link. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 9/25/2008.(no image attached) (LG)
August 26, 2008 Filing 122 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 8/26/2008. By Deputy Clerk: Lia Griffin. Attorney Joe Jones is in violation of Special Order 109. Counsel is advised to register for CM/ECF by completing the Attorney Registration Form from the Court's Website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov and then filing a "Notice of Compliance with Special Order 109" as a separate event under the "Notices" category. Notice of Compliance is due by 9/10/2008.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
August 26, 2008 Filing 121 (2nd Notice) PURSUANT TO SPECIAL ORDER 109: that Joe Jones is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (LG)
August 26, 2008 Filing 120 (1st Notice) PURSUANT TO SPECIAL ORDER 109: that Joe Jones is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (LG)
August 12, 2008 Filing 119 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland : Opposition due fifteen (15) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due eleven (11) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by None Assigned NA - DJ on 111. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
August 8, 2008 Filing 118 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland : Opposition due fifteen (15) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due eleven (11) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by None Assigned NA - DJ. #(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
June 17, 2008 Filing 117 COMPLAINT against JASON JONES (Filing fee $ 350), filed by Jane Smith.(AF)
June 4, 2008 Filing 115 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel John Doe to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #link. Counsel is also required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Courts website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 7/4/2008.(no image attached) (AF)
May 29, 2008 Filing 114 NOTICE of Hearing: Calendar Call set for 5/30/2008 09:00 AM before None Assigned NA. (no image attached)(AF) Modified on 5/29/2008 (AF).
May 22, 2008 Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/12/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2008. (AF)
May 22, 2008 Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, held on 3/1/08, before Judge Reed. Court Reporter/Transcriber D. Davidson, Telephone number 775-123-1111. Tape Number: 01-1111. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov target=_blank before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/12/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2008. (AF) Modified on 5/22/2008 (AF). Modified on 5/22/2008 (AF). Modified on 5/29/2008 (AF).
May 22, 2008 Filing 111 MANDATE of USCA as to 101 USCA Judgment (AF)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER on Mandate as to 109 Proposed Order on Mandate, 102 USCA Mandate. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 5/22/08. (AF)
May 19, 2008 Filing 108 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #link. (no image attached) (AF) Modified on 5/19/2008 (AF). Modified on 5/19/2008 (AF). Modified on 5/19/2008 (AF).
May 19, 2008 Filing 107 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #link. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (AF) Modified on 5/19/2008 (AF). Modified on 5/19/2008 (AF). Modified on 5/19/2008 (AF). Modified on 5/19/2008 (AF).
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 105 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney test t test for Jane Smith and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by None Assigned NA on uu. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
May 6, 2008 Filing 105 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by fm and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel mh (Filing fee $ 175) filed by Defendant GRAND CASINO RESORTS. Motion ripe 5/6/2008. (LG)
March 28, 2008 Filing 102 MANDATE of USCA as to 101 USCA Judgment (AF)
March 28, 2008 Filing 101 JUDGMENT of USCA as to 73 Notice of Appeal filed by Ugly Duckling Carsales (AF)
February 28, 2008 Filing 100 NOTICE to Plaintiff from USDC: Please be advised that case against defendant jhoj, et al. has been received and assigned case number uigiu. All future papers sent to the court for this case must include this number. Any correspondence with the court should be mailed to the Clerk's Office and not directly to the assigned judges. This case has been submitted for review and action by a judicial officer. This review process may take several weeks. Plaintiff will be notified as soon as further action has been taken and will receive copy of all orders filed. (no image attached) (LG)
February 22, 2008 Filing 99 MOTION for Relief from Early Neutral Evaluation by Defendant JASON JONES. Responses due by 3/6/2008. (AF)
February 22, 2008 Filing 98 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Jane Smith as to JASON JONES re 97 Summons Issued, 13 Complaint (AF)
February 22, 2008 Filing 97 Summons Issued as to JASON JONES. (AF)
February 21, 2008 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by JASON JONES. Identifying Corporate Parent WESTINGHOUSE, Other Affiliate Jones-West Ford for JASON JONES. (AF)
February 20, 2008 Filing 95 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter by Defendant JASON JONES. Motion ripe 2/20/2008. (AF)
February 20, 2008 Filing 94 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter by Defendant JASON JONES. Motion ripe 2/20/2008. (AF)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 91 Motion for Hearing.; granting 92 Motion for New Trial.( Jury Trial set for 4/30/2008 08:30 AM before None Assigned NA.) Signed by None Assigned NA. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
February 20, 2008 Filing 92 MOTION for New Trial by Defendant JASON JONES. Responses due by 3/9/2008. (AF)
