Kegel v. Brown & Williiamson Tobacco Corporation
Case Number: 3:2006cv00093
Filed: February 17, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Brian E. Sandoval
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the 214 Motion to Strike Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. FURTH ORD that the 211 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/25/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER DENYING D's 195 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORD parties' Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/10/2010. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/9/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER denying 175 defendant's Motion to Amend/Correct 09/25/2009 Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is referred to the Honorable Valerie P. Cooke for the purpose of establishing a discovery schedule for Plaintiff's Tenth Claim for Relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a pretrial order shall follow 30 days after the established discovery deadline or a decision upon any dispositive motions concerning the Tenth Claim for Relief. See order re specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/13/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER APPROVING 186 parties' Stipulation for an extension of time for defendant to reply to 175 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct 174 MOTION to Amend/Correct 173 Order on Motion to Dismiss. ( Replies due by 12/30/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/28/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER approving 183 Stipulation between plaintiff and defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company for an extension of time for defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Co. to file its reply to 175 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct 173 Order on Motion to Dismiss. ( Replies due by 12/23/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/4/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER APPROVING 180 parties' Stipulation for plaintiff to file his opposition to 175 defendants' Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct 173 Order. ( Responses due by 11/30/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/19/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER APPROVING 178 parties' Stipulation for an extension of time for plaintiff to file his opposition to [175) defendants' motion to amend 09/25/2009 order. ( Responses due by 11/17/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/29/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER APPROVING 176 parties' to amend scheduling order. The deadline for submitting the proposed joint pretrial order shall be no earlier than 30 days after the determination of the pending motion to amend to permit interlocutory appeal & the determination of such appeal if allowed. See order re specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/27/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER denying 160 Motion to Dismiss. granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 09/24/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER APPROVING 170 parties' Stipulation for Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company to reply to 160 MOTION to Dismiss Tenth Claim for Relief. ( Replies due by 7/16/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/29/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER APPROVING 166 parties' Stipulation for an extension for plaintiff to file his opposition to 160 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Tenth Claim for Relief and to reply to 155 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re 150 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. ( Response to 160 due by 6/22/2009, Reply to 155 due by 6/22/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/11/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER APPROVING 162 parties' Stipulation for an extension of time for Plaintiff to file his opposition to 160 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Tenth Claim for Relief. ( Responses due by 5/18/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/4/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER APPROVING nunc pro tunc 158 parties' Stipulation for defendants to respond to 155 plaintiff's MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re 150 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. ( Responses due by 4/20/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/14/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 115 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 140 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have 10 days from the issuance of this order to amend his complaint. See order re specifics. ( Amended Complaint deadline: 3/23/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/10/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have 10 days from the issuance of this order to identify exhibits containing information prohibited by Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 and Special Order No. 108. See order re specifics.( Notice of Compliance is due by 3/12/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/2/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kegel v. Brown & Williiamson Tobacco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?