Crowley vs State of Nevada, et al
Plaintiff: Martin Crowley
Defendant: Nevada, State Of and Churchill, County Of
Case Number: 3:2008cv00618
Filed: November 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Civil Rights: Voting Office
County: Churchill
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 JUDGMENT. Ds' motions for summary judgment (##'s 30 , 33 ) are GRANTED;P's motion for summary judgment (# 31 ) is DENIED.Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 11/22/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDERED that Ds' motions for summary judgment(## 30 , 33 ) are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that P's motion for summary judgment (# 31 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/19/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Extend Time for plaintiff to respond to 9 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss. ( Responses due by 5/11/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/28/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crowley vs State of Nevada, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada, State Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Churchill, County Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Crowley
Represented By: Martin G. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?