February 20, 2008 Filing 91 MOTION for Hearing by Defendant JASON JONES. Motion ripe 2/20/2008. (AF)
February 6, 2008 Filing 90 *TEST*TEST*TEST* ORDERgranting 11 Motion to Extend Time. JASON JONES answer due 3/28/2008.; JASON JONES answer due 3/28/2008. Signed by None Assigned NA. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
February 6, 2008 Filing 89 *TEST*TEST*TEST* ORDER: JASON JONES added. Payless Car Rental and Jane Smith terminated. Signed by None Assigned NA. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF) Modified on 5/23/2008 (AF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 88 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - TESTING.FONT COLOR RED FONT COLOR BLUE FONT COLOR GREEN (no image attached) (AF)
February 3, 2008 Filing 86 NOTICE by Plaintiff Jane Smith (AF)
January 17, 2008 Filing 85 NOTICE (AF)
January 9, 2008 Filing 84 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 350), filed by Big 4 Rents, Inc.(LG)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 82 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge None Assigned NA on 111. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
November 20, 2007 Filing 82 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney bob, (Filing fee $ 175) by Defendant Big Red, Inc.. (LG)
November 15, 2007 Filing 81 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The complaint in this action was filed on* August 15, 2007.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Defendants.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 12/15/2007. (AF)
November 15, 2007 Filing 80 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within thirty (30) days, the Clerk's office will make application to the Court for dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 12/15/2007. (AF)
November 15, 2007 Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable None Assigned NA, U.S. Magistrate Judge, on 11/15/2007. By Deputy Clerk: AF. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/30/2007 Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/15/2007 (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Opposition due fifteen (15) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due eleven (11) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge David W. Hagen on 11/15/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
October 31, 2007 Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable None Assigned NA, U.S. Magistrate Judge, on 10/31/2007. By Deputy Clerk: AF. Attorney John Doe is in violation of Special Order 109. Counsel is advised to register for CM/ECF by completing the Attorney Registration Form from the Court's Website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov and then filing a "Notice of Compliance with Special Order 109" as a separate event under the "Notices" category. Notice of Compliance is due by 11/15/2007.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
October 31, 2007 Filing 76 (2nd Notice) PURSUANT TO SPECIAL ORDER 109: that John Doe is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing ("CM/ECF") program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (AF)
October 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Signed by Judge None Assigned NA on 32. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
October 4, 2007 Filing 74 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 10/4/2007 before Judge None Assigned NA. granting 68 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
September 15, 2007 Filing 72 ANSWER to 70 Complaint by Defendant Big Red, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/25/2007. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/30/2007.(AF)
September 15, 2007 Case assigned to Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr and Valerie P. Cooke. (AF)
September 15, 2007 Filing 71 ANSWER to 70 Complaint by Defendant Ugly Duckling Carsales. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/25/2007. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/30/2007.(AF)
September 14, 2007 Filing 69 ANSWER to 43 Amended Complaint by Defendant MGM.(AF)
September 1, 2007 Filing 70 COMPLAINT against Ugly Duckling Carsales (Filing fee $ 350), filed by Jane Smith. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/11/2007. Proof of service due by 12/30/2007.(AF)
August 28, 2007 Filing 68 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Jane Smith. Responses due by 9/15/2007. (AF)
August 1, 2007 Filing 67 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #link. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (AF)
August 1, 2007 Filing 66 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #link. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (AF)
August 1, 2007 Filing 65 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel John Smith to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #link. Verified Petition due by 8/31/2007.(no image attached) (AF)
August 1, 2007 Filing 64 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are notified that the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form is located on the #Court's website. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (AF)
July 31, 2007 Filing 63 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are notified that the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form is located on the Court's website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (LG)
July 31, 2007 Filing 62 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are notified that the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form is located on the Court's website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (LG)
July 31, 2007 Filing 61 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are notified that the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form is located on the Court's website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (AF)
