Lee et al v. Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc., a California corporation et al
Plaintiff: Richard F Lee and Aunetta M Roach
Defendant: Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc., a California corporation, Greenhead Investments, Inc., a California corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., a Delaware corporation and Regional Service Corporation, a California corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv00590
Filed: October 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: Washoe
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss 81 isGRANTED. Defendant Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc. and Greenhead Investment, Inc. are DISMISSED as defendants as to the remanded claims.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss and expunge lis pendens 86 is GRANTED in-part and DENIED in-part in accordance with this order. DefendantGreenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc. is DISMISSED as a defendant as to the remanded claims.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/3/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's 75 motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the stay in case no. 3:09-cv-0590-LRH-RAM entered on 3/6/2010, is hereby LIFTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants have twenty (20) days after the issuance of this order to answer or otherwise respond to the remanded claims. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 7/19/2011.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/28/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CERTIFIED COPY OF AMENDED MDL ORDER OF REMAND - MDL Docket No. 09-2119-JAT : Motions to Remand Certain Claims are granted as follows: Claims 8-10 and part of claims 1-5, 7 and 14 remain with the undersigned as part of the MDL and claim 6 and part of claims 1-5, 7 and 14 have been remanded to the transferor court. ( see order for additional specifics ) Signed by MDL Judge James A. Teilborg on 3/21/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 37 defendants' Motion to Stay the proceedings pending a decision of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are stayed pending Judge Teilborg's order to remand defendants and claims back to this court. See order re specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/5/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 4 plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court; and denying as moot 8 plaintiffs' Motion to Stay. See order re specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/14/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc., a California corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard F Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aunetta M Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenhead Investments, Inc., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Erica J Stutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Service Corporation, a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?