Manzanares v. Elko County School District et al Featured Case

Plaintiff sued defendants Elko County School District, Gary Lee Jones, Sr., and the Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and the Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Plaintiff alleged that the Gary Lee Jones served as the Branch President of the LDS Church and as a building superintendent of the Elko County School District. Plaintiff further alleged that the LDS Church and the Elko County School District were informed that Gary Lee Jones engaged in inappropriate conduct and sexually abused plaintiff, but neither parties took any action to protect plaintiff or report the sexual abuse to law enforcement authorities.

Plaintiff: Da-Daze-Nom Manzanares
Defendant: Elko County School District and Gary Lee Jones, Sr.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00076
Filed: February 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: Elko
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50
ORDER ON 49 STIPULATION: Stipulation that all claims, causes and counts set forth in all Complaints and proposed Complaints be dismissed with predjudice against the LDS Defendants. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/4/2007. See stip and ord for spec. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
October 2, 2007 Filing 49
STIPULATION of Dismissal and Order For Dismissal With Prejudice by Plaintiff Da-Daze-Nom Manzanares, Defendants Elko County School District, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Successors. (Robison, Kent)
September 20, 2007 Filing 48
REPLY to Response to filed by Plaintiff Da-Daze-Nom Manzanares. (Kump, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/24/2007 to add link to Motion 34(Gorbet, Brenda).
September 17, 2007 Filing 47
RESPONSE to 34 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint ; filed by Defendant Elko County School District. Replies due by 10/1/2007. (Beko, Thomas)
September 14, 2007 Filing 45
STIPULATION to Extend Expert Report Disclosure Deadline (First Request for Extension) by Defendants Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Successors. (Brust, Clayton)
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44
ORDER ON STIPULATION re 38 Stipulation to Allow Independent Medical Examination. Signed by Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. on 9/11/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 10, 2007 Filing 43
RESPONSE to 34 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint ; filed by Defendant Gary Lee Jones, Sr. Opposition to Plainitff's Motion to Amend First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial Replies due by 9/24/2007. (Watson, Kelly)
August 30, 2007 Filing 34
Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Da-Daze-Nom Manzanares. Responses due by 9/17/2007. (Kump, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33
SCHEDULING ORDER re 32 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/27/2007. Motions due by 12/27/2007. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/25/2008. Signed by Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. on 6/14/2007. (HJ, )
June 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31
ORDER re 26 parties' Stipulation for Defendants LDS to file and serve reply in support of their 15 motion to dismiss. Replies due by 6/11/2007. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/11/07. (SL, )
June 8, 2007 Filing 29
REPLY to Response to 15 MOTION to Dismiss with Certificate of Service; filed by Defendants Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Successors. Reply In Support of Defendants Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints' and Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Successors' Motion to Dismiss (Brust, Clayton)
June 7, 2007 Filing 27
AFFIDAVIT of Clayton Brust re 15 MOTION to Dismiss with Certificate of Service, 26 Stipulation, ; by Defendants Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Successors. (Brust, Clayton)
May 31, 2007 Filing 25
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Da-Daze-Nom Manzanares. Responses due by 6/18/2007. Re-Docketed Motion portion of 24 in order to capture motion tracking status.(BLG) Modified on 6/1/2007 (BLG). Modified on 9/6/2007 (Gorbet, Brenda).
May 15, 2007 Filing 23
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties with Certificate of Service by Defendants Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Successors. (Robison, Kent) Modified on 5/16/2007 to reflect No Other Known Interested Parties. (BLG).
May 14, 2007 Filing 22
RESPONSE to 15 MOTION to Dismiss with Certificate of Service; filed by Plaintiff Da-Daze-Nom Manzanares. Replies due by 5/28/2007. (Kump, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2007 Filing 19
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Defendant Gary Lee Jones, Sr. (Dodrill, Colt) Modified on 5/14/2007 to reflect No Other Known Interested Parties. (BLG).
May 7, 2007 Filing 17
ANSWER to 1 Complaint Defendant, Gary Lee Jones, Sr.'s, Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Gary Lee Jones, Sr. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/17/2007. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/21/2007.(Dodrill, Colt)
May 2, 2007 Filing 16
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Defendant Elko County School District. (Beko, Thomas) Modified on 5/3/2007 to reflect No Other Known Interested Parties (BLG).
April 26, 2007 Filing 15
MOTION to Dismiss with Certificate of Service by Defendants Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Successors. Responses due by 5/14/2007. (Robison, Kent)
April 23, 2007 Filing 14
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Defendants Gary Lee Jones, Sr, Gary Lee Jones, Sr. Gary Lee Jones, Sr served on 4/13/2007, answer due 5/3/2007. (Kump, Jeffrey)
April 18, 2007 Filing 11
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Defendant Elko County School District. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/28/2007. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/2/2007.(Beko, Thomas)
February 21, 2007 Filing 10
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Da-Daze-Nom Manzanares, Defendant Elko County School District. Elko County School District accepted service on 2/20/2007, answer due 4/21/2007. (Kump, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2007 Filing 9
SUMMONS Issued as to Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (LK )
February 14, 2007 Filing 5
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, filed by Plaintiff Da-Daze-Nom Manzanares. (Kump, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/15/2007 Summons iss'd on 2/15/07 (LK ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manzanares v. Elko County School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Da-Daze-Nom Manzanares
Represented By: Kent R. Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elko County School District
Represented By: Kent R. Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Lee Jones, Sr.
Represented By: Kelly G Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?