July 26, 2007 Filing 60 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter by Defendant MGM. (AF)
July 25, 2007 Filing 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Big Red, Inc..Responses due by 8/12/2007. (LG)
July 17, 2007 Filing 58 SEALED NOTICE by Big 4 Rents, Inc (AF)
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 54 Motion to Amend/Correct.; granting 55 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Judge None Assigned NA. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
July 16, 2007 Filing 55 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Jane Smith.Responses due by 8/3/2007. (AF)
July 16, 2007 Filing 54 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Defendant MGM.Responses due by 8/3/2007. (AF)
July 16, 2007 Filing 53 MOTION to Strike by Plaintiff Jane Smith.Responses due by 8/3/2007. (AF)
July 16, 2007 Filing 52 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant MGM.Responses due by 8/3/2007. (AF)
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 49 Motion to Compel.; denying 50 Motion. Signed by Judge None Assigned NA. (Attachments: #1 Main Document #2 Main Document) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
July 16, 2007 Filing 50 MOTION by Plaintiff Jane Smith.Responses due by 8/3/2007. (AF)
July 16, 2007 Filing 49 MOTION to Compel by Defendant MGM.Responses due by 8/3/2007. (AF)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 47 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge None Assigned NA. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF, )
June 25, 2007 Filing 47 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant MGM. Responses due by 7/13/2007. (AF, )
June 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF, )
May 30, 2007 Filing 45 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Payless Car Rental , filed by Jane Smith. Removes parties. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/9/2007.(AF, )
May 30, 2007 Filing 44 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Jane Smith. Adds new parties. (AF, )
May 30, 2007 Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ugly Duckling Carsales, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, MGM, filed by Jane Smith. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 9/27/2007.(AF, )
May 30, 2007 Filing 42 AMENDED PETITION FOR REMOVAL by Jane Smith , filed by Jane Smith. Adds and removes parties. (AF, )
May 30, 2007 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Plaintiff Jane Smith. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (AF, )
May 30, 2007 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case, by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (AF, )
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 38 Request for Review of Magistrate Judge Decision. Signed by Judge None Assigned NA. (AF, )
May 29, 2007 Filing 38 REQUEST for Review of Magistrate Judge Decision by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (AF, )
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying #36 Request for Review of Magistrate Judge Decision. Signed by Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr.. (AF, )
May 29, 2007 Filing 36 REQUEST for Review of Magistrate Judge Decision re #8 Order by Plaintiff Jane Smith.. (Test, Test)
May 29, 2007 Filing 35 STATUS REPORT RE: REMOVAL joint by Plaintiff Jane Smith, Defendant MGM. (Test, Test)
May 29, 2007 Filing 34 STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (Test, Test)
May 29, 2007 Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable None Assigned NA, U.S. Magistrate Judge, on 5/29/2007. IT IS ORDERED that all parties removing actions to this court must, WITHIN 15 DAYS, file and serve a signed Statement including: date complaint served; date summons served; on diversity jurisdiction cases, names of served defendants who are citizens of Nevada, the citizenship of the other parties and a summary of defendants evidence of the amount in controversy;if filed more than 30 days after service, the reason removal has taken place at this time and the date you first received a paper identifying the basis for removal;if action in state court was commenced more than one year before the date of removal, the reasons this action should not summarily be remanded to the state court;name of any defendant known to have been served before removal filed who did not join in removal and reasons they did not;all defendants who joined in removal may file statement jointly.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall, WITHIN 30 DAYS, file a Joint Status Report including:list of pending motions and/or other matters which require the attention of this court and copies of same;statement by counsel of action required to be taken by this court. Removing defendant shall serve a copy of this Order on all other parties to the action no later than the time they file and serve a copy of the Statement required by this Order. A party who learns that the Statement(s) filed pursuant to this Order contain(s) incorrect information shall promptly notify this court in writing. Statement due by 6/13/2007. Status Report due by 6/28/2007.(no image attached) (AF, )
May 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER to Consolidate ; Ord that 3:76-cv-521 is consolidated under 2:75-cv-9999. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks. (AF, )
May 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER to Consolidate ; Ord that is/are consolidated under. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks. (AF, )
May 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER to Consolidate; Ord that 3:76-cv-521 is consolidated under 2:75-cv-9999. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks. (AF)
