Kroshus et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Judy Kroshus, PATRICIA REINSMA, DENNIS MORELLI, BERT REINSMA, MARCIA MORELLI, W. R. Warn, ROLAINE WARN, RICHARD MEPPEN, DOUGLAS DAVIS, RAMONA DAVIS, JAMES CRUTCHER, BRANDY CRUTCHER, WESLEY McKNIGHT, KATHY McKNIGHT, DAVID STEPHAN, LINDA STEPHAN, Patrick Doyle, LORI DOYLE, Tom W Cook, II, KATHLEEN M. COOK, WILLIAM K. DAVIS, DIANE R. DAVIS, Michael Jones, KILITA JONES, MANFRED JURGEIT, JEANIE JURGEIT, ESTHER LEVINE, Cristina Perez, H. Lane Rose II, DEBORAH SUE ROSE, MICHAEL TEETER, BRUCE E. NAGEL, JEANNETTE M. NAGEL, William Adamson, SHARON ADAMSON, DARYL R. GROVER, Jr., BARBARA SPECCHIO, JOSEPH SPECCHIO, WESLEY STALIONS, MISTY STALIONS, RUSSELL LANCE PUCKETT, JEREMY GOTTLIEB, AMANDA BAILIE, THOMAS W. BAILIE, JR., MELISSA NEFF, JOSEPH NEFF, DAVID M. TRIPP, VIRGINIA TRIPP, EVERETT A. CIRIO, JOHN E. DOHM, DONNA L. DOHM, ADRIAN NORIEGA, MARY NORIEGA, MELANIE McADAM, Hillary McAdam, Robert McAdam, Stevie Staubs, Randall Staubs, Rhonda Shields, David Shields, Travis Patterson, Jennifer Patterson, David C. Marshall, Steve Bronaugh, Jennifer Bronaugh, Jimmie Reed, Teresa Reed, Michael A. Humphrey, Pamela Mary Doerr, Derek Taylor, Jennifer Taylor, Angela Daniel, William T. Daniel, John Lindenmeier, Leo Lindenmeier, Nancy Lindenmeier, Edward J. Stevens, Connie J. Stevens, Rosemary Higgins, Janet Chapman, Scott Chapman, Justin Knox, Cherie Knox, Dan Lawson, Lorraine Lawson, Frandon Knapp, Tracy Knapp, Leslie Leverett, Charles Tang Chal Yang Presnell, Leroy Marx, Jason E. Marich, Gary R. Meikle, Carmen Meikle, Kristopher Brown, Annette Brown, John Caulk, Martinique Caulk, Kim James, Jennifer Vaughan, Warren Gray, Barbara Gray, Julie Lane and Barbara Wilson
Defendant: United States of America, Dirk Kempthorne, Elizabeth Rieke, Truckee Carson Irrigation District, David P. Overvold and Gary Stone
Case Number: 3:2008cv00246
Filed: May 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Lyon
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Injunction

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 901 ORDER - A settlement in this case has been approved by the court and the case closed. Therefore, as a housekeeping matter, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that the stipulation and order for approval of settlement of class action still appearing on the docket is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 900 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - In accordance with the terms of the class action settlement approved by the Court in these related actions each and every action captioned here and each and every claim alleged in each such action is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs and expenses of litigation including attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 896 ORDER - Anticipating the agreed upon global settlement in this class action and the dismissal of the FTCA cases, the following motions to set trial are denied without prejudice:Kroshus v. United States, 3:08-cv-0246-LDG (# 882 )Uhouse v. Bureau of Reclamation, 3:08-0285-LDG (#478)Adamson v. United States, 3:08-cv-621-LDG (#457)Moore v. United States, 3:09-cv-0167-LDG (#255)Adgett v. United States Department of Interior, 3:09-cv-0649-LDG (#195)Kroshus v. United Sta tes, 3:09-cv-0713-LDG (#416)Adamson v. United States Department of Interior, 3:09-cv-0715-LDG (#398)Ames v. Unites States, 3:10-cv-0463-LDG (#146) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 895 ORDER granting 888 Motion to Approve Final Settlement, Plan of Distribution, Plaintiffs' Counsel Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs; and an Award to the Class Representatives. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 884 THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that the following motions are DENIED without prejudice subject to their reinstatement by the court in the due course of the aforementioned proceedings: Kroshus v. United States, 3:08-cv-0246-LDG : Plaintiffs� 39; renewal and reinstatement of motion for summary judgment on the issue of the Bureau of Reclamations level of flows through the Truckee Canal (# 879 ) Kroshus v. United States, 3:09-cv-0713-LDG : Plaintiffs' renewal and rein statement of motion for summary judgment regarding the level of flows through the Truckee Canal (#413) The dispositive motions involving the United States are the next matters on this courts docket. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 878 ORDER - The following motions are DENIED without prejudice subject to their reinstatement by the court in the due course of the aforementioned proceedings: Kroshus v. United States, 3:08-cv-0246-LDG Plaintiff Judy Kroshus renewal and reinstatement of motion for summaryjudgment regarding the level of flows through the Truckee Canal (# 875 ) Moore v. United States, 3:09-cv-0167-LDG United States motion for summary judgment regarding discretionary function immunity (#219) Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-0649-LDG United States motion for summary judgment regarding discretionary function immunity (#161) Kroshus v. United States, 3:09-cv-0713-LDG Plaintiffs renewal and reinstatement of mot ion for summary judgment regarding the level of flows through the Truckee Canal (#409) Adamson v. United States, 3:09-cv-0715-LDG United States motion for summary judgment regarding discretionary function immunity (#170) Ames v. United