Blaisdell v. Skolnik et al
Petitioner: Stephen A. Blaisdell
Respondent: Howard Skolnik and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2008cv00094
Filed: February 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: Washoe
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. On 08/13/2010, the court denied the petition for writ of habeas corpus and at the same time denied a certificate of appealability. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's application for certificate of appealability 44 is DENIED AS MOOT. (NOTE: Copy of NEF emailed to USCA - 10-17039) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/07/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the 7 petition is DENIED. Signed by Lance S. Wilson on 8/13/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the petition is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that no certificate of appealability shall issue. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/12/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 29 petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 30 respondents' Motion to Extend Time to prepare and file their answer to the remaining claims of the petition. No further enlargements of time for this purpose shall be granted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. See order re specifics. ( Responses due by 3/25/2010.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/8/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 respondents' Motion to Extend Time to file and serve an answer to 7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. ( Responses due by 2/5/2010.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/29/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 petitioner's Motion to Extend Time up to and including 11/27/2009, in which to file a declaration of abandonment or dismissal or a motion for a stay and abeyance. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/29/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 respondents' Motion to Dismiss. The court finds that grounds two and three are unexhausted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall have thirty (30) days (to and including 11/6/2009) to eith er: (1) inform this Court in a sworn declaration that he wishes to formally and forever abandon the unexhausted grounds for relief in his federal habeas petition and proceed on the exhausted grounds; OR (2) inform this Court in a sworn declaration th at he wishes to dismiss this petition without prejudice in order to return to state court to exhaust his unexhausted claims; OR (3) file a motion for a stay and abeyance, asking this Court to hold his exhausted claims in abeyance while he returns to state court to exhaust his unexhausted claims. If petitioner chooses to file a motion for a stay and abeyance, or seek other appropriate relief, respondents may respond to such motion as provided in Local Rule 7-2. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if pet itioner elects to abandon his unexhausted grounds, respondents shall have thirty (30) days from the date petitioner serves his declaration of abandonment in which to file an answer to petitioners remaining grounds for relief. Petitioner shall therea fter have twenty (20) days following service of respondents answer in which to file a reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if petitioner fails to respond to this order within the time permitted, this case may be dismissed. See order re specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/6/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 13 respondents' Motion for Leave to File a late pleading; granting 14 respondents' Motion to Extend Time to file and serve a response to 7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED ABSENT A SHOWING OF EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES. ( Responses due by 6/22/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/19/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 respndents' second Motion to Extend Time in which to file and serve a response to 7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. ( Responses due by 5/10/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/6/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 9 respondents' first Motion to Extend Time to file and serve an answer to 7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. ( Answers due by 3/26/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/12/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blaisdell v. Skolnik et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen A. Blaisdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Howard Skolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?