LaFlamme et al v. Safeway Inc.
Plaintiff: Kay LaFlamme and Robert LaFlamme
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00514
Filed: September 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: Washoe
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1396 - Tort Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING 60 STIPULATION. The parties stipulate that this action be dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. FURTHER STIPULATED that the hearing of 4/21/2011 before Magis. Judge Cooke and the trial date of 6/21/2011, together with all related dates be VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 3/17/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING 48 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORD DENYING 49 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 12/3/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER - Defendant timely disclosed the indentity of its rebuttal experts and their reports appropriately respond to expert opinions provided in plaintiffs' initial expert witness reports. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to strike defendant's designation of rebuttal witnesses and to exclude such witnesses at trial 40 is DENIED. The September 7, 2010 hearing on this motion is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 9/2/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaFlamme et al v. Safeway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay LaFlamme
Represented By: William C. Jeanney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert LaFlamme
Represented By: William C. Jeanney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?