States, 3:10-cv-0463-LDG United States motion for summary judgment regarding discretionary function immunity (#112) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 877 THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that the following motions are DENIED without prejudice subject to their reinstatement by the court: Adamson v. United States , 3:08-cv-00621-LDG. United States' #25 Motion to dismiss, United States&# 039; #212 Motion for summary judgment as to Ten Specific Claims, and Plaintiffs' #446 Motion to dismiss renewal and reinstatement of motions. Moore v. United States , 3:09-cv-0167-LDG. Plaintiffs' #244 Motion to dismiss United States renewal United States' renewal and reinstatement of motions. Adgett v. United States , 3:09-cv-0649-LDG. Plaintiffs' #184 Motion to dismiss United States renewal and reinstatement of motions. A damson v. United States , 3:09-cv-0715-LDG. Plaintiffs' #387 Motion to dismiss United State' renewal and reinstatement of motions. Ames v. United States , 3:10-cv-0463-LDG. Plaintiffs' #27 Motion to convert moti on to dismiss to motion for summary judgment, and Plaintiff's #135 Motion to dismiss United States' renewal and reinstatement of motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 876 ORDER TO DISMISS Plaintiffs' Complaint and All Claims Against TRC Engineers Inc f/k/a VPoint Engineering, Martin Ugalde, Robert Bidart, and Michael Bidart With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 01/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 854 ORDER APPROVING Fairness of Settlement re 846 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 12/26/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 841 ORDER denying without prejudice 673 renewal and reinstatement of Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 682 Motion to Strike ; and granting 744 Motion to Dismiss. Hearing re motion for summary judgment 461 set for Monday, 1/14/2013, at 9:00 a.m. Please see attached for further details. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/28/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 839 ORDER GRANTING 640 Defendant KEYSTONE REALTY's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement, each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs. All claim, whether known or unknown, against Defendant KEYSTONE for contribution and/or equitable indemnity are extinguished. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/17/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER GRANTING 822 Motion/Substitution of Attorney. Cal Eilrich is substituted in place of Newel B. Knight for defendant, C.A.L. Investment Properties. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 5/10/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 775 ORDER APPROVING Compromise of Minor's Claim - Austin Vaughn re # 710 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 12/15/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 684 ORDER GRANTING Defendants Re/Max Realty Professionals and Judy Ashton's 606 Motion for Good Faith Determination, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. All claims, whether known or unknown, against Re/Max Realty and Judy Ashton for contribution and/or equitable indemnity are hereby extinguished. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 11/15/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 675 ORDER APPOINTING JUDGE FONDI AS SPECIAL MASTER re 670 Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 10/11/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 669 THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that the United States motions for summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity in Adamson v. United States (Adamson I), 3:08-cv-621-LDG-RAM (#127); Moore v. United States, 3:09-cv-167-LDG-RAM (#120); Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-649-LDG-RAM (#74); Adamson v. United States (Adamson II), 3:09-cv-715-LDG-RAM (#78); and Ames v. United States, 3:10-cv-463-LDG-RAM (#33) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/26/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 667 THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS: that in Kroshus v. United States (Kroshus I), 3:08-cv-00246-LDG-RAM, defendant Lynon Countys 564 is DENIED as moot; that in Kroshus v. United States (Kroshus II), 3:09-cv-00713-LDG-RAM, defendant Lyo n Countys #195 motion for summary judgment is DENIED as moot; that in Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-00649-LDG-RAM, the United States #69 motion to renew and reinstate that motion is DENIED as moot; that in Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-00649-LDG-RAM the United States #71 motion to renew and reinstate that motion is DENIED as moot; that in Kroshus v. United States (Kroshus II), 3:09-cv-00713-LDG-RAM, the United States #45 motion to dismiss duplicati ve claims by certain plaintiffs is hereby GRANTED;that in Adamson v. United States (Adamson II) 3:09-cv-00715-LDG-RAM, the United States #72 and #73 motions to renew those motions are DENIED as moot; that in Adamson v. United States (Adamson II) 3:09-cv-00715-LDG-RAM, the United States #75 motion to renew that motion is DENIED as moot.
