Newberg v. Plamer et al
Petitioner: Steven Lee Newberg
Respondent: Plamer and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2007cv00189
Filed: April 18, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: Pershing
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Lance S. Wilson on 10/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER directing Clerk to strike Petitioner's ECF No. 75 Motion to Refile. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting Petitioner's 65 unopposed motion for enlargement of time. Petitioner's reply to answer due 2/25/2015. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting in part 50 Motion to Dismiss. Ground 5(c) and double-jeopardy claim of ground 4 dismissed with prejudice. Respondents shall have 45 days to file answer. Petitioner shall have 45 days from date answer is served to file reply. No action will be taken on Motion for Enlargement of Time 51 . Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 41 Motion to Reopen Case. Respondents shall have 45days to answer or respond to 2nd amended petition 42 ; reply due 45 days after. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 05/17/13.Case reopened. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newberg v. Plamer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Lee Newberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Plamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?