Montgomery et al v. eTreppid Technologies et al
Case Number: 3:2006cv00056
Filed: January 31, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 JUDGMENT - In accordance with the 1187 Order Approving Settlement and Remanding for Termination of Sanctions Proceedings issued on July 16, 2012 by the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, any sanctions proceedings in this action against Deborah Klar, Teri Pham, and the law firm Liner Grode Stein Yankelevitz Sunshine Regenstreif & Taylor LLP are hereby terminated. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 7/16/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 7/17/2012 to link to USCA Order (PM).
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1180 ORDER denying without prejudice 1151 motion to conform order of magistrate judge to order of district judge; denying without prejudice 1152 motion authorizing sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/7/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Government shall conduct a further review of the materials for purposes of making any necessary redactions to comply with the Protective Ordder 253 previously entered and thereafter shall return the redacted documents to the Court for retention.+ Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 11/17/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 ORDERED that the United States Government shall conduct a review of the documents (referenced herein re D.Mont. case no. 09-60452-7) provided to this Court by the United States Bankruptcy Court, District of Montana, to determine whether any material within the documents is subject to the # 253 Protective Order. The United States shall conduct this review within forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order. The United States shall contact this Court to make arrangements to conduct the review. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/28/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1150 ORDERED that the Objections of Liner Grode Stein Yankelevitz Sunshine Regenstreif & Taylor LLP to Order Re: Motion for Sanctions (# 1035 ) with supporting declaration (# 1036 ) are SUSTAINED without prejudice to any further proceedings consistent wi th this Order with respect to Flynn's motion for sanctions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Objections of Dennis Montgomery to Order Re: Motion for Sanctions ( # 1037 ) are hereby OVERRULED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Teri Pham's Objection t o Magistrate Judge's Order ( # 1040 ) are hereby SUSTAINED without prejudice to any further proceedings consistent with this Order with respect to Flynn's motion for sanctions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Objections of Non-Party Deborah A. Klar to Findings of Magistrate Judge in Stayed Order Re: Motion for Sanctions (# 1042 ) are hereby SUSTAINED without prejudice to any further proceedings consistent with this Order with respect to Flynn's motion for sanctions. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 4/5/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 ORDER granting 1004 Motion to Compel. Mr. Montgomery shall produce the documents listed in the order no later than Wednesday, June 3, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/26/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 985 ORDER granting 545 Mr. Flynn's motion for sanctions pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1927 and/or pursuant to the inherent power of the court. See order for specific details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 3/31/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 968 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 908 compelling discovery and debtors examination. Counsel for the parties shall meet and confer by March 11, 2009 for the purpose of submitting a stipulated protective order, and they shall also confer w ith counsel for the United States. To the extent they agree on the terms of the protective order, it shall be filed with the Clerk of Court no later than March 16,2 009. See order for further details and provisions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/25/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 965 ORDER denying as moot 540 Motion to establish procedures to comply with Nevada Rules of Professional Conduct 3.3(a)(3) and (b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/20/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery et al v. eTreppid Technologies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?