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 663 ORDER. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that the United States motion to dismiss VictoriaLopez Lasane in Adgett 20 is GRANTED, and its motion to dismiss Hayley McGrath andHazyn McGrath in Adgett 20 is DENIED as moot. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that the United States motion to dismiss duplicative claims in Adamson II 21 is GRANTED. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that the United States motion to dismiss plaintiffs identified as minors in Adamson I 25 is GRANTED. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS th at the United States motion to dismiss debtors in bankruptcy in Adamson II 23 is GRANTED as to plaintiff Jeremy Gottlieb and DENIED without prejudice as to plaintiffs James and Denise Spracklin. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 662 ORDER re 656 Proposed Order. IT IS ORDERED that 598 MOTION for Good Faith Settlement Determination and Dismissal of Claims is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 8/4/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 650 ORDER APPROVING DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT re 649 Proposed Order Approving Settlement and Motion Hearing held on 7/29/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 8/1/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ORDER Re: Mailing of Class Action Notice and Service of Class Action Notice by Publication. Pursuant to the Courts Stipulation and Order for Approval of Settlement of Class Action and Distribution of Funds filed 6/13/2011, Plaintiffs counsel shall mail notice of the class certification and proposed settlements with the approved Settlement Claim Form to class members who have not previously received such notice no later than Friday, 7/8/2011. Plaintiffs counsel shall also publish notice of the settlement in the Reno Gazette Journal and Fernley Leader for three (3) successive weeks. Objections to the proposed settlements shall be mailed to the Clerk and postmarked no later than Wednesday, 7/27/2011. See Order for specifics. ( Notice of Compliance is due by 7/27/2011.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 7/7/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 634 ORDER ON STIPULATION re: [632 ] Stipulation. There will be a Settlement Fairness Hearing on Friday, 7/29/2011, at 10:00 AM in Department 7 at the Second Judicial District Court, Washoe County, Reno, NV. Plaintiffs counsel shall cause notic e of the hearing to be served upon all class members no later than Wednesday, 6/15/2011. Plaintiffs counsel shall cause notice of the class certification and proposed settlement to be published in the Reno Gazette Journal and Fernley Leader for thre e (3) successive weeks. Objections to the proposed settlement shall filed no later than Friday, 7/15/2011. ( Notice of Compliance is due by 7/15/2011. Miscellaneous Hearing set for 7/29/2011 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 6/13/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING re 608 Emergency MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement with Truckee-Carson Irrigation District and for Sanctions filed by Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/2/2011. Replies due by 5/3/2011. Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, May 4, 2011 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. Counsel wishing to appear telephonically shall dial 1-888-273-3658, enter the access code 5820561, and enter the security code 18285 approximately five (5) minutes prior to the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 5/2/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER. The following motions will be heard by the court on Monday, June 13, 2011, in Reno,Nevada, at 9:00 am in a courtroom to be determined and posted at a later date; and continued, ifnecessary, to Tuesday, June 14, 2011, at 9:00 am.Adamson v. Un ited States (Adamson I), 3:08-cv-621-LDG-RAMUnited States motion to dismiss (#25) (denied without prejudice to reconsideration ofissues on summary judgment) (reinstated for purposes of this hearing)United States motion for summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity(#127)Moore v. United States, 3:09-cv-167-LDG-RAMUnited States motion to dismiss (#9) (denied without prejudice to reconsideration ofissues on summary judgment) (reinstated for purposes of this hearing)United States motion f or summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity(#120)Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-649-LDG-RAMUnited States motion to strike jury demand (#19) (denied without prejudice toreinstatement)United States motion to dismiss duplicative claims (# 20) (denied without prejudice toreinstatement)United States motion to dismiss (#21) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement)United States motion for summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity (#74)Adamson v. United States (Adamson II), 3:09-cv-715-LDG-RAMUnited States motion to strike jury demand (#20) (denied without prejudice toreinstatement)United States motion to dismiss duplicative claims (#21) (denied without prejudice toreinstatement)United States motion to dismiss (#23) (de nied without prejudice to reinstatement)United States motion for summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity (#78)Ames v. United States, 3:10-cv-463-LDG-RAMUnited States motion to dismiss (#15)United States motion to strike claims of prejud gement interest and attorneys fees (#17)Plaintiffs motion to convert motion to dismiss to motion for summary judgment (#27)United States motion for summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity (#33) ( Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Lloyd D. George.) