Moulton v. Eugene Burger Management Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sheryl Moulton
Defendant: Eugene Burger Management Corporation, Eugene J. Burger, Kevin Berg, Karen Brigg, Phil, Frink & Associates, Inc., Phillip E. Frink, Gayle A. Kern, LTD, Gayle A. Kern, Ulla Christensen, Michael Grady, Daniel Joseph, Frank Perau, Rich Svihla, Lakeside Plaza Condominium Association and Kevin A. Brown
Case Number: 3:2008cv00176
Filed: March 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Brian E. Sandoval
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Moulton's request for an extension oftime to file a notice of appeal 141 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension to File Untimely Notice of Appeal 147 is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this order be served to the Ninth Circuit (SENT). (See USCA Order 146 11-15554) Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants' 131 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 1/14/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 JUDGMENT - The Request for Entry of Judgment (# 130 ) filed by Defendant Gayle A. Kern, Ltd. ("Kern") on July 12, 2010. is GRANTED, and Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Kern and against Plaintiff in the amount of $1,130.78 plus interestSigned by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 11/29/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING D Kevin Berg's 114 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Brian E. Sandoval on 7/9/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Kern Ds' 91 Renewed Motion to Dismiss and Joinder in Motion to Dismiss. The motion to quash service of process is DENIED as to Gayle A. Kern Ltd. The motion to quash service of process is GRANTED as to Gayle A. Kern. The Kern Ds' motion to dismiss P's Fair Debt Collections Practices Act claim is DENIED. The Kern Ds' motion to dismiss P's RICO clains for failing to satisfy Rule 9(b) is GRANTED. P's request for leave to amend her Complaint to satisfy Rule 9(b) is GRANTED. The Kern Ds' motion to dismiss P's state law claims is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Brian E. Sandoval on 1/26/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moulton v. Eugene Burger Management Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Burger Management Corporation
Represented By: Kevin A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene J. Burger
Represented By: Kevin A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Berg
Represented By: Eric B. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Brigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil, Frink & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Gayle Agnes Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip E. Frink
Represented By: Gayle A. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle A. Kern, LTD
Represented By: Douglas Alson Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle A. Kern
Represented By: Douglas Alson Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulla Christensen
Represented By: Gayle A. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Grady
Represented By: Gayle A. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Joseph
Represented By: Gayle A. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Perau
Represented By: Gayle A. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Svihla
Represented By: Gayle A. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeside Plaza Condominium Association
Represented By: Gayle A. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin A. Brown
Represented By: Kevin A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?