May 23, 2007 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Larry R. Hicks, U.S. District Judge, on 5/23/2007. By Deputy Clerk: ec. RE: 11 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter Responses due by 5/31/2007. Replies due by 6/13/2007.(no image attached) (EC)
May 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRETRIAL NOTICE ORDER. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/1/1. kjhtyfyvuh(PL)
May 1, 2007 Filing 27 BILL OF COSTS by Defendant Ugly Duckling Carsales. Tax or object to Bill of Costs by 5/16/2007. (AF, )
April 6, 2007 Filing 28 OBJECTION to #26 Bill of Costs; filed by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (AF, )
April 4, 2007 Attorney update in case: Attorney Jeffrey A Dickerson withdrawn from the case. (AF, )
March 20, 2007 Case assigned to Judge None Assigned - DJ NA and None Assigned - MJ NA. (AF, )
March 1, 2007 Filing 26 BILL OF COSTS by Defendant MGM. Tax or object to Bill of Costs by 3/16/2007. (AF, )
February 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Emergency Motion to Reopen Discovery. Signed by Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. on 2/28/2007. (PL, )
February 26, 2007 Filing 20 RECEIPT for Exhibits released to Plaintiff Jane Smith on 2/26/2007 re 19 Order for Release of Exhibits. (no image attached) (AF, )
February 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS. Deadline to return exhibits set for 3/26/2007. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks. (AF, )
January 24, 2007 Filing 16 COSTS TAXED in amount of $ dg against df re 15 Bill of Costs. (LG)
January 24, 2007 Filing 15 BILL OF COSTS by Interested Party Payless Car Rental. Tax or object to Bill of Costs by 2/8/2007. (LG, )
January 24, 2007 Filing 14 ANSWER/ ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant GRAND CASINO RESORTS. The record is available in paper format at the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (LG)
December 6, 2006 Filing 13 COMPLAINT against Ugly Duckling Carsales (Filing fee $ 350) , filed by Jane Smith. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/16/2006.(AF, )
November 27, 2006 Filing 12 RESPONSE to 11 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter; filed by Defendant Ugly Duckling Carsales. (AF, )
November 27, 2006 Filing 11 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter by Plaintiff Jane Smith. (AF, )
November 8, 2006 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Defendant Ugly Duckling Carsales, identifying the following have an interest in the outcome of this case: Payless Car Rental, and Big 4 Rents, Inc. (AF, )
October 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRETRIAL ORDER: Bench Trial set for 5/22/2007 at 9:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 4 before Judge Howard D. McKibben. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 5/17/2007. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/27/2006. (Attachments: #1)(PL, )
October 10, 2006 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: (no image attached)(AF, )
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. (AF)
July 7, 2006 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable David W. Hagen, U.S. District Judge on 7/7/2006. This case having been referred to a United States Magistrate in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), Local Rule IB 2-1; IT IS ORDERED that the action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Phyllis H. Atkins for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number h98. (no image attached) (LG, )
July 7, 2006 Filing 6 NOTICE (LG, )
June 27, 2006 Filing 22 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Settlement Conference held on 6/27/2006 before Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr.. Crtrm Administrator: Paris Lewis; Pla Counsel: Richard Hill; Mark Aberasturi; Def Counsel: Mark Wray; Court Reporter/FTR #: FTR 9:03 a.m. to 11:15 a.m.; Time of Hearing: 9:03 a.m.. Counsel recite the facts and merits of their respective positions. After some discussions, no settlement was reached. IT IS ORDERED that FTR recording of this proceeding is sealed. (no image attached) (PL, )
June 22, 2006 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Howard D. McKibben, U.S. District Judge on 6/22/2006 yigfublm. (no image attached) (LG, )
May 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for Tuesday, 6/27/2006 at 9:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. Written settlement conference statements due in chambers, Room 405, not later than 4:00 p.m. on Thursday, 6/22/2006. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. on 5/9/2006. (Attachments: #1 Supplement JS-10)(PL, )
February 13, 2006 Filing 4 Test document. (Testing speed from outside server per complaint from user). (AF, )
January 24, 2006 Filing 1 NOTICE/Exhibits by Plaintiff Jane Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B#2 Exhibit C#3 Exhibit D#4 Exhibit E)(AF, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ***Test Case*** Jane Smith v. Big Red, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Smith
Represented By: Test Test
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA SMITH
Represented By: Test Test
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Red, Inc.
Represented By: Test Test
Represented By: Mark John Skakun, III
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Jones
Represented By: Test Test
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Test Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ugly Duckling Carsales
Represented By: Louis R Doescher
Represented By: Test Test
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Hattori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID R. HARRIS
Represented By: Test Test
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Griffin
Represented By: Test Test
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Test Freeman
Represented By: Test Test
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?