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/18/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER. The following FTCA jurisdictional and related FTCA non-Flood Control Act motions will be heard by the court at the April 18, 2011, hearing in Reno: Adamson v. United States (Adamson I), 3:08-cv-621-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to dismiss (#25) (denied without prejudice to reconsideration of issues on summary judgment) (reinstated for purposes of this hearing); Moore v. United States, 3:09-cv-167-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to dismiss (#9) (deni ed without prejudice to reconsideration of issues on summary judgment) (reinstated for purposes of this hearing); Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-649-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to strike jury demand (#27) (denied without preju dice to reinstatement) United States' motion to dismiss duplicative claims (#20) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement) United States' motion to dismiss (#21) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement) Adamson v. U nited States (Adamson II), 3:09-cv-715-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to strike jury demand (#20) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement) United States' motion to dismiss duplicative claims (#21) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement) United States' motion to dismiss (#23) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement) Ames v. United States, 3:10-cv-463-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to dismiss (#15) United States' motion to strike claims of prejudgement interest and attorneys fee (#17) Plaintiffs' motion to convert motion to dismiss to motion for summary judgment (#27). Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that, as previously indicated in the 10/21/2010 hearing, defendant Truckee Carson Irrigation District's pending motion for mediation in Kroshus v. United States (Kroshus I) 495 3:08-cv-0246-LDG-RAM is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/30/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER DENYING without prejudice subject to their reinstatement by the court 447 Renewed Motion to Dismiss and DENYING 461 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/29/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS that a video conference hearing presided over by this court in Las Vegas from Courtroom 6B at the Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse to Courtroom 6 in Reno at the Bruce R. Thompson United States Courthouse and F ederal Building shall be conducted on Thursday, March 24, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. to hear arguments on the following motions:Adamson, et al. v. United States (Adamson I), 3:08-cv-621-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to strike class al legations (dkt #26) (denied without prejudice to subsequent reinstatement); Moore, et al. v. United States, 3:09-cv-167-LDG-RAM:United States' motion to strike class action allegations (dkt #10) (denied without prejudice to reco nsideration in ruling on the motion for class certification)Plaintiffs' motion for class certification (dkt #68);Adamson, et al. v. United States (Adamson II), 3:09-cv-715-LDG-RAM:United States' motion to strike class action allegations (dkt #22) (denied for case management purposes without prejudice to reinstatement). Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/16/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO) Modified on 3/16/2011 to correct grammatical error. (KO)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 517 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER re 516 Stipulated Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 11/16/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER GRANTING CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTING CLASS COUNSEL re 132 MOTION. This action is certified as a class action; Counsel for the class shall be Robert C. Maddox, Esq., Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Esq., Vernon E. Leverty, Esq., Robert R. Hager, Esq., and Lee Hotchkin, Esq. ( see pdf order for details and specifics ) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 10/22/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER that, in the interests of case management and the consolidation for oral argument of pending dispositive and consolidation motions, and pending discussion during the video conference hearing of the potential for mediation, the following motions are DENIED without prejudice to their reinstatement following the scheduling of oral argument on pending dispositive and consolidation motions: denying 329 Motion for Summary Judgment.; granting 357 Motion to file Opposition to 329 Motion for Summary Judgment.; denying 372 Motion to Consolidate Cases. See Attached PDF/Image for Specifics. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/27/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BLG)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 498 THE COURT ORDERS that a video conference hearing on TCID's 495 Motion for mediation of all claims shall be conducted on September 15, 2010 at 1:00 PM. The parties in the captioned cases shall be present in Reno, Nevada, in a Courtroom to be designated later by minute order, and Judge Lloyd D. George shall preside from Las Vegas, Nevada. ( See pdf Order for additional specifics ) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/13/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED ORDER RE: Hearing held 08/03/2010 460 Motion for Order Providing For Clawback of Information Inadvertently Disclosed. It is recognized that the prosecution and defense of these related actions will require each party to re view and to disclose large quantities of information and documents through the discovery process. (See Order for additional specifics). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 08/04/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 288 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 286 Proposed Protective Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 7/17/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kroshus et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Kroshus
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA REINSMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS MORELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERT REINSMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCIA MORELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. R. Warn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROLAINE WARN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD MEPPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMONA DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES CRUTCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDY CRUTCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESLEY McKNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY McKNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID STEPHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA STEPHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI DOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom W Cook, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN M. COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM K. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE R. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KILITA JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANFRED JURGEIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANIE JURGEIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTHER LEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Lane Rose II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH SUE ROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL TEETER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE E. NAGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANNETTE M. NAGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Adamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON ADAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARYL R. GROVER, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA SPECCHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH SPECCHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESLEY STALIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISTY STALIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL LANCE PUCKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA BAILIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS W. BAILIE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA NEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH NEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID M. TRIPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA TRIPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVERETT A. CIRIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN E. DOHM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA L. DOHM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIAN NORIEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY NORIEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELANIE McADAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stevie Staubs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Staubs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Bronaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Bronaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Mary Doerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William T. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lindenmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Lindenmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Lindenmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie J. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frandon Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Leverett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Tang Chal Yang Presnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Marx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason E. Marich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary R. Meikle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Meikle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Caulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martinique Caulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirk Kempthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Rieke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truckee Carson Irrigation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P. Overvold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?