Ellis et al
Plaintiff: Melinda Ellis and Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Petitioner: David A Alessi and Alessi Trustee Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv00428
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: Washoe
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER that plaintiff's motion to consolidate (ECF No. 258 ) is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to apply this ruling to plaintiff's motion to consolidate filed in James v. Alessi, 2:18-cv-01398-JAD-GWF (ECF No. 19). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 236 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Defendants shall have until 8/10/2016 to show cause as to why they are not complying with the court's December 16, 2015 order (ECF No. 235 ). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting 207 motion for attorney's fees, costs, and pre- and post-judgment interest in accordance with this order. Clerk shall: enter award of attorney's fees in amount of $125,435 and award of costs in amount of &# 036;22,656.04 in favor of plaintiff and against defendants; enter award of pre-judgment interest in amount identified in 28 USC § 1961 in favor of plaintiff and against defendants from 7/15/09 to date of final judgment; and enter award of post-ju dgment interest in amount identified in 28 USC § 1961 in favor of plaintiff and against defendants from date of judgment until judgment is satisfied. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER denying 205 renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER - Motion re attorney's fees due by 2/25/2015. Ellis shall comply with Local Rule 54-16 in filing such a motion. Alessi shall file any response within two weeks of Ellis' motion. Ellis may file a reply within one week of Alessi's response. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/10/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER denying 174 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff Melinda Ellis and against defendants Alessi Trustee Corporation and Alessi & Koenig, LLC on plaintiff's second cause of action for violation of the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 06/07/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER re 135 Stipulation/ 136 Proposed Order : Defendant may file a sur-reply to 118 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by by 4/19/2013. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks, on 2/7/2013, denying 117 Motion for Order to Shorten Time. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying 91 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 113 Motion for Settlement Conference. This matter is referred to the Honorable Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/28/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING 107 Motion to Extend Time : Plaintiff Melinda Ellis shall have until August 15, 2012, to obtain substitute counsel and file a notice of substitute counsel with the court. If plaintiff does not obtain counsel by that date, plaintiff shall file a notice with the court of her intention to proceed pro se in this matter or voluntarily dismiss this action without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that P's response to # 91 Motion for summaryjudgment is due no later than August 31, 2012. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/26/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDERED P's # 94 Motion to withdraw is GRANTED. Attorneys Curtis B. Coulter and Matthew L. Sharp are removed as counsel for P Melinda Ellis. FURTHER ORDERED that P's # 95 Motion to stay is GRANTED. P shall obtain substitute counsel, or n otice the court of her intention to proceed pro se by 6/6/2012. This action, along with P's response to the pending motion for summary judgment, is STAYED pending further order from this court. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/7/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDERED that third-party Ds' # 73 Motion to strike is GRANTED. The clerk of court is directed to STRIKE third-party Ps' # 72 Amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that third-party Ds' # 81 Motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/8/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel. Defendant Alessi and Koenig, Inc. shall respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Interrogatories without objections within ten (10) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 6/7/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING third-party defendants' # 34 Motion to Dismiss. Third-party plaintiff's complaint (# 7 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/23/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 41 third-party plaintiffs' Motion to file a sur-reply. See order for specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/9/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EM)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 13 plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. See order re specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/16/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Ellis
Represented By: Curtis B. Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Represented By: Thomas James Bayard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David A Alessi
Represented By: Thomas James Bayard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alessi Trustee Corporation
Represented By: Thomas James Bayard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?