Sonderfan v. Washoe County
Case Number: 3:2006cv00108
Filed: February 28, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. Judgment is entered in favor of respondents. Signed by Lance S. Wilson on 08/25/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 respondents' second Motion to Extend Time to file and serve an answer to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. ( Responses due by 7/23/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/10/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Respondents' Motion to Extend Time to file and serve an answer to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. ( Responses due by 6/8/2009. ) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/24/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 17 Petitioner's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. The court finds Ground Four of Petition has been exhausted. While the court finds Grounds Two and Three unexhausted, the parties shall have an opportunity to disc uss whether these grounds would be procedurally defaulted in the state court and whether Petitioner can show cause and prejudice for such a default or that this court's failure to consider Grounds Two and Three would result in a fundamental misc arriage of justice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents shall file an answer to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within 30 days of the entry of this order and substantively address all grounds in the petition, including any procedural default issues. See order re specifics. ( Answer due by 4/24/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/25/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonderfan v. Washoe County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?