William England v. State Of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: William England
Defendant: State Of Nevada, Glen Whorton, Dorothy Nash Holmes, Dennis Debacco, Donald Helling, Wes Mattice, Jim Benedetti, Tony Corda, Jane Thompson, Pat York and Nicky Brooks
Case Number: 3:2006cv00576
Filed: September 12, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: Washoe
Presiding Judge: Brian E. Sandoval
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER re 194 Motion to Vacate Trial Date Pending Decision on Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. The trial date of March 14, 2011, is VACATED. A hearing on the Motion to Enforce Settlement 193 is scheduled on March 16, 2011, at 9:00 a.m. The Attorney General's Office will make arrangements to have Mr. England present at the hearing. The trial date is rescheduled to Monday, May 23, 2011, at 9:00 a.m. A Pretrial Status Conference is scheduled on Thursday, May 19, 2011, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 2/24/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER denying 188 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 2/8/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 168 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 10/5/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 9/14/2010 before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Jennifer Cotter; Pla Counsel: William England, In Pro Per (telephonically); Def Counsel: Clark Leslie (te lephonically); FTR #: 11:16:11 a.m. - 11:22:10 a.m.; Courtroom: 2. IT IS ORDERED that 158 Motion for Order for Plaintiff to Correspond with Witnesses and 159 Motion to Enlarge Copy Limit are GRANTED to the extent as shown in attached minutes. Please see attached minutes for details. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER denying 132 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Compelling Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 8/25/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying 127 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment was prepared and delivered to the mailroom on June 16, 2009, which was four (4) days past the dispositi ve motion cut-off date. Defendants shall have fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order in which to file an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 126 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 7/1/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William England v. State Of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Whorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Nash Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Debacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Helling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes Mattice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Benedetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Corda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicky Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?